Lemuel Cooper v. Joseph Basford, et al
Plaintiff: LEMUEL L. COOPER
Defendant: R. CLOUD, JACKSON CI WARDEN and JOSEPH BASFORD
Case Number: 24-13628
Filed: November 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Lemuel L. Cooper failed to file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal within the time fixed by the rules. [Entered: 12/31/2024 03:34 PM]
December 31, 2024 Filing 8 Notice that no action will be taken on Motion for leave to proceed [ # 7 ] filed by Appellant Lemuel L. Cooper. Reason(s) no action being taken on filing(s): The filing is deficient for failure to comply with this Court's rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1. [Entered: 12/31/2024 02:38 PM]
December 30, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to proceed filed by Appellant Lemuel L. Cooper. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [7] [Entered: 12/31/2024 02:38 PM]
December 30, 2024 Filing 6 Notice that no action will be taken on Premature appellant's brief filed by Appellant Lemuel L. Cooper. Reason(s) no action being taken on filing(s): The filing is deficient for failure to comply with this Court's rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1. [Entered: 12/30/2024 03:07 PM]
December 26, 2024 Filing 5 Premature Appellant's brief filed by Lemuel L. Cooper. Deficiencies: Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. [Entered: 12/30/2024 03:07 PM]
December 2, 2024 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Lemuel L. Cooper. No hearings per USDC. [Entered: 12/02/2024 11:48 AM]
November 25, 2024 Filing 2 USDC Order Denying appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees Assessed. Filed on 11/22/2024. Docket Entry 34. [Entered: 11/25/2024 10:55 AM]
November 22, 2024 Filing 3 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Lemuel L. Cooper. [Entered: 12/02/2024 11:46 AM]
November 5, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Lemuel L. Cooper on 11/04/2024. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. [Entered: 11/06/2024 10:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lemuel Cooper v. Joseph Basford, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. CLOUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON CI WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH BASFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEMUEL L. COOPER
Represented By: Lemuel L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?