Brent Jacoby v. John Hamm, et al
Plaintiff: BRENT JACOBY
Defendant: COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JOHN Q. HAMM, EASTERLING CF WARDEN, BRIAN THOMPKINS, CHRISTOPHER GORDY, BULLOCK CF WARDEN, DAVID LAMAR, RODGERS, HUTTON, JONES, SILER and BLAKELY
Case Number: 24-10574
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 12 Notice that no action will be taken on Motion for appointment of counsel [ # 11 ] filed by Appellant Brent Jacoby. Reason(s) no action being taken on filing(s): The filing was forwarded from another court. See FRAP 25(a)(1). [Entered: 04/15/2024 09:42 AM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Brent Jacoby. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [11] [Entered: 04/15/2024 09:41 AM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 10 Notice that no action will be taken on Transcript Order Form filed by Appellant Brent Jacoby. Reason(s) no action being taken on filing(s): The filing was forwarded from another court. See FRAP 25(a)(1). [Entered: 04/15/2024 09:39 AM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Brent Jacoby. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 04/15/2024 09:39 AM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 8 Notice that no action will be taken on Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Appellant Brent Jacoby. Reason(s) no action being taken on filing(s): The filing was forwarded from another court. See FRAP 25(a)(1). [Entered: 04/15/2024 09:37 AM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 7 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Brent Jacoby. [Entered: 04/15/2024 09:37 AM]
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Steven Marshall for John Q. Hamm, David Lamar and Brian Thompkins. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website and have not filed the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 04/09/2024 11:25 AM]
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to proceed based on imminent danger filed by Appellant Brent Jacoby. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [5] [Entered: 03/08/2024 04:59 PM]
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 Letter received from Appellant Brent Jacoby in appeal designated as 3 strikes. [Entered: 03/08/2024 01:03 PM]
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Brent Jacoby on 02/22/2024. Fee Status: Three Strikes. [Entered: 02/29/2024 08:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brent Jacoby v. John Hamm, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT JACOBY
Represented By: Brent Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN Q. HAMM
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERLING CF WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN THOMPKINS
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER GORDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BULLOCK CF WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID LAMAR
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAKELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?