Center for a Sustainable Coast, et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, et al
Plaintiff: KAREN GRAINEY and CENTER FOR A SUSTAINABLE COAST
Defendant: DISTRICT COMMANDER AND DISTRICT ENGINEER and U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Case Number: 24-14171
Filed: December 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2025 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael Thomas Gray for Appellees District Commander and District Engineer and U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-14171] (ECF: Michael Gray) [Entered: 01/17/2025 02:59 PM]
January 14, 2025 Filing 9 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Jon L. Schwartz for Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. Appellants brief due on 03/05/2025 as to Appellant Center for a Sustainable Coast. Appendix due 7 days after the brief is filed. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 01/14/2025 03:21 PM]
January 10, 2025 Filing 8 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/03/2025. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 01/10/2025 02:26 PM]
January 10, 2025 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Attorney Jon L. Schwartz for Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 01/10/2025 02:25 PM]
January 6, 2025 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael T Gray for US Army Corps of Engineers and DISTRICT COMMANDER AND DISTRICT ENGINEERU.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, SAVANNAH DISTRICT Related cases? No. [24-14171] (ECF: Michael Gray) [Entered: 01/06/2025 03:49 PM]
January 6, 2025 Filing 5 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jon L. Schwartz for Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. Related cases? No. [24-14171] (ECF: Jon Schwartz) [Entered: 01/06/2025 02:17 PM]
January 6, 2025 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jon L. Schwartz for Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. Related cases? No. [24-14171] (ECF: Jon Schwartz) [Entered: 01/06/2025 12:49 PM]
January 6, 2025 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jon L. Schwartz for Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-14171] (ECF: Jon Schwartz) [Entered: 01/06/2025 12:42 PM]
December 27, 2024 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James C. Stuchell for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia for District Commander and District Engineer and U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. Related cases? No. [24-14171] (ECF: James Stuchell) [Entered: 12/27/2024 12:36 PM]
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey on 12/23/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/13/2025 as to Appellant Center for a Sustainable Coast. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/23/2025 as to Appellee U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. [Entered: 12/26/2024 01:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Center for a Sustainable Coast, et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT COMMANDER AND DISTRICT ENGINEER
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: James C. Stuchell
Represented By: Michael Thomas Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: James C. Stuchell
Represented By: Michael Thomas Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN GRAINEY
Represented By: Jon L. Schwartz
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR A SUSTAINABLE COAST
Represented By: Jon L. Schwartz
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?