SBG Apple Central I, LLC, et al v. City National Bank of Florida
Plaintiff: CITY NATIONAL BANK OF FLORIDA
Defendant: LOUISIANA APPLE, LLC, OKLAHOMA APPLE, LLC, KENTUCKY APPLE, LLC and MOUNTAIN APPLE, LLC
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL V, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL IV, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL IX, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL X, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL XIII, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL XI, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL II, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL VII, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL III, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL I, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL VI, LLC, SBG APPLE CENTRAL VIII, LLC and SBG APPLE CENTRAL XII, LLC
Unknown: SERVICE
Case Number: 24-13153
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instruments
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2024 Filing 28 Returned Mail was received for Attorney Monique D. Hayes for Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. IN RE: Briefing Notice dated 10/15/24 [Entered: 11/08/2024 04:54 PM]
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: On October 4, 2024, the Defendant Apple Entities filed Chapter 11 bankruptcy petitions in Case Numbers 24-20336, 24- 20340, 24-20337, and 24-20341 in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Florida. These appeals are STAYED pending further order of the bankruptcy court and this Court. See 11 U.S.C. 362(a). The Appellee is DIRECTED to file status reports with this Court every 60 days regarding the purpose for the stay, with the first status report due 60 days after the date of this order. The Appellee also is DIRECTED to promptly file a notice with this Court when the purpose for the stay is obviated. The Appellants' motion to consolidate Case Number 24- 13239 with Case Number 24-13153 will be resolved once the bankruptcy stay is lifted. [ # 18 ] in 24-13153, [ # 10314984-2 ] in 24-13239 AJ (See attached order for complete text) [24-13153, 24-13239] [Entered: 11/08/2024 02:30 PM]
November 6, 2024 Filing 29 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. [Entered: 11/13/2024 03:08 PM]
November 6, 2024 Filing 26 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC, SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC, Appellee City National Bank of Florida and Not Party Service in 24-13153, Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC in 24-13239. [24-13153, 24-13239] [Entered: 11/08/2024 02:20 PM]
November 6, 2024 Filing 25 Notice of deficient Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Eric Jacobs for City National Bank of Florida. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website. Please correct the deficiencies within six days from this date. [Entered: 11/06/2024 02:22 PM]
November 6, 2024 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Eric Jacobs for Appellee City National Bank of Florida. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-13153] (ECF: Eric Jacobs) [Entered: 11/06/2024 11:14 AM]
November 5, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Paul J. Battista and Eric Jacobs for City National Bank of Florida. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website and have not filed the standalone CIP. Please correct the deficiencies within seven days from this date. [Entered: 11/05/2024 05:24 PM]
November 5, 2024 Filing 22 Appellant's brief filed by SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. [24-13153] (ECF: Jon Polenberg) [Entered: 11/05/2024 05:08 PM]
October 24, 2024 Filing 21 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [24-13153, 24-13239] [Entered: 10/24/2024 01:05 PM]
October 22, 2024 Filing 20 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gabrielle Sliwka for SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. Related cases? Yes. [24-13153] (ECF: Gabrielle Sliwka) [Entered: 10/22/2024 03:21 PM]
October 22, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to consolidate appeals 24-13153 and 24-13239 filed by SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. Motion is Opposed. [19] [24-13153] (ECF: Jon Polenberg) [Entered: 10/22/2024 11:21 AM]
October 16, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for suggestion of bankruptcy filed by City National Bank of Florida. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [18] [24-13153] (ECF: Eric Jacobs) [Entered: 10/16/2024 11:34 AM]
October 15, 2024 Filing 17 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric Jacobs for City National Bank of Florida. Related cases? Yes. [24-13153] (ECF: Eric Jacobs) [Entered: 10/15/2024 12:09 PM]
October 15, 2024 Filing 16 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant SBG Apple Central I, LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/05/2024. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 10/15/2024 10:44 AM]
October 15, 2024 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Jon Polenberg for Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 10/15/2024 10:43 AM]
October 15, 2024 Filing 14 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Jon Polenberg for SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. The required Appearance of Counsel form has not been received. Your filings will not be processed until an Appearance of Counsel form is filed. [Entered: 10/15/2024 09:36 AM]
October 15, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Paul J. Battista for City National Bank of Florida and Eric Jacobs for City National Bank of Florida. An attorney may not electronically file through another person's ECF account. See 11th Cir. R. 25-3(e). [Entered: 10/15/2024 09:13 AM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jon Polenberg for Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-13153] (ECF: Jon Polenberg) [Entered: 10/11/2024 05:14 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 11 Amended Notice of Related Appeal filed by Attorney Jon Polenberg for Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. [24-13153] (ECF: Jon Polenberg) [Entered: 10/11/2024 05:12 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 10 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jon Polenberg for Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. Related cases? Yes. [24-13153] (ECF: Jon Polenberg) [Entered: 10/11/2024 04:50 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jon Polenberg for Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [24-13153] (ECF: Jon Polenberg) [Entered: 10/11/2024 04:36 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Yasin Daneshfar for SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. Related cases? Yes. [24-13153] (ECF: Yasin Daneshfar) [Entered: 10/11/2024 04:18 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jon Polenberg for SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. Related cases? Yes. [24-13153] (ECF: Jon Polenberg) [Entered: 10/11/2024 04:16 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric Jacobs for City National Bank of Florida. Related cases? Yes. [24-13153] (ECF: Paul Battista) [Entered: 10/11/2024 02:59 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul J. Battista for City National Bank of Florida. Related cases? Yes. [24-13153] (ECF: Paul Battista) [Entered: 10/11/2024 12:44 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Jon Polenberg for SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. The required Appearance of Counsel form has not been received. The Certificate of Interested Persons will not be acted upon until the Appearance of Counsel form is filed. [Entered: 10/11/2024 09:04 AM]
October 10, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Related Appeal filed by Attorney Jon Polenberg for Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. [24-13153] (ECF: Jon Polenberg) [Entered: 10/10/2024 04:42 PM]
October 10, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jon Polenberg for Appellants SBG Apple Central I, LLC, SBG Apple Central II, LLC, SBG Apple Central III, LLC, SBG Apple Central IV, LLC, SBG Apple Central IX, LLC, SBG Apple Central V, LLC, SBG Apple Central VI, LLC, SBG Apple Central VII, LLC, SBG Apple Central VIII, LLC, SBG Apple Central X, LLC, SBG Apple Central XI, LLC, SBG Apple Central XII, LLC and SBG Apple Central XIII, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-13153] (ECF: Jon Polenberg) [Entered: 10/10/2024 04:37 PM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant SBG Apple Central I, LLC, et al., on 09/26/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/18/2024 as to Appellant SBG Apple Central I, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/28/2024 as to Appellee City National Bank of Florida. [Entered: 09/30/2024 10:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: SBG Apple Central I, LLC, et al v. City National Bank of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL V, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL IV, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL IX, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL X, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL XIII, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL XI, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL II, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL VII, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL III, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL I, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL VI, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL VIII, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SBG APPLE CENTRAL XII, LLC
Represented By: Jon Polenberg
Represented By: Monique D. Hayes
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Represented By: Gabrielle Sliwka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUISIANA APPLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKLAHOMA APPLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENTUCKY APPLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNTAIN APPLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: SERVICE
Represented By: Isaac M. Marcushamer
Represented By: Douglas S. Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY NATIONAL BANK OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Eric Jacobs
Represented By: Paul J. Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?