Securities and Exchange Commission v. Eleanor Fisher, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant / Appellant: ELEANOR FISHER and TAMMY FU
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Interested Party: JONATHAN E. PERLMAN
Case Number: 22-13412
Filed: October 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Filing 25 Appendix filed [1 Volume in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal VOLUMES] by Appellants Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu. [22-13412] (ECF: Mark Bloom) [Entered: 12/12/2022 06:05 PM]
December 12, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellee Jonathan E. Perlman [ # 21 ] filed by Attorney Mark D. Bloom for Appellants Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu. [22-13412] (ECF: Mark Bloom) [Entered: 12/12/2022 06:02 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 23 Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Stephanie McCarn as to Appellant Eleanor Fisher. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 10/25/2022. [Entered: 12/05/2022 02:31 PM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 22 Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Jonathan E. Perlman. [22-13412] (ECF: William Blum) [Entered: 11/30/2022 07:21 PM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Jonathan E. Perlman. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [21] [22-13412] (ECF: William Blum) [Entered: 11/30/2022 07:11 PM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 20 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Jonathan E. Perlman [22-13412] (ECF: Gregory Garno) [Entered: 11/30/2022 06:57 PM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 19 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu [22-13412] (ECF: Mark Bloom) [Entered: 11/30/2022 03:47 PM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 18 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission [22-13412] (ECF: Ezekiel Hill) [Entered: 11/30/2022 02:41 PM]
November 16, 2022 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney William Barry Blum for Appellee Jonathan E. Perlman. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13412] (ECF: William Blum) [Entered: 11/16/2022 05:06 PM]
November 16, 2022 Filing 16 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu. [Entered: 11/16/2022 11:59 AM]
November 16, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ezekiel Levenson Hill for Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13412] (ECF: Ezekiel Hill) [Entered: 11/16/2022 11:28 AM]
November 9, 2022 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 11/09/2022 05:46 PM]
November 3, 2022 Filing 13 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan E. Perlman, Esq., court-appointed Receiver [22-13412] (ECF: Jonathan Perlman) [Entered: 11/03/2022 06:06 PM]
November 3, 2022 Filing 12 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by W. Barry Blum for Jonathan E. Perlman, Esq., court-appointed Receiver [22-13412] (ECF: William Blum) [Entered: 11/03/2022 05:54 PM]
November 3, 2022 Filing 11 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregory M. Garno for Jonathan E. Perlman, Esq., court-appointed Receiver [22-13412] (ECF: Gregory Garno) [Entered: 11/03/2022 05:42 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 10 Modified Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Mark D. Bloom for Appellants Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu. [22-13412] (ECF: Mark Bloom) [Entered: 11/02/2022 06:07 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 9 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Mark D. Bloom for Appellants Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu. [22-13412] (ECF: Mark Bloom) [Entered: 11/02/2022 05:54 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13412] (ECF: Mark Bloom) [Entered: 11/02/2022 05:53 PM]
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Eleanor Fisher, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 07/11/2022. [Entered: 11/01/2022 03:51 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mr. John Russell Dodd, II for Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu. [22-13412] (ECF: John Dodd) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:43 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Mark D. Bloom for Appellants Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-13412] (ECF: Mark Bloom) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:41 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark D. Bloom for Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu. [22-13412] (ECF: Mark Bloom) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:39 PM]
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Morgan Bradylyons for SEC [22-13412] (ECF: Morgan Bradylyons) [Entered: 10/21/2022 03:24 PM]
October 20, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ezekiel L. Hill for the Securities and Exchange Commission [22-13412] (ECF: Ezekiel Hill) [Entered: 10/20/2022 01:36 PM]
October 14, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Eleanor Fisher and Tammy Fu on 10/12/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/02/2022 as to Appellant Eleanor Fisher. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/16/2022 as to Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Eleanor Fisher, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Ezekiel Levenson Hill
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Kellogg
Represented By: Stephanie N. Moot
Represented By: Andrew O. Schiff
Represented By: Morgan E. A. Bradylyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELEANOR FISHER
Represented By: Mark D. Bloom
Represented By: John Russell Dodd II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TAMMY FU
Represented By: Mark D. Bloom
Represented By: John Russell Dodd II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Andrew Fulton IV
Represented By: Martha Rosa Mora
Represented By: Craig Vincent Rasile
Represented By: Gregg Alan Steinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JONATHAN E. PERLMAN
Represented By: William Barry Blum
Represented By: Gregory M. Garno
Represented By: Jonathan E. Perlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?