David Efron v. Madeleine Candelario, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID EFRON
Defendant / Appellee: MADELEINE CANDELARIO and MICHELLE PIRALLO DI CRISTINA
Case Number: 23-10691
Filed: March 6, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to RESPONSE to Motion for attorney's fees [ # 17 ], Motion for sanctions [ # 17 ] filed by Appellees Madeleine Candelario and Michelle Pirallo Di Cristina. [23-10691] (ECF: Gustavo Lage) [Entered: 09/04/2023 08:14 PM]
September 1, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellees Madeleine Candelario and Michelle Pirallo Di Cristina [ # 17 ], Motion filed by Appellees Madeleine Candelario and Michelle Pirallo Di Cristina [ # 17 ] filed by Attorney Charles M. Auslander for Appellant David Efron. [23-10691] (ECF: Charles Auslander) [Entered: 09/01/2023 06:46 PM]
August 28, 2023 Filing 20 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Charles M. Auslander for Appellant David Efron. Updated Reply Brief. Due on 10/12/2023 as to Appellant David Efron. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 08/28/2023 11:40 AM]
August 23, 2023 Filing 19 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellees Madeleine Candelario and Michelle Pirallo Di Cristina. [Entered: 08/23/2023 11:03 AM]
August 22, 2023 Filing 18 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees Madeleine Candelario and Michelle Pirallo Di Cristina. [23-10691] (ECF: Gustavo Lage) [Entered: 08/22/2023 12:34 PM]
August 22, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney's fees or costs, to impose sanctions for damages and costs filed by Madeleine Candelario and Michelle Pirallo Di Cristina. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [17] [23-10691] (ECF: Gustavo Lage) [Entered: 08/22/2023 12:33 PM]
July 18, 2023 Filing 16 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Gustavo D. Lage for Appellees Madeleine Candelario and Michelle Pirallo Di Cristina. Appellee's Brief due on 08/25/2023 as to Appellee Madeleine Candelario.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 07/18/2023 02:24 PM]
July 5, 2023 Filing 15 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant David Efron. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 07/05/2023 09:32 AM]
July 3, 2023 Filing 14 Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant David Efron. [23-10691] (ECF: Charles Auslander) [Entered: 07/03/2023 11:13 AM]
June 28, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant David Efron. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10691] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 06/28/2023 11:14 PM]
June 28, 2023 Filing 12 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellant David Efron. [Entered: 06/28/2023 10:18 AM]
June 26, 2023 Filing 11 Appellant's brief filed by David Efron. [23-10691] (ECF: Charles Auslander) [Entered: 06/26/2023 05:50 PM]
June 20, 2023 Filing 10 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles Auslander for Appellant Efron Related cases? No. [23-10691] (ECF: Charles Auslander) [Entered: 06/20/2023 05:16 PM]
April 5, 2023 Filing 9 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant David Efron. Appellants brief due on 05/17/2023 as to Appellant David Efron. Appendix due on 05/24/2023 as to Appellant David Efron. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 04/05/2023 02:09 PM]
March 31, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Gustavo D. Lage for Appellees Madeleine Candelario and Michelle Pirallo Di Cristina. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10691] (ECF: Gustavo Lage) [Entered: 03/31/2023 10:53 AM]
March 31, 2023 Filing 7 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gustavo D. Lage for Madeleine Candelario and Michelle Pirallo Di Cristina. [23-10691] (ECF: Gustavo Lage) [Entered: 03/31/2023 10:52 AM]
March 30, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 03/30/2023 02:20 PM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 5 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant David Efron. [23-10691] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 03/20/2023 10:52 PM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant David Efron. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10691] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 03/20/2023 10:10 PM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant David Efron. No hearings. [23-10691] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 03/20/2023 04:20 PM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Benedict P. Kuehne for David Efron. [23-10691] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 03/20/2023 04:19 PM]
March 6, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant David Efron on 03/04/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/17/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/21/2023 as to Appellant David Efron. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/04/2023 as to Appellee Madeleine Candelario [Entered: 03/07/2023 01:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Efron v. Madeleine Candelario, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID EFRON
Represented By: Kendall Coffey
Represented By: Scott A. Hiaasen
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Charles M. Auslander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MADELEINE CANDELARIO
Represented By: Gustavo D. Lage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE PIRALLO DI CRISTINA
Represented By: Gustavo D. Lage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?