HPL GP, LLC, et al v. Continental Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: HPL GP, LLC and HOUSTON PIPE LINE COMPANY, L.P.
Defendant: CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Not Yet Classified: SERVICE
Case Number: 24-10145
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Filing 18 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc.. 7 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 03/08/2024 10:56 AM]
February 29, 2024 Filing 16 Appendix filed [7 VOLUMES] by Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc.. [24-10145] (ECF: Stephen Busey) [Entered: 02/29/2024 11:35 AM]
February 23, 2024 Filing 17 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc.. [Entered: 03/04/2024 10:48 AM]
February 22, 2024 Filing 15 Appellant's brief filed by Continental Holdings, Inc.. [24-10145] (ECF: Stephen Busey) [Entered: 02/22/2024 02:06 PM]
February 6, 2024 Filing 14 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/26/2024. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/06/2024 02:28 PM]
January 31, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Ethan J. Loeb for HPL GP, LLC and Houston Pipe Line Company, L.P.. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 01/31/2024 10:55 AM]
January 26, 2024 Filing 12 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allison C. Doucette for Houston Pipe Line Company, L.P.. Related cases? No. [24-10145] (ECF: Allison Doucette) [Entered: 01/26/2024 04:23 PM]
January 26, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Steven Gieseler for Houston Pipe Line Company LP and HPL Group, LLC Related cases? No. [24-10145] (ECF: Steven Gieseler) [Entered: 01/26/2024 03:59 PM]
January 26, 2024 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-10145] (ECF: Ethan Loeb) [Entered: 01/26/2024 02:47 PM]
January 26, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Related cases? No. [24-10145] (ECF: Ethan Loeb) [Entered: 01/26/2024 02:46 PM]
January 24, 2024 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Allan E. Wulbern for Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 01/24/2024 04:04 PM]
January 24, 2024 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Allan E. Wulbern for Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-10145] (ECF: Allan Wulbern) [Entered: 01/24/2024 01:59 PM]
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Allan E. Wulbern for Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc.. Related cases? Yes. [24-10145] (ECF: Allan Wulbern) [Entered: 01/24/2024 01:53 PM]
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Allan E. Wulbern for Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [24-10145] (ECF: Allan Wulbern) [Entered: 01/24/2024 01:44 PM]
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allan E. Wulbern for Continental Holdings, Inc.. Related cases? No. [24-10145] (ECF: Allan Wulbern) [Entered: 01/24/2024 01:39 PM]
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John R. Thomas for Continental Holdings, Inc.. Related cases? No. [24-10145] (ECF: John Thomas) [Entered: 01/24/2024 01:38 PM]
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen D. Busey for Continental Holdings, Inc.. Related cases? No. [24-10145] (ECF: Stephen Busey) [Entered: 01/24/2024 01:35 PM]
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc. on 01/16/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/05/2024 as to Appellant Continental Holdings, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/20/2024 as to Appellee HPL GP, LLC [Entered: 01/22/2024 11:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: HPL GP, LLC, et al v. Continental Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HPL GP, LLC
Represented By: Scott R. Alexander
Represented By: Richard W. Gardner
Represented By: George F. Gramling III
Represented By: Ethan J. Loeb
Represented By: Anne O'Connor McCready
Represented By: Allison C. Doucette
Represented By: Steven Geoffrey Gieseler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSTON PIPE LINE COMPANY, L.P.
Represented By: Scott R. Alexander
Represented By: Allison C. Doucette
Represented By: Richard W. Gardner
Represented By: George F. Gramling III
Represented By: Ethan J. Loeb
Represented By: Anne O'Connor McCready
Represented By: Steven Geoffrey Gieseler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Stephen D. Busey
Represented By: Tim Elsworth Sleeth
Represented By: John R. Thomas
Represented By: Allan E. Wulbern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SERVICE
Represented By: Sidney Franklyn Ansbacher
Represented By: David Jeffrey D'Agata
Represented By: Thomas R. Gottshall
Represented By: Dominick J. Graziano
Represented By: Emily Friend Horner
Represented By: Robert Y. Knowlton
Represented By: William Leonard Pence
Represented By: Kristina Rudman Ramsey
Represented By: Erin Bowles Reynolds
Represented By: James C. Rinaman Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Ross Shealy
Represented By: Mary C. Sorrell
Represented By: Ashley E. Taylor
Represented By: William B. Taylor IV
Represented By: Jason Robert Teal
Represented By: John Andrew Tucker IV
Represented By: Frank D. Upchurch III
Represented By: Michael Sebastain Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?