Elbert Walker, Jr. v. Dismas Charities, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ELBERT WALKER, JR.
Defendant / Appellee: DISMAS CHARITIES, INC., CAROL OATES and KIMBERLY JOHNSON
Case Number: 22-13847
Filed: November 17, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights (US def)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file the appellant's brief, to and including February 16, 2023, is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 5 ] Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 01/11/2023 02:44 PM]
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Elbert Walker, Jr. [5] [Entered: 01/11/2023 02:42 PM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Elbert Walker, Jr. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/17/2023. [Entered: 12/08/2022 02:49 PM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 2 Appellate fee was paid on 11/28/2022 as to Appellant Elbert Walker, Jr.. [Entered: 12/08/2022 02:22 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Elbert Walker, Jr.. [Entered: 12/08/2022 02:24 PM]
November 17, 2022 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Elbert Walker, Jr. on 11/17/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid.. [Entered: 11/21/2022 08:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Elbert Walker, Jr. v. Dismas Charities, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELBERT WALKER, JR.
Represented By: Elbert Walker Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISMAS CHARITIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL OATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?