Dorian Sykes v. C. Johnson, Jr.
Plaintiff / Appellant: DORIAN TREVOR SYKES
Defendant / Appellee: C. JOHNSON, JR.
Case Number: 22-13742
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights (US def)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Dorian Trevor Sykes failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court and failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 12/16/2022 03:26 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Dorian Trevor Sykes. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 12/01/2022 03:55 PM]
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Todd B. Grandy for C. Johnson, Jr. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13742] (ECF: Todd Grandy) [Entered: 11/29/2022 03:21 PM]
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Todd B. Grandy for C. Johnson, Jr. [22-13742] (ECF: Todd Grandy) [Entered: 11/29/2022 03:18 PM]
November 7, 2022 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Dorian Trevor Sykes on 11/04/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid.. [Entered: 11/10/2022 05:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Dorian Sykes v. C. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DORIAN TREVOR SYKES
Represented By: Dorian Trevor Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. JOHNSON, JR.
Represented By: Robert D. Sowell
Represented By: Todd B. Grandy
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?