Brendan Wagner v. U.S. Attorney General
Plaintiff: BRENDAN PAUL WAGNER
Defendant: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 25-10110
Filed: January 14, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2025 Filing 9 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Collette B. Cunningham for Appellee U.S. Attorney General. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [25-10110] (ECF: Collette Cunningham) [Entered: 02/27/2025 02:34 PM]
February 27, 2025 Filing 8 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Collette B. Cunningham appearing on behalf of U.S. Attorney General U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida for U.S. Attorney General. Related cases? No. [25-10110] (ECF: Collette Cunningham) [Entered: 02/27/2025 10:05 AM]
February 18, 2025 Filing 7 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Party Brendan Paul Wagner. Appellants brief due on 03/26/2025 as to Appellant Brendan Paul Wagner. Appendix due 7 days after the brief. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 02/18/2025 08:47 AM]
February 10, 2025 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Emily Chang for Appellee U.S. Attorney General. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [25-10110] (ECF: Emily Chang) [Entered: 02/10/2025 09:28 AM]
February 5, 2025 Filing 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily C. L. Chang for U.S. Attorney General U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida for U.S. Attorney General. Related cases? No. [25-10110] (ECF: Emily Chang) [Entered: 02/05/2025 05:05 PM]
February 4, 2025 Filing 4 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Brendan Paul Wagner. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/24/2025. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/04/2025 04:12 PM]
February 4, 2025 Filing 3 TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Party Brendan Paul Wagner. No hearings. [Entered: 02/04/2025 04:10 PM]
January 27, 2025 Filing 2 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Brendan Paul Wagner. [Entered: 01/30/2025 03:46 PM]
January 14, 2025 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Brendan Paul Wagner on 01/10/2025. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/03/2025 as to Appellant Brendan Paul Wagner. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/11/2025 as to Appellee U.S. Attorney General. [Entered: 01/14/2025 04:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brendan Wagner v. U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Represented By: Emily Chang
Represented By: Collette B. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDAN PAUL WAGNER
Represented By: Brendan Paul Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?