Ezemarval, LLC v. El Instituto Postal Dominicano
Plaintiff: EZEMARVAL, LLC, d.b.a. Miacargo Group
Defendant: EL INSTITUTO POSTAL DOMINICANO
Case Number: 24-11306
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 06/03/2024 12:06 PM]
May 24, 2024 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-11306] (ECF: Raul Manon) [Entered: 05/24/2024 04:55 PM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 10 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Robert M. Palumbos for Appellant Ezemarval, LLC. Appellants brief due on 07/05/2024 as to Appellant Ezemarval, LLC. Appendix due 7 days after the filing of the brief as to Appellant Ezemarval, LLC. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 05/14/2024 01:25 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 9 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Ezemarval, LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/05/2024. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/10/2024 05:56 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Robert M. Palumbos for Appellant Ezemarval, LLC. No hearings. [Entered: 05/10/2024 05:55 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robert M. Palumbos for Appellant Ezemarval, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-11306] (ECF: Robert Palumbos) [Entered: 05/10/2024 03:19 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Robert M. Palumbos for Appellant Ezemarval, LLC. No hearings. [24-11306] (ECF: Robert Palumbos) [Entered: 05/10/2024 03:16 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Robert M. Palumbos for Appellant Ezemarval, LLC. Related cases? No. [24-11306] (ECF: Robert Palumbos) [Entered: 05/10/2024 03:14 PM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert M. Palumbos for Appellant Ezemarval, LLC Related cases? No. [24-11306] (ECF: Robert Palumbos) [Entered: 05/09/2024 04:48 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Raul B. Manon for El Instituto Postal Dominicano. Related cases? No. [24-11306] (ECF: Raul Manon) [Entered: 05/08/2024 11:29 AM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Related cases? No. [24-11306] (ECF: Andrew Kruppa) [Entered: 05/08/2024 10:37 AM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ezemarval, LLC on 04/25/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/17/2024 as to Appellant Ezemarval, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/28/2024 as to Appellee El Instituto Postal Dominicano [Entered: 04/29/2024 11:40 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ezemarval, LLC v. El Instituto Postal Dominicano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EZEMARVAL, LLC, d.b.a. Miacargo Group
Represented By: Jessica Marroquin
Represented By: Stewart Dorian Williams
Represented By: Robert M. Palumbos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL INSTITUTO POSTAL DOMINICANO
Represented By: Andrew Kruppa
Represented By: Raul B. Manon
Represented By: Maria Gomez Nombela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?