Douglas Morton v. Audi of America, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS GRANT MORTON
Defendant: AUDI OF AMERICA, LLC, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., d.b.a. Audi of America, Inc., AUDI AG, VOLKSWAGEN, A.G., LEAR CORPORATION, FNK NORTH AMERICA, INC., FAURECIA NHK CO., LTD, FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING, LLC, NHK SEATING OF AMERICA, INC., NHK SPRING CO. LTD, FAURECIA USA HOLDINGS INC, BROSE NORTH AMERICA, INC., BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE SE & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT, GRAMMER, INC., GRAMMER INDUSTRIES, LLC, GRAMMER AG, ASBURY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. and XYZ COMPANIES 1-4
Case Number: 24-10427
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Douglas Grant Morton is GRANTED by clerk [ # 6 ]. Pursuant to FRAP 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 02/28/2024 03:34 PM]
February 28, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Douglas Grant Morton. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [6] [24-10427] (ECF: Cale Conley) [Entered: 02/28/2024 09:21 AM]
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 Notice that no action will be taken on Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal [ # 4 ] filed by Attorney Cale H. Conley for Appellant Douglas Grant Morton. Reason(s) no action being taken on filing(s): The filing is deficient for failure to comply with this Court's rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1.. [Entered: 02/28/2024 07:27 AM]
February 27, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Douglas Grant Morton. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [4] [24-10427] (ECF: Cale Conley) [Entered: 02/27/2024 03:42 PM]
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-10427] (ECF: Cale Conley) [Entered: 02/27/2024 03:25 PM]
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cale H. Conley for Douglas Grant Morton. Related cases? No. [24-10427] (ECF: Cale Conley) [Entered: 02/27/2024 03:23 PM]
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Douglas Grant Morton on 02/07/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/01/2024 as to Appellant Douglas Grant Morton. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/11/2024 as to Appellees Brose North America, Inc., FNK North America, Inc., Grammer, Inc., Lear Corporation, NHK Seating of America, Inc. and Volkswagen, A.G. [Entered: 02/12/2024 12:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Douglas Morton v. Audi of America, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS GRANT MORTON
Represented By: Noah Abrams
Represented By: Andrew C. Avram
Represented By: Cale H. Conley
Represented By: Alex Edmonds
Represented By: Winston S. Kirby
Represented By: Davis Popper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUDI OF AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., d.b.a. Audi of America, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Represented By: Colin Kamrath Kelly
Represented By: Timia Andrielle Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUDI AG
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOLKSWAGEN, A.G.
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAR CORPORATION
Represented By: James L. Hollis
Represented By: Hugh Peterson III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNK NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Michael Roger Boorman
Represented By: Deborah J. Bullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAURECIA NHK CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING, LLC
Represented By: Michael Roger Boorman
Represented By: Deborah J. Bullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK SEATING OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Myrece R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK SPRING CO. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAURECIA USA HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: Michael Roger Boorman
Represented By: Deborah J. Bullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROSE NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Reed Thomas Warburton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE SE & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAMMER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ford Capezzuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAMMER INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Ford Capezzuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAMMER AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Represented By: Colin Kamrath Kelly
Represented By: Timia Andrielle Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ COMPANIES 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?