In Re: Electronic Books Antitr Featured Case
Defendant: MacMillian, Inc, Harpercollins Publishers, Random House Inc., Apple Inc., Hachette Book Group, Amazon.Com, Inc., Barnes & Noble Inc., Harpercollins Publishers, Inc.;, Macmillan Publishers, Inc., Hachette Digital, Inc., Hachette Livre USA, Inc., Hachette Livre SA, Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH, Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, DBA Macmillan and The Penguin Group, A Division of Pearson PLC
Plaintiff - Appellee: Shilpa Grover, Fredric A. Press, Anthony Petru, Jeffrey Evans, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Clarissa Weiss, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, Rhonda Burstein, Juan Sotomayor, Robert Cheatham, John T. Meyer, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Paul Meyer, Paul J. Meyer, on behalf of all others similarly situated, Liana Lingofelt, Marcia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Aubrie Ann Jones, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, David Yastrab, on behalf of himself and all others similiarly situated, Cyrus Joubin, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Brian Brown, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Harrison Goldman, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Kevin Rader-Rhodenbaugh, Brian McGee, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Carol Ness, Katrina Key, Patsy Diamond, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Marcus Mathis, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales, Eugenia RuaneGonzales, Steven Rivers, Christian Gilstrap, Cynthia J. Tyler, Thomas Friedman, Jeremy Sheppeck, Aloysius J. Brown, III, Anne M. Rinaldi, Laura J. Warner, Barbara Heath, Kathleen Linda Pitlock, Kathleen Weiss, Matthew A. Hosking, Diane Urbanec, Ed Macauley, Ronna Hamelin, James L. Nesmith, Lauren Albert, Sue Roberts, Shane S. Davis, Sue Ellen Gordon, Charles Leonard Pelton, Sr., Kimberly Whiteside Brooks, Steven D. Campbell, Jessica Moyer, Andreas Albeck, Rebecca L. Rossman, Miriam Cummings, Carole C. Kehl, Kamal Sonti, Gretchen Ulbee, Chad Miller, Amy D. Nolan, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, Elvira Monzon, United States of America, State of Texas, State of Connecticut, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Illinois, State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Missouri, State of Ohio, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Vermont and State of West Virginia
Defendant - Appellant: Penguin Group USA, Inc.
Case Number: 12-2999
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: STATUTES-Antitrust
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2012 Filing 93 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 11/09/2012, on behalf of Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 11/09/2012 by CM/ECF.[764815] [12-2999]
November 7, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to hold appeal in abeyance [87] filed by Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc. and The Penguin Group, by RKW, C.JJ., FILED. [762412][92] [12-2999]
October 29, 2012 Filing 87 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of The Penguin Group and Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/29/2012 by CM/ECF. [758877] [12-2999]
October 23, 2012 Filing 85 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS for Daniel J. Mogin, RECEIVED.[753728] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 84 ATTORNEY, Eric Lipman, for Plaintiff Stateof Texas, TERMINATED.[726552] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 83 ATTORNEY, Douglas L. Davis, for Plaintiff State of West Virginia, TERMINATED.[726547] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 82 ATTORNEY, Ryan Kriger, for State of Vermont, TERMINATED.[726543] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 81 ATTORNEY, Victor John Domen, Jr., for Plaintiff State of Tennessee, TERMINATED.[726538] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 80 ATTORNEY, Jeffery P. Hallem, for Plaintiff State of South Dakota, TERMINATED.[726533] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 79 ATTORNEY, Devin M. Laiho, for Plaintiff State of Colorado, TERMINATED.[726531] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 78 ATTORNEY, Chadwick O. Brooker, for Plaintiff State of Illinois, TERMINATED.[726526] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 77 ATTORNEY, Nancy M. Bonnell, for Plaintiff State of Arizona, TERMINATED.[726520] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 76 ATTORNEY, Clyde E. Sniffen, for Plaintiff State of Alaska, TERMINATED.[726514] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 75 ATTORNEY, Gary M. Becker, for Plaintiff State of Connecticut, TERMINATED.[726502] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 74 ATTORNEY, David M. Ashton, for Plaintiff State of Texas, TERMINATED.[726494] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 73 ATTORNEY, Jose G. Diaz-Tejera, for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, TERMINATED.[726491] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 72 ATTORNEY, James A. Donahue III, for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, TERMINATED.[726487] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 71 ATTORNEY, Edward J. Olszewski, for Plaintiff State of Ohio, TERMINATED.[726480] [12-2999]
September 21, 2012 Filing 70 ATTORNEY, Anne E. Schneider, for Plaintiff State of Missouri, TERMINATED.[726468] [12-2999]--[Edited 09/21/2012 by WD]
September 21, 2012 Filing 69 ATTORNEY, Ellen S. Copper, for Plaintiff State of Maryland, TERMINATED.[726463] [12-2999]--[Edited 09/21/2012 by WD]
September 21, 2012 Filing 68 ATTORNEY, Layne M. Lindebak, for Plaintiff State of Iowa, TERMINATED.[726460] [12-2999]--[Edited 09/21/2012 by WD]
September 21, 2012 Filing 67 ATTORNEY, Lawrence Edward Buterman, for Plaintiff United States of America, TERMINATED.[726455] [12-2999]--[Edited 09/21/2012 by WD]
September 21, 2012 Filing 66 AMENDED CAPTION PAGE, SENT.[726413] [12-2999]
September 19, 2012 Filing 64 LETTER, dated 09/19/2012, on behalf of State of Texas et. al., RECEIVED. Service date 09/19/2012 by CM/ECF.[725819] [12-2999]
September 6, 2012 Filing 63 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM, [61], on behalf of Appellee Marcia Greene and Aubrie Ann Jones, FILED.[712057] [12-2999]
September 6, 2012 Filing 62 ATTORNEY, Michael Eisenkraft for Aubrie Ann Jones Marcia Greene, in case 12-2999 , [61], ADDED.[712006] [12-2999]
September 6, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Marcia Greene and Aubrie Ann Jones, FILED. Service date 09/06/2012 by CM/ECF. [711991] [12-2999]
August 31, 2012 Filing 59 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, for Kevin Landau, RECEIVED.[708196] [12-2999]
August 29, 2012 Filing 57 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance, [56], on behalf of Appellee Marcia Greene and Aubrie Ann Jones, FILED.[706476] [12-2999]
August 29, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Marcia Greene and Aubrie Ann Jones, FILED. Service date 08/29/2012 by CM/ECF. [706238] [12-2999]
August 28, 2012 Filing 52 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, RECEIVED. Service date 08/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[704543] [12-2999]
August 27, 2012 Filing 55 LETTER, dated 08/27/2012, on behalf of Appellee State of South Dakota, RECEIVED. Service date 08/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[705111] [12-2999]
August 27, 2012 Filing 54 LETTER, dated 08/27/2012, on behalf of Appellee State of Ohio, RECEIVED. Service date 08/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[705102] [12-2999]
August 27, 2012 Filing 50 ATTORNEY, James Edward Tysse for The Penguin Group, in case 12-2999 , [48], ADDED.[702578] [12-2999]
August 24, 2012 Filing 51 LETTER, dated 08/24/2012, on behalf of Appellee State of Texas, RECEIVED. Service date 08/27/2012 by CM/ECF.[703755] [12-2999]
August 24, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/24/2012 by CM/ECF. [702423] [12-2999]
August 24, 2012 Filing 47 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc. Brief due date as 11/16/2012;. Joint Appendix due date as 11/16/2012, FILED.[702272] [12-2999]
August 23, 2012 Filing 53 LETTER, dated 08/23/2012, on behalf of The State of North Dakota, RECEIVED. Service date 08/23/2012 by CM/ECF.[704745] [12-2999]
August 23, 2012 Filing 43 NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[701355] [12-2999]
August 23, 2012 Filing 40 LETTER, dated 08/23/2012, on behalf of The State of Michigan, RECEIVED. Service date 08/23/2012 by CM/ECF.[701322] [12-2999]
August 23, 2012 Filing 39 LETTER, dated 08/23/2012, on behalf of The State of Maryland, RECEIVED. Service date 08/23/2012 by CM/ECF.[701266] [12-2999]
August 23, 2012 Filing 38 LETTER, dated 08/23/2012, on behalf of The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, RECEIVED. Service date 08/23/2012 by CM/ECF.[701255] [12-2999]
August 22, 2012 Filing 34 CAPTION, consolidated pro se plaintiffs, AMENDED.[699943] [12-2999]
August 21, 2012 Filing 29 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 11/16/2012, RECEIVED. Service date 08/21/2012 by CM/ECF.[698937] [12-2999]
August 21, 2012 Filing 25 LETTER, dated 08/21/2012, on behalf of Appellee State of Tennessee, RECEIVED. Service date 08/21/2012 by CM/ECF.[698664] [12-2999]
August 21, 2012 Filing 23 LETTER, dated 08/21/2012, on behalf of Appellee State of Missouri, RECEIVED. Service date 08/21/2012 by CM/ECF.[698565] [12-2999]
August 15, 2012 Filing 22 NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[693506] [12-2999]
August 15, 2012 Filing 20 ATTORNEYS, Richard J. Douglas, in place of attorneys Jeffrey B. Dubner, Michael Eisenkraft, SUBSTITUTED.[693384] [12-2999]
August 15, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE, to Appellees Andreas Albeck, Lauren Albert, Aloysius J. Brown, III, Brian Brown, Rhonda Burstein, Steven D. Campbell, Robert Cheatham, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Miriam Cummings, Shane S. Davis, Patsy Diamond, Jeffrey Evans, Thomas Friedman, Christian Gilstrap, Harrison Goldman, Sue Ellen Gordon, Marcia Greene, Shilpa Grover, Ronna Hamelin, Barbara Heath, Matthew A. Hosking, Aubrie Ann Jones, Cyrus Joubin, Carole C. Kehl, Katrina Key, Liana Lingofelt, Ed Macauley, Marcus Mathis, Brian McGee, John T. Meyer, Paul Meyer, Paul J. Meyer, Chad Miller, Elvira Monzon, Jessica Moyer, James L. Nesmith, Carol Ness, Amy D. Nolan, Charles Leonard Pelton, Sr., Anthony Petru, Kathleen Linda Pitlock, Fredric A. Press, Kevin Rader-Rhodenbaugh, Anne M. Rinaldi, Steven Rivers, Sue Roberts, Rebecca L. Rossman, Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales, Jeremy Sheppeck, Kamal Sonti, Juan Sotomayor, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Missouri, State of Ohio, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Vermont, State of West Virginia, Cynthia J. Tyler, Gretchen Ulbee, Diane Urbanec, Laura J. Warner, Clarissa Weiss, Kathleen Weiss, Kimberly Whiteside Brooks and David Yastrab , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[692242] [12-2999]
August 14, 2012 Filing 16 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/14/2012 by CM/ECF.[691987] [12-2999]
August 14, 2012 Filing 15 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/14/2012 by CM/ECF.[691978] [12-2999]
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, dismissing appeal by 08/27/2012, unless Appellant Penguin Group USA Inc., submits Forms C & D, FILED.[689948] [12-2999]
August 10, 2012 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/10/2012 by CM/ECF.[689105] [12-2999]
August 10, 2012 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, Patricia Ann Millett, [11], in place of attorney David A. Donohoe, SUBSTITUTED.[689059] [12-2999]
August 10, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/10/2012 by CM/ECF. [688919] [12-2999]
August 6, 2012 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Lawrence Buterman, [9], in place of attorney Sarah Normand, SUBSTITUTED.[683525] [12-2999]
August 6, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/06/2012 by CM/ECF. [683498] [12-2999]
August 1, 2012 Filing 7 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Edward J. Olszewski for Appellee State of Ohio, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[679949] [12-2999]
August 1, 2012 Filing 6 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Mario Nunzio Alioto, Esq. for Appellee Amy D. Nolan, David M. Ashton for Appellee State of Texas, Nancy M. Bonnell for Appellee State of Arizona, Chadwick O. Brooker for Appellee State of Illinois, Ellen S. Cooper for Appellee State of Maryland, Douglas L. Davis for Appellee State of West Virginia, Jose G. Diaz-Tejera for Appellee Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Victor John Domen, Jr. for Appellee State of Tennessee, James A. Donahue, III for Appellee Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Jeffrey B. Dubner, Esq. for Appellee Marcia Greene and Aubrie Ann Jones, Gregory Alan Frank, Esq. for Appellee Andreas Albeck, Richard S. Frankowski, Esq. for Appellee Katrina Key, Jeff D. Friedman, Esq. for Appellee Marcus Mathis, Christian Gilstrap, Cynthia J. Tyler, Jeremy Sheppeck, Aloysius J. Brown, III, Anne M. Rinaldi, Laura J. Warner, Barbara Heath, Kathleen Linda Pitlock, Kathleen Weiss, Matthew A. Hosking, Diane Urbanec, Ed Macauley, Ronna Hamelin, James L. Nesmith, Lauren Albert, Sue Roberts, Shane S. Davis, Sue Ellen Gordon, Charles Leonard Pelton, Sr., Kimberly Whiteside Brooks, Steven D. Campbell, Jessica Moyer, Rebecca L. Rossman, Miriam Cummings, Carole C. Kehl, Kamal Sonti and Gretchen Ulbee, Daniel E. Gustafson, Esq. for Appellee Carol Ness, Jeffrey P. Hallem for Appellee State of South Dakota, Jeffrey Farley Keller, Esq. for Appellee Andreas Albeck, Ryan Kriger for Appellee State of Vermont, Devin M. Laiho for Appellee State of Colorado, Layne M. Lindebak for Appellee State of Iowa, Eric Lipman, Esq. for Appellee State of Texas, Richard A. Lockridge, Esq. for Appellee John T. Meyer and Liana Lingofelt, Dina Elizabeth Micheletti, Esq. for Appellee Chad Miller, Dianne M. Nast, Esq. for Appellee Carol Ness, Stuart McKinley Paynter, Esq. for Appellee Marcus Mathis, Rebecca L. Rossman, Miriam Cummings, Carole C. Kehl and Kamal Sonti, Brian Douglas Penny, Esq. for Appellee Brian Brown, Michael Francis Ram, Esq. for Appellee Patsy Diamond, Shana Eve Scarlett, Esq. for Appellee Marcus Mathis, Christian Gilstrap, Cynthia J. Tyler, Jeremy Sheppeck, Aloysius J. Brown, III, Anne M. Rinaldi, Laura J. Warner, Barbara Heath, Kathleen Linda Pitlock, Kathleen Weiss, Matthew A. Hosking, Diane Urbanec, Ed Macauley, Ronna Hamelin, James L. Nesmith, Lauren Albert, Sue Roberts, Shane S. Davis, Sue Ellen Gordon, Kimberly Whiteside Brooks, Steven D. Campbell, Jessica Moyer, Rebecca L. Rossman, Miriam Cummings, Carole C. Kehl, Kamal Sonti and Gretchen Ulbee, Anne E. Schneider for Appellee State of Missouri, Harry Shulman, Esq. for Appellee Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales, Clyde E. Sniffen, Jr. for Appellee State of Alaska, Eugene A. Spector, Esq. for Appellee Patsy Diamond and Amy Marie Zeman, Esq. for Appellee Steven Rivers, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[679947] [12-2999]
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 06/27/2012, RECEIVED.[678890] [12-2999]
July 23, 2012 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[678862] [12-2999]
July 23, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Penguin Group USA, Inc., FILED. [678831] [12-2999]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Electronic Books Antitr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Shilpa Grover
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Fredric A. Press
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Anthony Petru
Represented By: Jason A. Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Jeffrey Evans, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Clarissa Weiss, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Rhonda Burstein
Represented By: Jay W. Eisenhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Juan Sotomayor
Represented By: Charles Pearsall Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Robert Cheatham
Represented By: Bernard Persky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: John T. Meyer, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Paul Meyer
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Paul J. Meyer, on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Liana Lingofelt
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Marcia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michael Eisenkraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Aubrie Ann Jones, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michael Eisenkraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: David Yastrab, on behalf of himself and all others similiarly situated
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Cyrus Joubin, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Paul Francis Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Brian Brown, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Harrison Goldman, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Kevin Rader-Rhodenbaugh
Represented By: Daniel Hume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Brian McGee, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Kevin Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Carol Ness
Represented By: Kevin Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Katrina Key
Represented By: Daniel J. Mogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Patsy Diamond, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Marcus Mathis, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales, Eugenia RuaneGonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Steven Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Christian Gilstrap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Cynthia J. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Thomas Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Jeremy Sheppeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Aloysius J. Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Anne M. Rinaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Laura J. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Barbara Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Kathleen Linda Pitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Kathleen Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Matthew A. Hosking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Diane Urbanec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Ed Macauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Ronna Hamelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: James L. Nesmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Lauren Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Sue Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Shane S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Sue Ellen Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Charles Leonard Pelton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Kimberly Whiteside Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Steven D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Jessica Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Andreas Albeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Rebecca L. Rossman
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Miriam Cummings
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Carole C. Kehl
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Kamal Sonti
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Gretchen Ulbee
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Chad Miller
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Amy D. Nolan, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Elvira Monzon
Represented By: Steven Joseph Greenfogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Sheive Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Gary M. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: State of West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacMillian, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpercollins Publishers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Random House Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpercollins Publishers, Inc.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macmillan Publishers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Digital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Livre USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Livre SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, DBA Macmillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Penguin Group, A Division of Pearson PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Penguin Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Donohoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?