Alex El Bachiri v. Medicredit, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: ALEX EL BACHIRI
Defendant: MEDICREDIT, INC. and MD NOW MEDICAL CENTERS, INC.
Case Number: 25-10356
Filed: February 4, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2025 Filing 13 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Darren R. Newhart for Appellant Alex El Bachiri. Appellants brief due on 04/07/2025 as to Appellant Alex El Bachiri. Appendix due on 04/14/2025 as to Appellant Alex El Bachiri. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 03/17/2025 10:04 AM]
March 10, 2025 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Darren R. Newhart for Appellant Alex El Bachiri. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [25-10356] (ECF: Darren Newhart) [Entered: 03/10/2025 09:53 AM]
March 7, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Darren R. Newhart for Alex El Bachiri. You have failed to file the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you remedy the default(s). [Entered: 03/07/2025 03:10 PM]
March 6, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement form Out of Time filed by Alex El Bachiri. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [10] [25-10356]--[Edited 03/07/2025 by CRL, to correct Relief selected and docket text] (ECF: Darren Newhart) [Entered: 03/06/2025 10:51 AM]
March 5, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Darren R. Newhart for Alex El Bachiri. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website and have not filed the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you remedy the default(s). [Entered: 03/05/2025 02:03 PM]
March 5, 2025 Filing 8 Attorney Darren R. Newhart for Appellant Alex El Bachiri is notified that, pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless the appellant files a Civil Appeal Statement. [Entered: 03/05/2025 01:54 PM]
March 5, 2025 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Drew O'Malley for Appellees MD Now Medical Centers, Inc. and Medicredit, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [25-10356] (ECF: Drew O'Malley) [Entered: 03/05/2025 11:33 AM]
February 18, 2025 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Drew O'Malley for MD Now Medical Centers, Inc. and Medicredit, Inc.. Related cases? No. [25-10356] (ECF: Drew O'Malley) [Entered: 02/18/2025 10:35 AM]
February 18, 2025 Filing 5 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Alex El Bachiri. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/17/2025. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/18/2025 10:04 AM]
February 18, 2025 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Attorney Darren R. Newhart for Appellant Alex El Bachiri. No hearings. [Entered: 02/18/2025 10:03 AM]
February 17, 2025 Filing 3 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Darren R. Newhart for Appellant Alex El Bachiri. No hearings. [25-10356] (ECF: Darren Newhart) [Entered: 02/17/2025 09:10 AM]
February 17, 2025 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Darren R. Newhart for Alex El Bachiri. Related cases? No. [25-10356] (ECF: Darren Newhart) [Entered: 02/17/2025 09:09 AM]
February 4, 2025 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Alex El Bachiri on 02/03/2025. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/24/2025 as to Appellant Alex El Bachiri. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/05/2025 as to Appellee Medicredit, Inc. [Entered: 02/05/2025 12:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alex El Bachiri v. Medicredit, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX EL BACHIRI
Represented By: Darren R. Newhart
Represented By: Jessica Krassner
Represented By: Matthew D. Bavaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICREDIT, INC.
Represented By: Drew O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD NOW MEDICAL CENTERS, INC.
Represented By: Drew O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?