In re: Avery Bradford
Petitioner: In re: AVERY BRADFORD
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF GEORGIA
Case Number: 25-10036
Filed: January 6, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2025 Filing 6 Notice that no action will be taken on Motion for reconsideration of panel order [ # 5 ] filed by Petitioner Avery Bradford. Reason(s) no action being taken on filing(s): A motion for reconsideration is not permitted in a successive habeas corpus petition. See 11th Cir. R. 22-3(b). Additionally, the filing is deficient for failure to comply with this Court's rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1. [Entered: 03/03/2025 11:44 AM]
February 26, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION for reconsideration of a panel order entered on 01/10/2025 filed by Petitioner Avery Bradford. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [5] [Entered: 03/03/2025 11:44 AM]
January 30, 2025 Filing 4 Notice that no action will be taken on Motion for reconsideration of panel order [ # 3 ] filed by Petitioner Avery Bradford. Reason(s) no action being taken on filing(s): A motion for reconsideration is not permitted in a successive habeas corpus petition. See 11th Cir. R. 22-3(b). Additionally, the filing is deficient for failure to comply with this Court's rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1. [Entered: 01/30/2025 03:50 PM]
January 28, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION for reconsideration of a panel order entered on 01/10/2025 filed by Petitioner Avery Bradford. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [3] [Entered: 01/30/2025 03:50 PM]
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Motion for leave to file successive petition for habeas corpus filed by Petitioner Avery Bradford is DENIED. [ # 1 ] RSR, KCN and RJL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 01/10/2025 11:29 AM]
January 6, 2025 Filing 1 ORIGINAL PROCEEDING DOCKETED. EMERGENCY Application for leave to file successive petition for habeas corpus filed by Petitioner Avery Bradford. Fee Status: Fee Not Required [Entered: 01/07/2025 10:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Avery Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re: AVERY BRADFORD
Represented By: Avery Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?