Reinier Angulo v. The Shyft Group Usa, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: REINIER ANGULO
Defendant / Appellee: THE SHYFT GROUP USA, INC.
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.
Case Number: 23-13599
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 20, 2024 Reinier Angulo v. The Shyft Group USA, Inc., et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Motion to Accept Response to Jurisdictional Question as Timely Filed, filed by Appellant Reinier Angulo is GRANTED by clerk [ # 16 ]. [Entered: 12/05/2023 03:41 PM]
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION Accept Response to Jurisdictional Question as Timely Filed. filed by Reinier Angulo. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [16] [23-13599] (ECF: Daniel Samson) [Entered: 12/04/2023 03:37 PM]
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Reinier Angulo [23-13599] (ECF: Daniel Samson) [Entered: 12/04/2023 03:19 PM]
December 1, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Halli D. Cohn for Appellee United Parcel Service Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-13599] (ECF: Halli Cohn) [Entered: 12/01/2023 04:55 PM]
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee United Parcel Service Inc. [23-13599] (ECF: Halli Cohn) [Entered: 12/01/2023 04:43 PM]
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brett Tarver for United Parcel Service, Inc. Related cases? No. [23-13599] (ECF: Brett Tarver) [Entered: 11/29/2023 04:57 PM]
November 27, 2023 Filing 11 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Frederick J. King for United Parcel Service, Inc. Related cases? No. [23-13599] (ECF: Frederick King) [Entered: 11/27/2023 04:27 PM]
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Halli D. Cohn for United Parcel Service, Inc. Related cases? No. [23-13599] (ECF: Halli Cohn) [Entered: 11/27/2023 04:22 PM]
November 17, 2023 Filing 9 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Reinier Angulo. [Entered: 11/17/2023 01:55 PM]
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 11/17/2023 12:41 PM]
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Reinier Angulo. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/11/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/16/2023 11:31 AM]
November 16, 2023 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Daniel M. Samson for Appellant Reinier Angulo. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 11/16/2023 11:30 AM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Daniel M. Samson for Appellant Reinier Angulo. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [23-13599] (ECF: Daniel Samson) [Entered: 11/13/2023 12:53 PM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Daniel M. Samson for Appellant Reinier Angulo. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-13599] (ECF: Daniel Samson) [Entered: 11/13/2023 12:48 PM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Daniel M. Samson for Appellant Reinier Angulo. Related cases? No. [23-13599] (ECF: Daniel Samson) [Entered: 11/13/2023 12:37 PM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Samson, Daniel M. on behalf of Appellant, Reinier Angulo Related cases? No. [23-13599] (ECF: Daniel Samson) [Entered: 11/13/2023 09:30 AM]
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Reinier Angulo on 10/27/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/15/2023 as to Appellant Reinier Angulo. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/29/2023 as to Appellee The Shyft Group Usa, Inc. [Entered: 11/01/2023 11:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Reinier Angulo v. The Shyft Group Usa, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REINIER ANGULO
Represented By: Adam Troy Rose
Represented By: Thomas B. Scolaro
Represented By: Daniel M. Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE SHYFT GROUP USA, INC.
Represented By: Thomas P. Branigan
Represented By: Thomas N. Lurie
Represented By: Robert John Rudock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.
Represented By: Lawrence Eldridge Burkhalter
Represented By: Halli D. Cohn
Represented By: Frederick King
Represented By: Brett A. Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?