Eric Bechtel, et al v. Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: KEVIN EVERSON, ROBBIE SAYDE, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated and ERIC BECHTEL
Defendant: WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.
Case Number: 24-14177
Filed: December 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2025 Filing 19 MOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde. Motion is Opposed. [19] [24-14177] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 02/18/2025 10:05 PM]
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 02/04/2025 11:59 AM]
January 31, 2025 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to David S. Shankman for WINN. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you remedy the default(s). [Entered: 01/31/2025 09:51 AM]
January 30, 2025 Filing 16 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David S. Shankman for WINN. Related cases? No. [24-14177] (ECF: David Shankman) [Entered: 01/30/2025 11:23 AM]
January 30, 2025 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to David S. Shankman for WINN. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website and have not filed the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you remedy the default(s). [Entered: 01/30/2025 09:00 AM]
January 30, 2025 Filing 14 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by David S. Shankman for WINN. The required paper copies have not been received. Counsel must file a Appearance of Counsel form. [Entered: 01/30/2025 08:54 AM]
January 28, 2025 Filing 13 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde [24-14177] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 01/28/2025 05:52 PM]
January 28, 2025 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by David S. Shankman for Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-14177] (ECF: David Shankman) [Entered: 01/28/2025 02:19 PM]
January 24, 2025 Filing 11 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nadia H. Dahab for Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde. Related cases? No. [24-14177] (ECF: Nadia Dahab) [Entered: 01/24/2025 02:53 PM]
January 14, 2025 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 01/14/2025 01:29 PM]
January 14, 2025 Filing 9 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson, Robbie Sayde and WINN. [Entered: 01/14/2025 11:28 AM]
January 13, 2025 Filing 8 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Brian W. Warwick for Appellants Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde. Related cases? No. [24-14177] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 01/13/2025 06:46 PM]
January 13, 2025 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brian W. Warwick for Appellants Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-14177] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 01/13/2025 06:30 PM]
January 13, 2025 Filing 6 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/03/2025. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 01/13/2025 02:33 PM]
January 13, 2025 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Attorney Brian W. Warwick for Appellants Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde. No hearings. [Entered: 01/13/2025 02:26 PM]
January 13, 2025 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Brian W. Warwick for Appellants Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde. No hearings. [24-14177] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 01/13/2025 02:23 PM]
January 13, 2025 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Janet R. Varnell for Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde. Related cases? No. [24-14177] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 01/13/2025 02:02 PM]
January 13, 2025 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian W. Warwick for Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde. Related cases? No. [24-14177] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 01/13/2025 02:01 PM]
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Eric Bechtel, Kevin Everson and Robbie Sayde on 12/20/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/17/2025 as to Appellant Eric Bechtel. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/27/2025 as to Appellee Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. [Entered: 12/30/2024 11:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Eric Bechtel, et al v. Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN EVERSON
Represented By: Brian W. Warwick
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Represented By: David F. Sugerman
Represented By: Tim Alan Quenelle
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Newsome II
Represented By: Pamela G. Levinson
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Christopher J. Brochu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBBIE SAYDE, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Brian W. Warwick
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Represented By: David F. Sugerman
Represented By: Tim Alan Quenelle
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Newsome II
Represented By: Pamela G. Levinson
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Christopher J. Brochu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC BECHTEL
Represented By: Brian W. Warwick
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Represented By: David F. Sugerman
Represented By: Tim Alan Quenelle
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Newsome II
Represented By: Pamela G. Levinson
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Christopher J. Brochu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.
Represented By: Dennis D. Leone
Represented By: Joshua Ryan Kersey
Represented By: David S. Shankman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?