The Authors Guild v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Herbert Mitgang, Daniel Hoffman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Paul Dickson, Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and Canadian Standard Association
Plaintiff - Appellee: Betty Miles, Joseph Goulden, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Jim Bouton and The Authors Guild
Defendant - Appellant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 12-3200
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: PROPERTY RIGHTS-Copyright

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 1, 2013 Summary The Authors Guild Inc., et al. v. Google, Inc.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2013 Filing 187 ARGUMENT CD to Leslie Majer, TRANSMITTED.[1059006] [12-3200]
October 2, 2013 Filing 186 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1056640] [12-3200]
July 1, 2013 Filing 184 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[979391] [12-3200] [Entered: 07/01/2013 11:38 AM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 183 JUDGMENT, FILED.[979304] [12-3200] [Entered: 07/01/2013 11:07 AM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 180 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 07/01/2013, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[979056] [12-3200] [Entered: 07/01/2013 09:38 AM]
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 OPINION, vacating the 06/11/2012 order of the District Court and remanding the case. The mandate shall issue forthwith, per curiam (PNL, JAC, B.D. PARKER), FILED.[979029] [12-3200]--[Edited 07/01/2013 by YS] [Entered: 07/01/2013 09:30 AM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 176 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[978993] [12-3200] [Entered: 07/01/2013 09:14 AM]
June 24, 2013 Filing 174 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[972718] [12-3200] [Entered: 06/24/2013 08:59 AM]
June 7, 2013 Filing 173 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from Bonzi & Zack, with fee, RECEIVED.[959607] [12-3200] [Entered: 06/07/2013 05:29 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 172 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[945437] [12-3200] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:43 PM]
May 20, 2013 Filing 171 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[943194] [12-3200] [Entered: 05/20/2013 04:20 PM]
May 16, 2013 Filing 170 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[940042] [12-3200] [Entered: 05/16/2013 03:08 PM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 169 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from Kilpatrick Townsend, with fee, RECEIVED.[938437] [12-3200] [Entered: 05/15/2013 01:04 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 168 CASE, before PNL, JAC, BDP, C.JJ., HEARD.[930956] [12-3200] [Entered: 05/08/2013 11:06 AM]
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER, dated 04/22/2013, permitting parties to submit argument in support of recusal, FILED.[914829] [12-3200] [Entered: 04/22/2013 12:47 PM]
April 4, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [896685] [12-3200] [Entered: 04/04/2013 09:50 AM]
April 2, 2013 Filing 163 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 04/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [894375] [12-3200] [Entered: 04/02/2013 10:35 AM]
April 2, 2013 Filing 162 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, RECEIVED. Service date 04/02/2013 by CM/ECF.[894372] [12-3200] [Entered: 04/02/2013 10:33 AM]
April 1, 2013 Filing 161 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[893218] [12-3200] [Entered: 04/01/2013 11:08 AM]
March 25, 2013 Filing 158 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [138] filed by Amicus Curiae The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser; granting motion to file supplemental appendix [138] filed by Amicus Curiae The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, FILED. [887182][158] [12-3200] [Entered: 03/25/2013 03:31 PM]
March 19, 2013 Filing 152 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/08/2013, SET.[880323] [12-3200] [Entered: 03/19/2013 10:56 AM]
March 18, 2013 Filing 150 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [146], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Morton Beebe, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara, Graphic Artists Guild, Ed Kashi, David W. Moser, North American Nature Photography Association, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., Professional Photographers of America, Al Satterwhite, John Schmelzer, Leif Skoogfors, Simms Taback and The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[879856][150] [12-3200] [Entered: 03/18/2013 06:08 PM]
March 11, 2013 Filing 148 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/06/2013, PROPOSED.[871308] [12-3200] [Entered: 03/11/2013 04:58 PM]
March 11, 2013 Filing 146 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file amended sealed amicus curiae brief [138],to file supplemental appendix [138], on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [870869][146] [12-3200]--[Edited 03/11/2013 by KG] [Entered: 03/11/2013 02:12 PM]
March 6, 2013 Filing 145 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/06/2013 by CM/ECF. [866932] [12-3200] [Entered: 03/06/2013 06:53 PM]
March 4, 2013 Filing 143 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amended sealed amicus curiae brief [138] filed by Amicus Curiae The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser; referring motion to file supplemental appendix [138] filed by Amicus Curiae The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, FILED. [863728][143] [12-3200] [Entered: 03/04/2013 02:59 PM]
February 27, 2013 Filing 138 MOTION, to file amended sealed amicus curiae brief, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Morton Beebe, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara, Graphic Artists Guild, Ed Kashi, David W. Moser, North American Nature Photography Association, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., Professional Photographers of America, Al Satterwhite, John Schmelzer, Leif Skoogfors, Simms Taback and The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/27/2013 by CM/ECF. [859475] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/28/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/27/2013 07:39 PM]
February 25, 2013 Filing 136 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file amicus curiae brief [130] filed by Movant The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, by CFD, FILED. [855874][136] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/25/2013 02:54 PM]
February 25, 2013 Filing 131 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL [120], [129], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Dramatists Guild, The Dramatists Legal Defense Fund, The National Writers' Union, The Romance Writers of America, The Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, The Songwriters Guild of America and The Text and Academic Authors Association, FILED.[854837] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/25/2013 08:51 AM]
February 22, 2013 Filing 130 MOTION to extend time, on behalf of Movant The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, FILED. Service date02/22/2013 by CM/ECF.[854741] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/25/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/22/2013 09:21 PM]
February 22, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Dramatists Guild, The Dramatists Legal Defense Fund, The National Writers' Union, The Romance Writers of America, The Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, The Songwriters Guild of America and The Text and Academic Authors Association, FILED. Service date 02/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [854676] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/25/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/22/2013 05:43 PM]
February 22, 2013 Filing 128 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Michael J. Boni, Esq. for Appellee Betty Miles, Joseph Goulden, Jim Bouton and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 02/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [854619] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/22/2013 04:51 PM]
February 22, 2013 Filing 127 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Seth P. Waxman for Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [854414] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/22/2013 03:47 PM]
February 22, 2013 Filing 126 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file amicus curiae brief [88] filed by Movant The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, by CFD, FILED. [853901][126] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/22/2013 12:32 PM]
February 22, 2013 Filing 123 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Seth P. Waxman for Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [853163] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/22/2013 08:50 AM]
February 21, 2013 Filing 120 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [105], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Dramatists Guild, The Dramatists Legal Defense Fund, The National Writers' Union, The Romance Writers of America, The Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, The Songwriters Guild of America and The Text and Academic Authors Association, FILED.[852379] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/21/2013 12:29 PM]
February 21, 2013 Filing 119 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Dramatists Guild, The Dramatists Legal Defense Fund, The National Writers' Union, The Romance Writers of America, The Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, The Songwriters Guild of America and The Text and Academic Authors Association, ADDED.[852322] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/21/2013 12:00 PM]
February 20, 2013 Filing 116 SUPPLEMENTAL PAPERS TO MOTION, on behalf of Movant The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser , FILED. Service date02/20/2013 by CM/ECF.[850527] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/21/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/20/2013 11:15 AM]
February 19, 2013 Filing 111 ATTORNEY, Randolph Daniel Moss for Google, Inc., in case 12-3200 , [104], ADDED.[849324] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/19/2013 01:11 PM]
February 19, 2013 Filing 110 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., ADDED.[849317] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/19/2013 01:07 PM]
February 19, 2013 Filing 108 ATTORNEY, James J. McGuire for John Schmelzer The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc. Leif Skoogfors David W. Moser Graphic Artists Guild Leland Bobbe John Francis Ficara Picture Archive Council of America, Inc. Ed Kashi North American Nature Photography Association Morton Beebe Al Satterwhite Professional Photographers of America Simms Taback, in case 12-3200 , [91], ADDED.[849236] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/19/2013 12:38 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 107 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848383] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/26/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 06:31 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 106 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Dramatists Guild, The Dramatists Legal Defense Fund, The National Writers' Union, The Romance Writers of America, The Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, The Songwriters Guild of America and The Text and Academic Authors Association, FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848382] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/21/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 06:29 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Dramatists Guild, The Dramatists Legal Defense Fund, The National Writers' Union, The Romance Writers of America, The Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, The Songwriters Guild of America and The Text and Academic Authors Association, FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848380] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/21/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 06:26 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848371] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/15/2013 05:32 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 103 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [84] filed by Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. [848271][103] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/15/2013 04:30 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 101 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848166] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/19/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 03:44 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848151] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/19/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 03:37 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848013] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/19/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 02:48 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [847987] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/19/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 02:37 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 96 REPLY TO OPPOSITION, on behalf of Movants The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, FILED. Service date02/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[847875] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/19/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 01:41 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 95 ATTORNEY, Ari Holtzblatt for Google, Inc., in case 12-3200 , [83], ADDED.[847818] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/15/2013 01:19 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 94 ATTORNEY, Joshua David Snyder for Joseph Goulden Betty Miles The Authors Guild Jim Bouton, in case 12-3200 , [82], ADDED.[847816] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/15/2013 01:18 PM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movants The American Sockety of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [847312] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/19/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 10:35 AM]
February 15, 2013 Filing 90 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to extend time [88], on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [847301][90] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/15/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/15/2013 10:31 AM]
February 14, 2013 Filing 88 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Movant The American Sockety of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, FILED. Service date 02/14/2013 by CM/ECF.[846724] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/15/2013 by KG] [Entered: 02/14/2013 04:06 PM]
February 14, 2013 Filing 87 NEW PARTY, Movant The American Sockety of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara and David W. Moser, ADDED.[846681] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/14/2013 03:56 PM]
February 14, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, Inc., North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Leif Skoogfors, Al Satterwhite, Morton Beebe, Ed Kashi, John Schmelzer, Simms Taback, Leland Bobbe, John Francis Ficara, and David W. Moser, FILED. Service date 02/14/2013 by CM/ECF. [846550] [12-3200]--[Edited 02/14/2013 by DH] [Entered: 02/14/2013 03:20 PM]
February 11, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [843900] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/11/2013 06:17 PM]
February 10, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/10/2013 by CM/ECF. [842620] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/10/2013 06:48 PM]
February 8, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden and Betty Miles, FILED. Service date 02/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [842607] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/08/2013 06:09 PM]
February 8, 2013 Filing 81 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden and Betty Miles, FILED. Service date 02/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [842606] [12-3200] [Entered: 02/08/2013 05:57 PM]
November 28, 2012 Filing 78 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to to extend time to file amicus curiae brief filed by Movant Electronic Arts, Inc., Pinterest, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc.[43], by RKW, FILED. [780445][78] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/28/2012 03:20 PM]
November 26, 2012 Filing 72 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild Brief due date as 02/08/2013, FILED.[776656] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/26/2012 10:51 AM]
November 21, 2012 Filing 70 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [67], on behalf of Movant Electronic Arts, Inc., Pinterest, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc., FILED. Service date 11/21/2012 by CM/ECF.[776229][70] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/21/2012 06:28 PM]
November 21, 2012 Filing 67 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file amicus curiae brief [43], on behalf of Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 11/21/2012 by CM/ECF. [776078][67] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/21/2012 03:53 PM]
November 19, 2012 Filing 63 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, informing Court of proposed due date 02/08/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 11/19/2012 by CM/ECF.[772901] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/19/2012 02:54 PM]
November 19, 2012 Filing 62 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Academic Authors, ADDED.[772742] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/19/2012 01:23 PM]
November 19, 2012 Filing 61 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, ADDED.[772738] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/19/2012 01:19 PM]
November 16, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Academic Authors, FILED. Service date 11/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [771728] [12-3200]--[Edited 11/19/2012 by KG] [Entered: 11/16/2012 04:28 PM]
November 16, 2012 Filing 57 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Academic Authors, FILED. Service date 11/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [771713] [12-3200]--[Edited 11/19/2012 by KG] [Entered: 11/16/2012 04:26 PM]
November 16, 2012 Filing 55 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 11/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [771350] [12-3200]--[Edited 11/19/2012 by KG] [Entered: 11/16/2012 03:02 PM]
November 16, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 11/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [771336] [12-3200]--[Edited 11/19/2012 by KG] [Entered: 11/16/2012 02:58 PM]
November 16, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 11/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [771326] [12-3200]--[Edited 11/19/2012 by KG] [Entered: 11/16/2012 02:52 PM]
November 16, 2012 Filing 45 NEW PARTY, Movant Electronic Arts, Inc., Pinterest, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc., ADDED.[770448] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/16/2012 09:57 AM]
November 15, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION, to extend time to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Movant Electronic Arts, Inc., Pinterest, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc., FILED. Service date11/14/2012 by CM/ECF.[768703] [12-3200]--[Edited 11/16/2012 by KG] [Entered: 11/15/2012 02:23 AM]
November 15, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Electronic Arts, Inc., Pinterest, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc. , FILED. Service date 11/14/2012 by CM/ECF. [768702] [12-3200]--[Edited 11/16/2012 by KG] [Entered: 11/15/2012 02:20 AM]
November 9, 2012 Filing 51 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. [771214] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/16/2012 02:01 PM]
November 9, 2012 Filing 41 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 4, (pp. 782-930), on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/09/2012 by CM/ECF.[764950] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/09/2012 08:47 PM]
November 9, 2012 Filing 40 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 4, (pp. 508-781), on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/09/2012 by CM/ECF.[764949] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/09/2012 08:47 PM]
November 9, 2012 Filing 39 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 4, (pp. 226-507), on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/09/2012 by CM/ECF.[764948] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/09/2012 08:46 PM]
November 9, 2012 Filing 38 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 4, (pp. 1-225), on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/09/2012 by CM/ECF.[764946] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/09/2012 08:45 PM]
November 9, 2012 Filing 37 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/09/2012 by CM/ECF. [764945] [12-3200] [Entered: 11/09/2012 08:37 PM]
October 1, 2012 Filing 35 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 10/18/2012, Start Time: 11:30 AM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[734635] [12-3200] [Entered: 10/01/2012 02:59 PM]
September 28, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[732576] [12-3200] [Entered: 09/28/2012 09:24 AM]
September 28, 2012 Filing 33 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Google, Inc. Brief due date as 11/09/2012; Joint Appendix due date as 11/09/2012, FILED.[732568] [12-3200] [Entered: 09/28/2012 09:22 AM]
September 17, 2012 Filing 30 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 09/17/2012, to SDNY, ISSUED.[721432] [12-3200] [Entered: 09/17/2012 10:54 AM]
September 17, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to stay [17] filed by Appellant Google, Inc., by RJL, FILED. [721370][29] [12-3200] [Entered: 09/17/2012 10:29 AM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Robert Joseph LaRocca for Joseph Goulden Betty Miles The Authors Guild Jim Bouton, in case 12-3200 , [23], ADDED.[719183] [12-3200] [Entered: 09/13/2012 02:35 PM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 09/13/2012 by CM/ECF. [718800] [12-3200] [Entered: 09/13/2012 11:25 AM]
September 12, 2012 Filing 22 NON OPPOSITION RESPONSE to [17], on behalf of Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 09/12/2012 by CM/ECF. [718280][22] [12-3200] [Entered: 09/12/2012 05:30 PM]
September 11, 2012 Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 11/09/2012, RECEIVED. Service date 09/11/2012 by CM/ECF.[716603] [12-3200] [Entered: 09/11/2012 02:53 PM]
September 10, 2012 Filing 17 MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/10/2012 by CM/ECF. [715590] [12-3200] [Entered: 09/10/2012 11:25 PM]
August 29, 2012 Filing 16 NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Gay, ASSIGNED.[705611] [12-3200] [Entered: 08/29/2012 10:10 AM]
August 29, 2012 Filing 15 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 10/02/2012, Start Time: 3:00 PM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[705511] [12-3200] [Entered: 08/29/2012 09:40 AM]
August 28, 2012 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[705292] [12-3200] [Entered: 08/28/2012 05:33 PM]
August 28, 2012 Filing 10 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[704898] [12-3200] [Entered: 08/28/2012 03:06 PM]
August 28, 2012 Filing 9 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[704895] [12-3200] [Entered: 08/28/2012 03:05 PM]
August 28, 2012 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 08/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[704787] [12-3200] [Entered: 08/28/2012 02:20 PM]
August 16, 2012 Filing 7 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., district court receipt # 465401046514, FILED.[694755] [12-3200] [Entered: 08/16/2012 03:39 PM]
August 14, 2012 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/11/2012, RECEIVED.[691069] [12-3200]
August 14, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Google, Inc., FILED. [691059] [12-3200]

Search for this case: The Authors Guild v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Mitgang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hoffman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Publishers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearson Education, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wiley & Sons, Inc., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian Standard Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Betty Miles
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Joseph Goulden, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Jim Bouton
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: The Authors Guild
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?