Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lisa McElhone, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant / Appellant: LISA MCELHONE, L.M.E. 2017 FAMILY TRUST and JOSEPH W. LAFORTE
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE and RYAN K. STUMPHAUZER
Case Number: 23-10228
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The motions for extension of time to and including May 1, 2023, in which to file Appellants briefs are GRANTED, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the briefs. [ # 17 ] [ # 16 ] BL [Entered: 02/27/2023 11:30 AM]
February 23, 2023 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Timothy A. Kolaya, Esq., Counsel for Appellee Ryan K. Stumphauzer, as Court-Appointed Receiver for Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. d/b/a Par Funding and the Other "Receivership Entities". On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10228] (ECF: Timothy Kolaya) [Entered: 02/23/2023 10:34 PM]
February 22, 2023 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Morgan E. A. Bradylyons for Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10228] (ECF: Morgan Bradylyons) [Entered: 02/22/2023 05:17 PM]
February 15, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 05/01/2023 filed by Joseph W. LaForte. Motion is Unopposed. [17] [23-10228] (ECF: David Ferguson) [Entered: 02/15/2023 06:32 PM]
February 15, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 05/01/2023 filed by Lisa McElhone and L.M.E. 2017 Family Trust. Motion is Unopposed. [16] [23-10228] (ECF: James Kaplan) [Entered: 02/15/2023 05:29 PM]
February 14, 2023 Filing 15 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [23-10228, 23-10234] [Entered: 02/14/2023 03:06 PM]
February 13, 2023 Filing 14 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kolaya, Timothy A., for Ryan K. Stumphauzer, Court-Appointed Receiver for Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. and the other "Receivership Entities" [23-10228] (ECF: Timothy Kolaya) [Entered: 02/13/2023 05:21 PM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 13 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney James Miller Kaplan for Appellants L.M.E. 2017 Family Trust, Joseph W. LaForte and Lisa McElhone. [23-10228] (ECF: James Kaplan) [Entered: 02/09/2023 07:39 PM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James Miller Kaplan for Appellants L.M.E. 2017 Family Trust, Joseph W. LaForte and Lisa McElhone. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10228] (ECF: James Kaplan) [Entered: 02/09/2023 07:35 PM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 11 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David L. Ferguson for Appellants Joseph W. LaForte and Lisa McElhone. [23-10228] (ECF: David Ferguson) [Entered: 02/09/2023 05:36 PM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by David Ferguson for Joseph LaForte. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10228] (ECF: David Ferguson) [Entered: 02/09/2023 05:23 PM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 9 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants L.M.E. 2017 Family Trust, Joseph W. LaForte and Lisa McElhone. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/01/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/06/2023 10:02 AM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexis Fields, Counsel for Joseph W. LaForte [23-10228] (ECF: Alexis Fields) [Entered: 02/03/2023 07:22 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney David L. Ferguson for Appellants Joseph W. LaForte and Lisa McElhone. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [23-10228] (ECF: David Ferguson) [Entered: 02/03/2023 07:15 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Ferguson as Counsel for Appellant Joseph LaForte [23-10228] (ECF: David Ferguson) [Entered: 02/03/2023 06:37 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney James Miller Kaplan for Appellants Joseph W. LaForte and Lisa McElhone. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [23-10228] (ECF: James Kaplan) [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:02 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James Miller Kaplan for Joseph W. LaForte and Lisa McElhone. [23-10228] (ECF: James Kaplan) [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:00 PM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Morgan Bradylyons for SEC [23-10228] (ECF: Morgan Bradylyons) [Entered: 02/01/2023 11:37 AM]
January 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Joseph W. LaForte on 01/20/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/09/2023 as to Appellant Joseph W. LaForte [Entered: 01/26/2023 03:28 PM]
January 20, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants L.M.E. 2017 Family Trust and Lisa McElhone on 01/20/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/09/2023 as to Appellant Lisa McElhone. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/23/2023 as to Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission [Entered: 01/26/2023 11:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lisa McElhone, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Amie Berlin
Represented By: Martin F. Healey
Represented By: Alise Meredith Johnson
Represented By: Linda Salup-Schmidt
Represented By: Morgan E. A. Bradylyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LISA MCELHONE
Represented By: David L. Ferguson
Represented By: Daniel Scott Fridman
Represented By: Alan S. Futerfas
Represented By: Joel Hirschhorn
Represented By: James Miller Kaplan
Represented By: Noah Elliot Snyder
Represented By: Alejandro O. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: L.M.E. 2017 FAMILY TRUST
Represented By: Daniel Scott Fridman
Represented By: Joel Hirschhorn
Represented By: Alejandro O. Soto
Represented By: James Miller Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSEPH W. LAFORTE
Represented By: Alex Louis Braunstein
Represented By: David L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexis Fields
Represented By: Daniel Scott Fridman
Represented By: Seth David Haimovitch
Represented By: Joel Hirschhorn
Represented By: James Miller Kaplan
Represented By: Joshua Robert Levine
Represented By: Alejandro O. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Chris A. Barker
Represented By: George Bochetto
Represented By: Nardo Dorsin
Represented By: Alexis Fields
Represented By: Brandon Scott Floch
Represented By: Ronald M. Gache
Represented By: Seth David Haimovitch
Represented By: Katie Brinson Hinton
Represented By: Zachary P. Hyman
Represented By: Joshua Robert Levine
Represented By: Jeffrey Eldridge Marcus
Represented By: Jason L. Mays
Represented By: Brian P. Miller
Represented By: Alejandro Paz
Represented By: Andre Raikhelson
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: James David Silver
Represented By: Scott A. Simon
Represented By: Damian George Waldman
Represented By: Douglas Keith Wickenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: RYAN K. STUMPHAUZER
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?