Michael Conrad v. Camping World Holdings Inc.
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CONRAD
Defendant: CAMPING WORLD HOLDINGS INC.
Case Number: 25-10203
Filed: January 22, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2025 Filing 14 REPLY to RESPONSE to Motion [ # 12 ] filed by Appellee Michael Conrad. [25-10203] (ECF: Michael Greenwald) [Entered: 03/18/2025 03:34 PM]
March 14, 2025 Filing 13 Opposition to Motion for Summary Affirmance filed by CWH. [13] [25-10203]--[Edited 03/17/2025 by JC] (ECF: Benjamin Shatz) [Entered: 03/14/2025 05:17 PM]
March 4, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION for summary affirmance filed by Michael Conrad. Motion is Opposed. [12] [25-10203] (ECF: Michael Greenwald) [Entered: 03/04/2025 09:27 PM]
February 21, 2025 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 02/21/2025 03:39 PM]
February 17, 2025 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael L. Greenwald for Appellee Michael Conrad. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [25-10203] (ECF: Michael Greenwald) [Entered: 02/17/2025 04:55 PM]
February 12, 2025 Filing 9 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Benjamin Gross Shatz for Appellant Camping World Holdings Inc. Appellants brief due on 04/09/2025 as to Appellant Camping World Holdings Inc. Appendix due 7 days after the brief is filed. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 02/12/2025 03:56 PM]
February 11, 2025 Filing 8 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant CWH. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/10/2025. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/11/2025 12:40 PM]
February 11, 2025 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Attorney Katherine Taylor Powell for Appellant CWH. No hearings. [Entered: 02/11/2025 12:36 PM]
February 4, 2025 Filing 6 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Benjamin Gross Shatz for Appellant CWH. Related cases? No. [25-10203] (ECF: Benjamin Shatz) [Entered: 02/04/2025 05:58 PM]
February 4, 2025 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Benjamin Gross Shatz for Appellant CWH. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [25-10203] (ECF: Benjamin Shatz) [Entered: 02/04/2025 05:43 PM]
January 28, 2025 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James Matthew Stephens for Michael Conrad. Related cases? No. [25-10203] (ECF: James Stephens) [Entered: 01/28/2025 02:16 PM]
January 23, 2025 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Benjamin G. Shatz for Appellant FreedomRoads, LLC, erroneously named as "Camping World Holdings, Inc." Related cases? No. [25-10203] (ECF: Benjamin Shatz) [Entered: 01/23/2025 06:43 PM]
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael L. Greenwald for Michael Conrad. Related cases? No. [25-10203] (ECF: Michael Greenwald) [Entered: 01/23/2025 11:42 AM]
January 22, 2025 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant CWH on 01/22/2025. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/10/2025 as to Appellant Camping World Holdings Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/20/2025 as to Appellee Michael Conrad. [Entered: 01/23/2025 09:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Conrad v. Camping World Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CONRAD
Represented By: James Matthew Stephens
Represented By: Anthony Paronich
Represented By: Michael L. Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPING WORLD HOLDINGS INC.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Rawls
Represented By: Katherine Taylor Powell
Represented By: Benjamin Gross Shatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?