In re Payment Card Interchange
Petitioner: Robersons Fine Jewelry, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076 JG JO, QVC, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4728-JG-JO, GMRI, Inc., Keithco Petroleum, Inc., BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-3800 JG-JO, Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Plaintiffs in Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081JG JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677 - JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3924 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Gulfside Casino Partnership. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-03225 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3925-JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2532 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Mastercard Incorporated et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in Civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5074 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-5153 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5885 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5075 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-5882 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131-JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action BKS. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-2264-JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv- 4799 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5880 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Performance Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5869 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al . 05-cv-5866 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5871 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5073 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action 06-cv-5583, Esdacy, INC. v. Visa USA, INC. et al, Keith Superstores, BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC., Plaintiffs in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-CV-5069 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO
Appellant: Speedway LLC, BonTon Stores, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Chico's FAS, Inc., American Booksellers Association, David's Bridal, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Panera Bread Company, J. Crew Group, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Barnes & Nobles, Inc, BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., Discover Bank, Macy's Inc., Martin's Super Markets, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Discover Home Loans, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Target Corporation, American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., Nike, Incorporated, HMSHost Corporation, Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., The Gap, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, CKE Restaurants, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, Papa Johns International, Inc., DFS Services, LLC, Aldo US Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., The Wendy's Company, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Michaels Stores, Inc., Stein Mart, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., National Association of College Stores, National Retail Federation, Dillard's, Inc., The Wet Seal, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Academy, Ltd., Genesco Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., National Railroad Passenger Corporation, General Nutrition Corporation, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., C.S. Ross Company, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Staples, Inc., Home Depot USA, Inc., Family Dollar, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Office Depot, Incorporated, Kohl's Corporation, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., L Brands, Inc. and 7-Eleven
Intervenor: Mary Watson and American Express
Plaintiff / Appellant: National Association of Truck Stop Operators, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc., National Cooperative Grocers Association, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Grocers Association, Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc. and NATSO, Incorporated
Defendant / Appellee: Defendants in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2532 JG-JO, Defendants in civil case Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et a 05-cv-5153 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5880 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Gulfside Casino Partnership. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-03225 JG-JO, Capital One, F.S.B., JPMorgan Chase & Co., National City Bank of Kentucky, Defendants in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974-JG-JO, Wachovia Bank, National Association, Defendants in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131 JG-JO, Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC, Defendants in civil action Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG -JO, Citibank, N.A., Defendants in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5871 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4799- JG-JO, Barclays Financial Corp., Landers Harley-Davidson Little Rock, Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO, Citigroup Inc., Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc., Defendants in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5073-JG-JO, Barclays Bank PLC, Defendants in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5885, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., First National Bank of Omaha, Defendants in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05--cv-4728 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S. A, Inc. et al, 05-cv-3924 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO, Wells Fargo & Company, Fifth Third Bancorp, Visa International Service Association, Juniper Financial Corporation, Defendants in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO, Sun Trust Banks, Inc., Defendants in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5074-JG-JO, Republic of Argentina, Defendants in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc,. et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Performace Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al 05-cv-5869 JG-JO, Defendants in civil actionNational Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Visa U.S.A. Inc., Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Bank of America Corporation, Defendants in civil action BKS. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-2264-JG-JO, Discover, Defendants in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5882 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677-JG-JO, M.C.E.S., Inc., Defendants in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO, HSBC Finance Corporation, Defendants in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action 06-cv-5583, Esdacy, INC. v. Visa USA, INC. et al, Mastercard Incorporated, Chase Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Defendants in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 -JG-JO, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Defendants in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-03925 JG-JO, Defendants iin civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al. v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al. 05-cv-5866, Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-03800, Defendants in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO, National City Corporation, Capital One Financial Corporation, Defendants in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5069-JG-JO, Wachovia Corporation, Barclays Bank Delaware and Washington Mutual, Inc.
Case Number: 13-4750
Filed: December 13, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2017 Filing 500 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 03/27/2017, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 16-710, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[1999322] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 03/28/2017 03:19 PM]
November 30, 2016 Filing 499 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 11/29/2016, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 16-710, RECEIVED.[1917062] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/30/2016 03:40 PM]
October 25, 2016 Filing 498 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting American Express in 12-4671 extension to file Writ of Certiorari, FILED.[1896228] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/31/2016 01:59 PM]
September 23, 2016 Filing 497 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellant 1001 Property Solutions LLC in 12-4671 extension to file Writ of Certiorari, FILED.[1871958] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/27/2016 02:32 PM]
September 7, 2016 Filing 496 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 09/07/2016, to EDNY (BROOKLYN), ISSUED.[1857999] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/07/2016 03:38 PM]
September 7, 2016 Filing 495 STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, National Retail Federation, Retail Industry Leaders Association, TASQ Technology, Inc., TRS Recovery Services Inc. and Telecheck Services Inc. in 12-4671, R&M Objectors in 14-837, FILED.[1857913] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/07/2016 02:54 PM]
August 30, 2016 Filing 492 DISTRICT COURT ROA, to , RETURNED.[1852637] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] 4 boxes returned to E.D.N.Y ( bklyn) [Entered: 08/30/2016 02:13 PM]
July 29, 2016 Filing 489 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1828162] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/29/2016 07:52 AM]
July 27, 2016 Filing 488 CURED DEFECTIVE ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS [ # 484 ], [ # 1816203-2 ], on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation in 12-4671, FILED.[1825873] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/27/2016 08:54 AM]
July 20, 2016 Filing 487 ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of R&M Objectors in 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 07/20/2016 by CM/ECF.[1820747] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/20/2016 02:46 PM]
July 14, 2016 Filing 485 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing en banc [ # 479 ] filed by Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc. and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, by DJ, FILED. [1815606][485] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/14/2016 12:48 PM]
July 13, 2016 Filing 484 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, [ # 1814404-2 ], on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., TRS Recovery Services Inc. and Telecheck Services In12-4671, FILED.[1814569] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/13/2016 02:30 PM]
July 13, 2016 Filing 483 CURED DEFECTIVE ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS [ # 1814404-2 ], on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation in 12-4671, FILED.[1814560] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/13/2016 02:25 PM]
July 8, 2016 Filing 479 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 07/08/2016 by CM/ECF. [1811142] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/08/2016 02:45 PM]
June 30, 2016 Filing 478 JUDGMENT, FILED.[1806841] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/30/2016 04:44 PM]
June 30, 2016 Filing 476 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/30/2016, to EDNY (BROOKLYN), ISSUED.[1806109] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/30/2016 10:10 AM]
June 30, 2016 Filing 474 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ahronda Crossman, ASSIGNED.[1806096] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/30/2016 10:04 AM]
June 30, 2016 Filing 473 OPINION, Concurring, by judge LEVAL, FILED.[1806093] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/30/2016 10:03 AM]
June 30, 2016 Filing 472 OPINION, vacating the district courts certification of the class, reversing approval of the settlement and remanding for further proceedings not inconsistent with this opinion, by RK, DJ, PNL, FILED.[1806068] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837].[1806077] [Entered: 06/30/2016 09:56 AM]
February 19, 2016 Filing 465 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Anthony La Grassa, TRANSMITTED.[1709939] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 02/22/2016 03:04 PM]
February 18, 2016 Filing 464 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1708027] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 02/18/2016 05:37 PM]
February 11, 2016 Filing 463 ARGUMENT CD, picked up by Jonathan Hartnett, TRANSMITTED.[1707593] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 02/18/2016 02:33 PM]
January 29, 2016 Filing 462 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from HUNTON AND WILLIAMS, with fee, RECEIVED.[1694178] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 01/29/2016 08:49 AM]
December 4, 2015 Filing 461 ATTORNEY, Lisl Joanne Dunlop, for Appellee Barclays Bank Delaware, Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Financial Corp., TERMINATED.[1656743] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/04/2015 12:23 PM]
November 24, 2015 Filing 460 POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot USA, Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, National Restaurant Association, Nike, Incorporated, Office Depot, Incorporated, OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread Company, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF. [1650900] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/24/2015 07:28 PM]
November 24, 2015 Filing 459 POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc. in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF. [1650880] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/24/2015 05:54 PM]
November 24, 2015 Filing 458 POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF. [1650853] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/24/2015 05:14 PM]
November 24, 2015 Filing 457 POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 12-4671, Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, -- Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF. [1650201] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/24/2015 01:57 PM]
November 10, 2015 Filing 456 CORRECTED LETTER, directing counsel to file letter briefs no later than 11/24/2015 , SENT.[1639360] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/10/2015 05:36 PM]
November 10, 2015 Filing 455 LETTER, directing counsel to submit letter briefs by no later than 11/24/2015 , SENT.[1639343] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/10/2015 05:10 PM]
November 6, 2015 Filing 454 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 11/06/2015, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 11/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1636752] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/06/2015 11:43 AM]
October 29, 2015 Filing 453 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM STONEHILL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC, with fee, RECEIVED.[1631055] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/29/2015 03:36 PM]
October 22, 2015 Filing 452 ARGUMENT CD, sent regular mail to Gary B. Friedman TRANSMITTED.[1625927] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/22/2015 04:10 PM]
October 22, 2015 Filing 451 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, by Gary Friedman with fee, RECEIVED.[1625921] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/22/2015 04:09 PM]
October 22, 2015 Filing 450 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Anahit Samarjian, TRANSMITTED.[1625920] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/22/2015 04:09 PM]
October 20, 2015 Filing 449 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM PERKINS COIE, with fee, RECEIVED.[1623870] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/20/2015 04:37 PM]
October 19, 2015 Filing 447 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Banks C. Ladd, TRANSMITTED.[1622116] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/19/2015 11:50 AM]
October 16, 2015 Filing 446 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 10/16/2015, disposing of the appeal to EDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1621509] [14-331] [Entered: 10/16/2015 04:29 PM]
October 16, 2015 Filing 445 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appeal [ # 1616955-2 ] filed by Appellant Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc., by DJ, FILED. [1621504][445] [14-331] [Entered: 10/16/2015 04:26 PM]
October 16, 2015 Filing 444 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[1621497] [14-331] [Entered: 10/16/2015 04:21 PM]
October 14, 2015 Filing 441 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Eric Lewis, TRANSMITTED.[1618998] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/14/2015 03:05 PM]
October 13, 2015 Filing 440 ARGUMENT CD, picked up at the counter by Kaye Scholer LLP, TRANSMITTED.[1617949] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/13/2015 02:41 PM]
October 13, 2015 Filing 439 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM KAYE SCHOLER, with fee, RECEIVED.[1617939] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/13/2015 02:37 PM]
October 13, 2015 Filing 438 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Peter B. McGowan, TRANSMITTED.[1617876] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/13/2015 02:00 PM]
October 13, 2015 Filing 437 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Jennifer M. Selendy, TRANSMITTED.[1617866] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/13/2015 01:55 PM]
October 6, 2015 Filing 435 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM LEWIS BAACH PLLC, with fee, RECEIVED.[1613698] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/06/2015 12:37 PM]
October 5, 2015 Filing 429 ARGUMENT CD, sent to James Sulentic, TRANSMITTED.[1612768] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/05/2015 12:51 PM]
October 2, 2015 Filing 431 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Stone Lion Capital Partners, TRANSMITTED.[1612783] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/05/2015 12:57 PM]
October 2, 2015 Filing 430 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Denise Lazar, TRANSMITTED.[1612771] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/05/2015 12:52 PM]
October 2, 2015 Filing 428 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM KIRKLAND AND ELLIS, with fee, RECEIVED.[1612205] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/02/2015 04:45 PM]
October 2, 2015 Filing 427 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from Peter B. McGowan - Sidley Austion LLP with fee, RECEIVED.[1612074] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/02/2015 03:26 PM]
October 2, 2015 Filing 426 LETTER, in response to the Merchant-Appellants letter, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 10/02/2015 by CM/ECF.[1611478] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 10/02/2015 by JW] [Entered: 10/02/2015 09:42 AM]
October 1, 2015 Filing 425 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM BARNES AND THORNBURG, with fee, RECEIVED.[1610917] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/01/2015 01:43 PM]
October 1, 2015 Filing 424 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1610911] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/01/2015 01:38 PM]
September 29, 2015 Filing 434 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Brian Graifman, TRANSMITTED.[1612803] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/05/2015 01:09 PM]
September 29, 2015 Filing 433 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Deborah Arbabi, TRANSMITTED.[1612801] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/05/2015 01:08 PM]
September 29, 2015 Filing 432 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Yoo-Nah Park, TRANSMITTED.[1612787] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/05/2015 01:00 PM]
September 29, 2015 Filing 423 LETTER, dated 09/29/2015, regarding a response to a request during oral argument, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 09/29/2015 by CM/ECF.[1609045] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 09/29/2015 by DH] [Entered: 09/29/2015 03:45 PM]
September 29, 2015 Filing 422 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from Stone Lion Capital Partners L.P. with fee, RECEIVED.[1608812] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/29/2015 01:33 PM]
September 29, 2015 Filing 421 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, by Berger & Montague, P.C. with fee, RECEIVED.[1608591] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/29/2015 11:21 AM]
September 29, 2015 Filing 420 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP with fee, RECEIVED.[1608588] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/29/2015 11:20 AM]
September 29, 2015 Filing 419 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, by Miller Chevalier with fee, RECEIVED.[1608579] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/29/2015 11:17 AM]
September 28, 2015 Filing 418 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM CONSTANTINE CANNON, with fee, RECEIVED.[1608167] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/28/2015 04:42 PM]
September 28, 2015 Filing 417 CASE, before RKW, DJ, PNL, C.JJ., HEARD.[1607697] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/28/2015 11:32 AM]
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER, dated 09/25/2015, granting Appellant The Gymboree Corporation, motion to withdraw from the appeal in 13-4719, FILED [1607281] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/25/2015 04:44 PM]
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER, dated 09/25/2015, granting Appellant J. Crew Group, Inc., motion to withdraw from the appeal in 13-4719, FILED.[1607170] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/25/2015 03:46 PM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 409 ATTORNEY, Patrick J. Coughlin for Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Traditions, Ltd.[ # 408 ], ADDED.[1601426] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/18/2015 08:45 AM]
September 17, 2015 Filing 408 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. and Payless Shoe Source, Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 09/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1601378] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/17/2015 06:09 PM]
September 17, 2015 Filing 407 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from BORAH GOLDSTEIN ET AL, with fee, RECEIVED.[1600714] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 09/17/2015 10:38 AM]
August 26, 2015 Filing 406 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 08/26/2015, disposing of the appeal to EDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1585629] [14-303] [Entered: 08/26/2015 03:43 PM]
August 26, 2015 Filing 405 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appeal [ # 1538313-2 ] filed by Appellant Furniture Row BC, Inc. and Furniture Row, LLC, FILED. [1585614][405] [14-303] [Entered: 08/26/2015 03:39 PM]
August 25, 2015 Filing 401 LETTER, responding to Appellant's letter, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 08/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1584737] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 08/26/2015 by JW] [Entered: 08/25/2015 06:02 PM]
August 19, 2015 Filing 398 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant National Retail Federation and Retail Industry Leaders Association in 12-4671, Appellant National Retail Federation in 14-32, Appellant Retail Industry Leaders Association in 14-497, FILED. Service date 08/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1580009] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 08/19/2015 01:03 PM]
August 18, 2015 Filing 397 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED by Crowell Moring.[1578535] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 08/18/2015 09:46 AM]
August 12, 2015 Filing 396 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Mastercard Incorporated in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 08/12/2015 by CM/ECF. [1575097] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 08/12/2015 06:25 PM]
July 22, 2015 Filing 395 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal ASSIGNED.[1560142] [13-4719] [Entered: 07/22/2015 04:06 PM]
July 22, 2015 Filing 394 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 07/22/2015, disposing of the appeal to EDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1560132] [13-4719] [Entered: 07/22/2015 04:03 PM]
July 22, 2015 Filing 393 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appeal on behalf of Objector-Appellant Kwik Trip, Inc [ # 1556188-2 ], FILED. [1560119][393] [13-4719] [Entered: 07/22/2015 04:00 PM]
July 21, 2015 Filing 391 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Hearing Date Acknowledgment [ # 389 ], on behalf of Appellant ANCA 7 LLC, Accertify, Inc., American Express Co., American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Amex Assurance Company and Serve Virtual Enterprises, Inc. in 12-4671, FILED.[1559081] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/21/2015 03:52 PM]
July 21, 2015 Filing 390 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of First Data Corporation in 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 07/21/2015 by CM/ECF. [1558930] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/21/2015 02:55 PM]
July 21, 2015 Filing 389 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Hearing Date , [ # 1558854-2 ], on behalf of Appellant ANCA 7 LLC, Accertify, Inc., American Express Co., American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Amex Assurance Company and Serve Virtual Enterprises, Inc. in 12-4671, FILED.[1558919] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/21/2015 02:48 PM]
July 17, 2015 Filing 388 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 07/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1557093] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/17/2015 04:55 PM]
July 17, 2015 Filing 387 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 07/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1556780] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/17/2015 02:01 PM]
July 16, 2015 Filing 385 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc. and Citicorp in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 07/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1556177] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/16/2015 06:41 PM]
July 16, 2015 Filing 384 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1555850] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/16/2015 03:17 PM]
July 9, 2015 Filing 378 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 09/28/2015,A Panel, SET.[1550278] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/09/2015 03:59 PM]
July 7, 2015 Filing 375 LETTER, advising the Court of afternoons counsel cannot argue, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 07/07/2015 by CM/ECF.[1547946] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 07/07/2015 by JW] [Entered: 07/07/2015 03:13 PM]
June 16, 2015 Filing 373 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 09/28/2015, A, PROPOSED.[1533272] [12-4671 ...] [Entered: 06/16/2015 10:25 AM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 371 ATTORNEY, Joseph William Clark, for Appellee National City Corporation and National City Bank of Kentucky, TERMINATED.[1525802] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/05/2015 12:17 PM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 370 LETTER, advising the Court of withdrawing counsel, on behalf of Appellee National City Corporation and National City Bank of Kentucky in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 06/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1525773] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 06/05/2015 by JW] [Entered: 06/05/2015 12:04 PM]
May 29, 2015 Filing 369 MOTION, to substitute attorney, on behalf of Appellee National City Bank of Kentucky in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 05/29/2015 by CM/ECF. [1521073] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 05/29/2015 05:39 PM]
May 14, 2015 Filing 368 LETTER, advising the Court of dates counsel cannot argue, on behalf of Appellant Daviss Donuts and Deli, Orange County Bldg Materials and Top Gun Wrecker in 12-4671, 14-349, -- Bishop, Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc. and Appellant Daviss Donuts and Deli, Orange County Bldg Materials and Top Gun Wrecker in 14-404, -- Bishop and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc. in 14-443, 14-663, RECEIVED. Service date 05/14/2015 by CM/ECF.[1510230] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 05/14/2015 by JW] [Entered: 05/14/2015 02:04 PM]
April 1, 2015 Filing 366 ATTORNEY, Sarah Sandok Rabinovici, for Appellant Sunoco Inc., TERMINATED.[1473993] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 04/01/2015 08:50 AM]
March 31, 2015 Filing 365 LETTER, advising the Court of "inappropriate communications" between counsel, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, National Restaurant Association, Nike, Incorporated, Office Depot, Incorporated, OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread Company, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 12-4671, RECEIVED. Service date 03/31/2015 by CM/ECF.[1473826] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 03/31/2015 by JW] [Entered: 03/31/2015 04:28 PM]
March 30, 2015 Filing 364 ATTORNEY, Ali Stoeppelwerth, for Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation and HSBC North America Holdings Inc., TERMINATED.[1472648] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 03/30/2015 04:34 PM]
March 6, 2015 Filing 361 ATTORNEY, Candice Chiu Wong for Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd., TERMINATED.[1454834] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 03/06/2015 04:12 PM]
March 6, 2015 Filing 360 LETTER, withdrawing counsel's appearance, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 03/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1454803] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 03/06/2015 by JW] [Entered: 03/06/2015 04:00 PM]
February 26, 2015 Filing 357 LETTER, advising the Court of dates counsel cannot argue, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Incorporated, Office Depot, Incorporated, OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread Company, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 12-4671, RECEIVED. Service date 02/26/2015 by CM/ECF.[1447269] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 02/26/2015 by JW] [Entered: 02/26/2015 12:43 PM]
February 20, 2015 Filing 355 LETTER, advising the Court of dates counsel cannot argue, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 02/20/2015 by CM/ECF.[1443169] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 02/23/2015 by JW] [Entered: 02/20/2015 05:15 PM]
February 20, 2015 Filing 354 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Traditions, Ltd., Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO and Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO in 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Traditions, Ltd., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC and Leons Transmission Service, Inc. in 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Traditions, Ltd., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC and Leons Transmission Service, Inc. in 14-837, FILED. Service date 02/20/2015 by CM/ECF. [1443126] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 02/20/2015 04:52 PM]
February 19, 2015 Filing 352 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Traditions, Ltd., Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO and Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO in 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Traditions, Ltd., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC and Leons Transmission Service, Inc. in 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Traditions, Ltd., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC and Leons Transmission Service, Inc. in 14-837, FILED. Service date 02/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1442033] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 02/19/2015 03:59 PM]
February 13, 2015 Filing 351 ATTORNEY, Keila D. Ravelo, for Appellee Mastercard Incorporated and Mastercard International Incorporated, TERMINATED.[1437549] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 02/13/2015 10:05 AM]
January 28, 2015 Filing 350 ATTORNEY, Bonny E. Sweeney, for Plaintiff-Appellee Photos Etc. Corporation, Traditions, Ltd, Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Discount Optics, Inc., Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Parkway Corp., and Payless ShoeSource, Inc., TERMINATED.[1424132] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 01/28/2015 09:17 AM]
January 26, 2015 Filing 349 LETTER, withdrawing counsel Sweeney's appearance, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. and Payless Shoe Source, Inc. in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 01/26/2015 by CM/ECF.[1423936] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 01/28/2015 by JW] [Entered: 01/26/2015 06:15 PM]
January 5, 2015 Filing 347 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant The Iron Barley Restaurant in 12-4671, 14-133, 14-443, 14-663, FILED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1407207] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 01/05/2015 01:18 PM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 343 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. and United States Public Research Interest Group in 12-4671, Appellant United States Public Research Interest Group in 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1402316] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/23/2014 05:10 PM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 342 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. and United States Public Research Interest Group in 12-4671, Appellant United States Public Research Interest Group in 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1402312] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/23/2014 05:07 PM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 341 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1402301] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/23/2014 05:01 PM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 340 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1402293] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/23/2014 04:56 PM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 339 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant National Retail Federation and Retail Industry Leaders Association in 12-4671, Appellant National Retail Federation in 14-32, Appellant Retail Industry Leaders Association in 14-497, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1401991] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/23/2014 03:14 PM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 338 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant National Retail Federation and Retail Industry Leaders Association in 12-4671, Appellant National Retail Federation in 14-32, Appellant Retail Industry Leaders Association in 14-497, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1401912] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/23/2014 02:41 PM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 337 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1401865] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/23/2014 02:27 PM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 336 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, 14-119, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1401790] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/23/2014 01:50 PM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 335 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, 14-119, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1401786] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/23/2014 01:46 PM]
December 22, 2014 Filing 334 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant The Iron Barley Restaurant in 12-4671, 14-133, 14-443, 14-663, FILED. Service date 12/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1400584] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/22/2014 03:38 PM]
December 22, 2014 Filing 333 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 12-4671, Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, 14-567, FILED. Service date 12/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1400572] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/22/2014 03:35 PM]
December 22, 2014 Filing 332 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 12-4671, Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, 14-567, FILED. Service date 12/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1400560] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/22/2014 03:32 PM]
December 22, 2014 Filing 331 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Co., American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Serve Virtual Enterprises, Inc., ANCA 7 LLC, Accertify, Inc. and Amex Assurance Company in 12-4671, 14-117, FILED. Service date 12/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1400274] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/22/2014 01:15 PM]
December 22, 2014 Filing 330 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Co., American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Serve Virtual Enterprises, Inc., ANCA 7 LLC, Accertify, Inc., and Amex Assurance Company in 12-4671, 14-117, FILED. Service date 12/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1400265] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 12/22/2014 by JW] [Entered: 12/22/2014 01:08 PM]
December 19, 2014 Filing 344 SEALED FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. [1405139] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/30/2014 03:30 PM]
December 19, 2014 Filing 329 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation and TRS Recovery Services Inc. in 12-4671, Appellant First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc. and Telecheck Services Inc. in 14-192, FILED. Service date 12/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1399557] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/19/2014 07:14 PM]
December 19, 2014 Filing 328 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation in 12-4671, Appellant First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., Telecheck Services Inc. and TRS Recovery Services Inc. in 14-192, FILED. Service date 12/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1399556] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/19/2014 07:08 PM]
December 19, 2014 Filing 327 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 12/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1399554] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/19/2014 07:04 PM]
December 19, 2014 Filing 326 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 12/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1399553] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/19/2014 07:00 PM]
December 19, 2014 Filing 325 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1399552] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/19/2014 06:50 PM]
December 18, 2014 Filing 324 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mastercard Incorporated and Mastercard International Incorporated in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1398054] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/18/2014 04:27 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 318 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Deferred Joint Appendix including Under Seal Portion, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389429] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 06:33 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 317 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 21 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389428] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 06:23 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 316 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 20 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389427] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 12/11/2014 by JW] [Entered: 12/09/2014 06:19 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 315 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 19 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389425] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 06:14 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 314 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 18 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389423] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 06:02 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 313 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 17 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389421] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:49 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 312 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 16 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389418] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:43 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 311 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 15 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389415] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:38 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 310 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 14 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389413] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:34 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 309 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 13 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389411] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:27 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 308 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 12 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389408] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:23 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 307 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 11 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389404] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:17 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 306 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 10 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389400] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:12 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 305 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 9 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389394] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:05 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 304 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 8 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389389] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 05:00 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 303 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 7 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389383] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 04:56 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 302 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 6 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389375] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 04:52 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 301 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 5 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389347] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 04:42 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 300 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 4 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389337] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 04:38 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 299 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 3 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389329] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 04:35 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 298 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 2 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389312] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 04:29 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 297 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 22, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1389264] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 04:17 PM]
December 9, 2014 Filing 295 MOTION, to waive a requirement, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4671, 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by CM/ECF. [1388556] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/09/2014 11:44 AM]
December 5, 2014 Filing 294 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 12/05/2014 by CM/ECF. [1385731] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/05/2014 10:37 AM]
December 4, 2014 Filing 293 LETTER, joining brief submitted by Merchant-Appellants, on behalf of Falls Auto Gallery in 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 12/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1384587] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 12/04/2014 by JW] [Entered: 12/04/2014 10:59 AM]
December 3, 2014 Filing 292 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant National Retail Federation and Retail Industry Leaders Association in 12-4671, Appellant National Retail Federation in 14-32, Appellant Retail Industry Leaders Association in 14-497, FILED. Service date 11/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1384193] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 12/03/2014 05:11 PM]
November 26, 2014 Filing 291 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery in 12-4671, 14-219, informing Court of proposed due date 11/25/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 11/26/2014 by CM/ECF.[1379756] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/26/2014 12:59 PM]
November 25, 2014 Filing 290 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Incorporated, Office Depot, Incorporated, OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread Company, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 11/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1379145] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/25/2014 09:50 PM]
November 25, 2014 Filing 289 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 11/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1379122] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/25/2014 06:33 PM]
November 25, 2014 Filing 288 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 12-4671, Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, 14-567, FILED. Service date 11/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1379107] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/25/2014 05:41 PM]
November 25, 2014 Filing 287 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. and United States Public Research Interest Group in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 11/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1379091] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/25/2014 05:10 PM]
November 25, 2014 Filing 286 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant National Retail Federation and Retail Industry Leaders Association in 12-4671, Appellant National Retail Federation in 14-32, Appellant Retail Industry Leaders Association in 14-497, FILED. Service date 11/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1379043] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/25/2014 04:38 PM]
November 25, 2014 Filing 285 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 11/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1378890] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/25/2014 03:25 PM]
November 25, 2014 Filing 284 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., American Express Co., Serve Virtual Enterprises, Inc., ANCA 7 LLC, Amex Assurance Company and Accertify, Inc. in 12-4671, 14-117, FILED. Service date 11/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1378631] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/25/2014 01:18 PM]
November 25, 2014 Filing 283 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation and First Data Government Solutions in 12-4671, 14-192, FILED. Service date 11/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1378617] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/25/2014 01:05 PM]
November 24, 2014 Filing 281 ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Wolstein[ # 280 ], in place of attorney Robert L. Begleiter, SUBSTITUTED.[1377873] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/24/2014 05:02 PM]
November 24, 2014 Filing 280 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc., National Federation of Independent Business and United States Public Research Interest Group in 12-4671, Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 14-241, Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, Consumer Union of United States, Inc. and Appellant National Federation of Independent Business in 14-480, 14-497, -- Consumer Union of United States, Inc. and National Federation of Independent Business in 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, -- Consumer Union of United States, Inc., National Federation of Independent Business and Appellant United States Public Research Interest Group in 14-837, FILED. Service date 11/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1377369] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/24/2014 02:07 PM]
November 21, 2014 Filing 278 MOTION, to extend time, to file deferred appendix, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Michaels Stores, Inc., National Cooperative Grocers Association, Recreational Equipment, Inc., Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 12-4671, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest and National Cooperative Grocers Association in 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Incorporated, Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread Company, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company and Wal-Mart Stores Inc. in 14-117, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Incorporated, Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread Company, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company and Wal-Mart Stores Inc. in 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Incorporated, Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread Company, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company and Appellant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. in 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 11/21/2014 by CM/ECF. [1376308] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/21/2014 04:02 PM]
November 13, 2014 Filing 276 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee CHS Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Traditions, Ltd., Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Leons Transmission Service, Inc. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. and Payless Shoe Source, Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 11/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1369357] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/13/2014 06:07 PM]
November 6, 2014 Filing 275 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Christopher Andres Bandas, Esq. for Appellant 1001 Property Solutions LLC and Temple Eagle Partners LLC in 12-4671, Attorney Christopher Andres Bandas, Esq. for Appellant Temple Eagle Partners LLC and 1001 Property Solutions LLC in 14-159, FILED. Service date 11/06/2014 by CM/ECF. [1364462] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/06/2014 04:22 PM]
November 6, 2014 Filing 274 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Thomas Thrash, Esq. for Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 11/06/2014 by CM/ECF. [1364264] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/06/2014 02:48 PM]
November 6, 2014 Filing 273 ATTORNEY, Matthew Eisenstein for Visa U.S.A. Inc. Visa International Service Association[ # 271 ], ADDED.[1363505] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/06/2014 09:25 AM]
November 5, 2014 Filing 272 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant 1001 Property Solutions LLC and Temple Eagle Partners LLC in 12-4671, 14-159, FILED. Service date 11/05/2014 by CM/ECF. [1363275] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/05/2014 04:29 PM]
November 5, 2014 Filing 271 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc. in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 11/05/2014 by CM/ECF. [1363129] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/05/2014 03:34 PM]
November 5, 2014 Filing 270 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Thomas Thrash, Esq. for Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 11/05/2014 by CM/ECF. [1363104] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/05/2014 03:24 PM]
November 4, 2014 Filing 269 ATTORNEY, Thomas Thrash for R&M Objectors, in case 12-4671 , [ # 268 ], ADDED.[1362125] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/04/2014 03:48 PM]
November 4, 2014 Filing 268 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of R&M Objectors in 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 11/04/2014 by CM/ECF. [1361640] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/04/2014 11:12 AM]
November 3, 2014 Filing 267 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Fifth Third Bancorp in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 11/03/2014 by CM/ECF.[1361189] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 11/03/2014 04:51 PM]
October 31, 2014 Filing 263 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, 14-119, FILED. Service date 10/31/2014 by CM/ECF. [1359986] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/31/2014 04:42 PM]
October 31, 2014 Filing 262 ATTORNEY, Richard L. Creighton for Fifth Third Bancorp[ # 260 ], ADDED.[1359961] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/31/2014 04:34 PM]
October 31, 2014 Filing 261 ATTORNEY, Richard J. Holwell for Visa U.S.A. Inc. Visa International Service Association, [ # 259 ], ADDED.[1359889] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/31/2014 03:33 PM]
October 31, 2014 Filing 260 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Fifth Third Bancorp in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/31/2014 by CM/ECF. [1359867] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/31/2014 03:25 PM]
October 31, 2014 Filing 259 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc. in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/31/2014 by CM/ECF. [1359784] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/31/2014 02:41 PM]
October 31, 2014 Filing 258 ATTORNEY, Demian Alexander Ordway for Visa U.S.A. Inc. Visa International Service Association[ # 257 ], ADDED.[1359770] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/31/2014 02:27 PM]
October 31, 2014 Filing 257 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc. in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/31/2014 by CM/ECF. [1359721] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/31/2014 01:57 PM]
October 30, 2014 Filing 256 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Anahit Samarjian, Esq. for Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., Telecheck Services Inc. and TRS Recovery Services Inc. in 12-4671, Attorney Anahit Samarjian, Esq. for Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., TRS Recovery Services Inc., First Data Government Solutions and Telecheck Services Inc. in 14-192, FILED. Service date 10/30/2014 by CM/ECF. [1358134] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/30/2014 11:48 AM]
October 30, 2014 Filing 255 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Anahit Samarjian, Esq. for Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., Telecheck Services Inc. and TRS Recovery Services Inc. in 12-4671, Attorney Anahit Samarjian, Esq. for Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., TRS Recovery Services Inc., First Data Government Solutions and Telecheck Services Inc. in 14-192, FILED. Service date 10/30/2014 by CM/ECF. [1358016] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/30/2014 11:12 AM]
October 30, 2014 Filing 254 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and Appellee NATSO, Incorporated in 12-4671, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for Appellant Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Grocers Association and Appellee NATSO, Incorporated in 12-4708, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for -- Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Grocers Association and Appellee NATSO, Incorporated in 12-4765, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for Appellant Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Grocers Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4719, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for Appellant Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Grocers Association and NATSO, Incorporated in 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for -- Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Grocers Association and Appellee NATSO, Incorporated in 14-117, 14-119, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for -- Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Grocers Association and Appellee NATSO, Incorporated in 14-133, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for -- Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Grocers Association and Appellee NATSO, Incorporated in 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for -- Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Grocers Association and Appellee NATSO, Incorporated in 14-250, 14-266, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for -- Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Grocers Association and Appellee NATSO, Incorporated in 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, Attorney Mr. Adam Owen Glist for -- Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, National Restaurant Association, Affiliated Foods Midwest, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, National Association of Convenience Stores, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Grocers Association and Appellee NATSO, Incorporated in 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/30/2014 by CM/ECF. [1357846] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/30/2014 09:58 AM]
October 30, 2014 Filing 253 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mrs. Jennifer M. Selendy, Esq. for Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, Attorney Mrs. Jennifer M. Selendy, Esq. for Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Home Loans, Inc. and Discover Bank in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, Attorney Mrs. Jennifer M. Selendy, Esq. for -- DFS Services, LLC, Discover Home Loans, Inc. and Discover Bank in 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, Attorney Mrs. Jennifer M. Selendy, Esq. for -- Discover Home Loans, Inc., Discover Bank and DFS Services, LLC in 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/30/2014 by CM/ECF. [1357787] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/30/2014 09:35 AM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 252 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Traditions, Ltd., Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO and Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO in 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Traditions, Ltd., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC and Leons Transmission Service, Inc. in 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, Attorney Paul D. Clement, Esq. for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Traditions, Ltd., CHS Inc., Crystal Rock LLC and Leons Transmission Service, Inc. in 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/29/2014 by CM/ECF. [1357621] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/29/2014 06:08 PM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 251 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Carter G. Phillips, Esq. for Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/29/2014 by CM/ECF. [1357575] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/29/2014 04:41 PM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 250 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appeal [ # 1356461-1 ], on behalf of Appellant American Booksellers Association, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., CKE Restaurants, Inc., National Association of College Stores, Papa Johns International, Inc. and Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., FILED.[1357319] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/29/2014 03:04 PM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 248 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant 1001 Property Solutions LLC and Temple Eagle Partners LLC in 12-4671, 14-159, FILED. Service date 10/29/2014 by CM/ECF. [1356829] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/29/2014 10:41 AM]
October 24, 2014 Filing 247 LETTER, joining brief submitted by Appellee Citigroup, on behalf of Appellee Fifth Third Bancorp in 12-4671, RECEIVED. Service date 10/24/2014 by CM/ECF.[1352921] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 10/24/2014 by JW] [Entered: 10/24/2014 08:41 AM]
October 23, 2014 Filing 246 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Fifth Third Bancorp in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1352168] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/23/2014 11:58 AM]
October 23, 2014 Filing 245 ATTORNEYS, Robert N. Hochman, for Citigroup Inc, Citicorp, and Citibank, N.A.; and Joseph William Clark for National City Corporation and National City Bank of Kentucky, [ # 240 ], [ # 243 ], ADDED.[1351819] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/23/2014 09:22 AM]
October 23, 2014 Filing 244 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Fifth Third Bancorp in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1351708] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/23/2014 08:33 AM]
October 22, 2014 Filing 243 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee National City Corporation and National City Bank of Kentucky in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1351640] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/22/2014 05:10 PM]
October 22, 2014 Filing 242 LETTER, joining brief submitted by Appellee Citigroup, on behalf of Appellee National City Bank of Kentucky and National City Corporation in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 10/22/2014 by CM/ECF.[1351569] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 10/23/2014 by JW] [Entered: 10/22/2014 04:28 PM]
October 22, 2014 Filing 241 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National City Bank of Kentucky and National City Corporation in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/22/2014 by CM/ECF.[1351532] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/22/2014 04:11 PM]
October 22, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1351515] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/22/2014 04:02 PM]
October 21, 2014 Filing 239 LETTER, joining brief submitted by Appellee Citigroup, on behalf of Appellee Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc. in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 10/21/2014 by CM/ECF.[1350144] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 10/23/2014 by JW] [Entered: 10/21/2014 02:51 PM]
October 20, 2014 Filing 238 ATTORNEY, William F. Cavanaugh Jr. for Wells Fargo & Company Wachovia Bank, National Association Wachovia Corporation [ # 235 ], ADDED.[1349245] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/20/2014 03:55 PM]
October 20, 2014 Filing 237 LETTER, joining brief submitted by Appellee Citigroup, on behalf of Appellee First National Bank of Omaha in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 10/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1349239] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 10/21/2014 by JW] [Entered: 10/20/2014 03:51 PM]
October 20, 2014 Filing 236 LETTER, joining brief submitted by Appellee Citigroup, on behalf of Appellee Wachovia Bank, National Association, Wachovia Corporation and Wells Fargo & Company in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 10/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1349098] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 10/21/2014 by JW] [Entered: 10/20/2014 03:02 PM]
October 20, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo & Company, Wachovia Bank, National Association and Wachovia Corporation in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/20/2014 by CM/ECF. [1349072] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 10/20/2014 02:51 PM]
October 20, 2014 Filing 234 LETTER, joining brief submitted by Appellee Citigroup, on behalf of Appellee Sun Trust Banks, Inc. in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, Sun Trust Banks, Inc. and Appellee Sun Trust Banks, Inc. in 14-837, RECEIVED. Service date 10/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1349027] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-32, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837]--[Edited 10/20/2014 by JW] [Entered: 10/20/2014 02:21 PM]
October 15, 2014 Filing 231 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee CHS Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1345377] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-663, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 10/15/2014 05:01 PM]
October 15, 2014 Filing 230 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citicorp, Citigroup Inc, Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Mastercard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, Sun Trust Banks, Inc., Wachovia Bank, National Association, Wachovia Corporation, Wells Fargo & Company, First National Bank of Omaha, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, F.S.B., Barclays Bank Delaware, Barclays Bank PLC, Chase Bank USA, N.A., Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC, Defendants iin civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5074-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5880 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al. v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al. 05-cv-5866, Defendants in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5073-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc,. et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-03925 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5885, Defendants in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5871 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-03800, Defendants in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5882 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Performace Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al 05-cv-5869 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4799- JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S. A, Inc. et al, 05-cv-3924 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5069-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05--cv-4728 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 -JG-JO, Defendants in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO, Defendants in civil actionNational Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Defendants in civil case Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et a 05-cv-5153 JG -JO, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A. Inc., Defendants in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A. Inc., National City Bank of Kentucky, National City Corporation and Fifth Third Bancorp, in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1345294] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-663, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837]--[Edited 10/23/2014 by JW] [Entered: 10/15/2014 04:33 PM]
October 15, 2014 Filing 229 ATTORNEY, Ali Stoeppelwerth for HSBC Finance Corporation HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC North America Holdings Inc., [ # 228 ], ADDED.[1344627] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-663, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 10/15/2014 12:27 PM]
October 15, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation and HSBC North America Holdings Inc. in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 10/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1344526] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-663, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 10/15/2014 11:50 AM]
October 2, 2014 Filing 226 MOTION ORDER, granting Defendants-Appellees' motion for leave to file an oversized brief of up to 19,000 words and Plaintiffs-Appellees' motion for leave to file an oversized brief of up to 20,000 words.[ # 223 ] [ # 222 ], by SLC, FILED. [1335268][226] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-663, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 10/02/2014 04:07 PM]
October 1, 2014 Filing 223 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee CHS Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, Appellee CHS Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, GMRI, Inc., Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/01/2014 by CM/ECF. [1334221] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-663, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 10/01/2014 11:13 PM]
October 1, 2014 Filing 222 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 10/01/2014 by CM/ECF. [1334095] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-663, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 10/01/2014 05:51 PM]
September 8, 2014 Filing 221 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 09/08/2014, disposing of the appeal docketed as 14-225 to EDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1314507] [14-225, 14-404, 14-663] [Entered: 09/08/2014 03:17 PM]
September 8, 2014 Filing 220 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appeal [ # 1313435-2 ] filed by Appellant Fiesta Restaurant Group, Inc. in 14-225, FILED. [1314428][220] [14-225, 14-404, 14-663] [Entered: 09/08/2014 02:41 PM]
July 10, 2014 Filing 212 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Bishop, Daviss Donuts and Deli, Orange County Bldg Materials, Top Gun Wrecker and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc. in 12-4671, 14-349, Appellant Daviss Donuts and Deli, Orange County Bldg Materials and Top Gun Wrecker in 14-404, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1267706] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-663, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 07/10/2014 11:35 AM]
July 3, 2014 Filing 211 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Bishop, Daviss Donuts and Deli, Orange County Bldg Materials, Top Gun Wrecker and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc. in 12-4671, 14-349, Appellant Daviss Donuts and Deli, Orange County Bldg Materials and Top Gun Wrecker in 14-404, FILED. Service date 07/03/2014 by CM/ECF. [1263755] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/03/2014 04:30 PM]
July 2, 2014 Filing 210 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, granting Appellees Citigroup, Inc's., Citibank, N.A's., and Citicorp's request that the briefs of all plaintiffs-appellees and defendants-appellees be due 10/15/2014, FILED.[1263401] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 07/02/2014 04:02 PM]
June 30, 2014 Filing 208 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Etc. Optical in 12-4671, 14-250, 14-443, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1260497] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/30/2014 02:30 PM]
June 30, 2014 Filing 206 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal document [ # 186 ] filed by Appellant Discover Bank, DFS Services, LLC and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, by CFD, FILED. [1259948][206] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/30/2014 09:54 AM]
June 26, 2014 Filing 204 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant The Iron Barley Restaurant in 12-4671, 14-133, 14-663, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1258387] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/26/2014 02:25 PM]
June 25, 2014 Filing 202 ATTORNEY, Mark D. Taticchi for Citibank N.A. Citigroup Inc Citicorp[ # 201 ], ADDED.[1257445] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/25/2014 02:30 PM]
June 25, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 06/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1257436] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/25/2014 02:17 PM]
June 25, 2014 Filing 200 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Etc. Optical in 12-4671, 14-250, 14-443, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1256849] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/25/2014 09:20 AM]
June 24, 2014 Filing 198 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Bishop, Daviss Donuts and Deli, Orange County Bldg Materials, Top Gun Wrecker and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc. in 12-4671, 14-349, Appellant Daviss Donuts and Deli, Orange County Bldg Materials and Top Gun Wrecker in 14-404, FILED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1256672] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/24/2014 04:57 PM]
June 24, 2014 Filing 196 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant 1001 Property Solutions LLC and Temple Eagle Partners LLC in 12-4671, 14-159, FILED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1256491] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/24/2014 03:30 PM]
June 24, 2014 Filing 195 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Citibank N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, informing Court of proposed due date 10/15/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF.[1256256] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/24/2014 01:17 PM]
June 24, 2014 Filing 194 ATTORNEY, Carter Glasgow Phillips for Citibank N.A. Citigroup Inc Citicorp, [ # 193 ], ADDED.[1255917] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/24/2014 10:29 AM]
June 23, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 06/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1255234] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/23/2014 03:26 PM]
June 19, 2014 Filing 192 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., TRS Recovery Services Inc. and Telecheck Services Inc. in 12-4671, 14-192, FILED. Service date 06/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1253103] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/19/2014 06:22 PM]
June 19, 2014 Filing 191 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., TRS Recovery Services Inc. and Telecheck Services Inc. in 12-4671, 14-192, FILED. Service date 06/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1252757] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/19/2014 02:54 PM]
June 18, 2014 Filing 189 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. and U.S. Public Research Interest Group in 12-4671, Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 14-241, Appellant U.S. Public Research Interest Group in 14-837, FILED. Service date 06/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1251575] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/18/2014 03:17 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 207 SEALED PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. [1259955] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/30/2014 09:55 AM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 188 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Jon M. Zimmerman in 14-197, 12-4671, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249713] [14-197, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 11:18 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 187 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249702] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 09:57 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 186 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, -- DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249701] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 09:54 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 185 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant 1001 Property Solutions LLC and Temple Eagle Partners LLC in 12-4671, 14-159, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249691] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 08:16 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 184 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery in 12-4671, 14-219, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249690] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 08:05 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 183 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant ANCA 7 LLC, Accertify, Inc., American Express Co., American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Amex Assurance Company and Serve Virtual Enterprises, Inc. in 12-4671, 14-117, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249679] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 06:58 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 182 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. in 12-4671, 14-606, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249677] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 06:48 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 181 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1249673] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 06:41 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 180 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249672] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 06:40 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 179 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., TRS Recovery Services Inc. and Telecheck Services Inc. in 12-4671, 14-192, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249671] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 06:33 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 178 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant The Iron Barley Restaurant in 12-4671, 14-133, 14-663, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1249668] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 06:20 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 177 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. and U.S. Public Research Interest Group in 12-4671, Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 14-241, Appellant U.S. Public Research Interest Group in 14-837, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249667] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 06:18 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 176 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant The Iron Barley Restaurant in 12-4671, 14-133, 14-663, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249666] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 06:15 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 175 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant National Retail Federation and Retail Industry Leaders Association in 12-4671, Appellant National Retail Federation in 14-32, Appellant Retail Industry Leaders Association in 14-497, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249353] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 03:12 PM]
June 16, 2014 Filing 174 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, 14-119, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249293] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/16/2014 02:45 PM]
June 13, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 06/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1247975] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 06/13/2014 11:36 AM]
June 12, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc. and Appellee NATSO, Inc. in 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and Appellee NATSO, Inc. in 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association, Appellant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, Chicos FAS, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Macys, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc. and Appellee NATSO, Inc. in 12-4765, Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., NATSO, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4719, Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., NATSO, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, -- 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc. and Appellee NATSO, Inc. in 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy En
June 12, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and Appellant Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association in 12-4708, -- Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and Appellant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, Chicos FAS, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Macys, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Target Corporation and The Gap, Inc. in 12-4765, Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4719, Appellant 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, -- 7-Eleven, Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, C.S. Ross Company, Carter's, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Kwik Trip, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Staples, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The TJX Companies, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Co
May 28, 2014 Filing 170 ATTORNEY, Patricia Simone Cruz, for Appellee National City Bank of Kentucky and National City Corporation, TERMINATED.[1234195] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-349, 14-379, 14-404, 14-422, 14-443, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-663, 14-837] [Entered: 05/28/2014 09:10 AM]
May 27, 2014 Filing 169 MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant's motion to extend the date to file Appellants briefs; to file an oversized brief of not more than 21,000 words; to proceed on a deferred appendix; to consolidate appeals 14-443, 14-404, 14-349 and 14-663 with 12-4671(L); and to comply with FRAP 26.1 by filing in a single document all the corporate disclosure statements required in the appeals [ # 166 ], by JON, FILED. [1233714][169] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 05/27/2014 02:42 PM]
May 22, 2014 Filing 167 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 166 ],[ # 166 ],[ # 166 ],[ # 166 ], on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc. and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 12-4671, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 12-4765, Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., NATSO, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO, RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4719, Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., NATSO, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO, RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc. and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Sup
May 19, 2014 Filing 166 MOTION, to extend time, to file oversized brief, to file deferred appendix, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc. and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 12-4671, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 12-4765, Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., NATSO, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO, RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4719, Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., NATSO, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO, RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc. and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Ho
April 8, 2014 Filing 164 ATTORNEY, David G. Trachtenberg, [ # 162 ], [ # 1196747-2 ], in place of attorney Michael C. Rakower, SUBSTITUTED.[1197165] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 04/08/2014 01:44 PM]
April 7, 2014 Filing 163 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 12-4671, 14-241, Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837, FILED. Service date 04/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1195901] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 04/07/2014 11:46 AM]
April 7, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Retail Industry Leaders Association in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 04/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1195768] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 04/07/2014 10:54 AM]
April 4, 2014 Filing 161 ATTORNEY, Jonathan Jacobson, for Appellee Defendants in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974-JG-JO, TERMINATED.[1195308] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 04/04/2014 04:04 PM]
April 3, 2014 Filing 160 ATTORNEYS, Jahan C. Sagafi, for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO, and J. Douglas Richards, for Appellee Payless Shoe Soruce, Inc., TERMINATED.[1193357] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 04/03/2014 08:57 AM]
April 2, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee CHS Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 04/02/2014 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1192851] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 04/02/2014 01:16 PM]
April 2, 2014 Filing 158 ATTORNEY, William Rooney, for Appellee Defendants iin civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO and Defendants in civil actionNational Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, TERMINATED.[1192526] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 04/02/2014 10:53 AM]
April 2, 2014 Filing 157 ATTORNEY, Jeffrey M. Norton, for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4728-JG-JO, TERMINATED.[1192323] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 04/02/2014 09:38 AM]
April 1, 2014 Filing 156 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 12-4671, 14-241, Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837, FILED. Service date 04/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1191574] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 04/01/2014 01:47 PM]
April 1, 2014 Filing 155 ATTORNEY, Richard J. Kilsheimer, TERMINATED.[1191430] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 04/01/2014 12:02 PM]
March 27, 2014 Filing 154 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 12-4671, 14-241, Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837, FILED. Service date 03/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1188665] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 03/27/2014 04:18 PM]
March 27, 2014 Filing 153 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 12-4671, 14-241, Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837, FILED. Service date 03/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1188661] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 03/27/2014 04:16 PM]
March 25, 2014 Filing 152 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant U.S. Public Research Interest Group in 12-4671, 14-837, FILED. Service date 03/25/2014 by CM/ECF.[1186632] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 03/25/2014 04:09 PM]
March 25, 2014 Filing 151 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant U.S. Public Research Interest Group in 12-4671, 14-837, FILED. Service date 03/25/2014 by CM/ECF.[1186631] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 03/25/2014 04:08 PM]
March 25, 2014 Filing 150 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant U.S. Public Research Interest Group in 12-4671, 14-837, FILED. Service date 03/25/2014 by CM/ECF.[1186629] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 03/25/2014 04:07 PM]
March 25, 2014 Filing 149 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Vicente Consulting LLC in 14-266, FILED. Service date 03/24/2014 by CM/ECF.[1186355] [14-266, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, 14-837] [Entered: 03/25/2014 01:49 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee CHS Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, FILED. Service date 03/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1185598] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/24/2014 05:09 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 147 ATTORNEY, Joshua N. Holian, for Defendants in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO, TERMINATED.[1185296] [14-225, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/24/2014 02:31 PM]
March 24, 2014 Filing 146 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Vicente Consulting LLC in 14-266, FILED. Service date 03/24/2014 by CM/ECF.[1184972] [14-266, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/24/2014 11:20 AM]
March 21, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions and First Data Merchant Services Corporation in 12-4671, Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, TASQ Technology, Inc., TRS Recovery Services Inc. and Telecheck Services Inc. in 14-192, FILED. Service date 03/21/2014 by CM/ECF. [1184586] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/21/2014 05:09 PM]
March 21, 2014 Filing 144 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant National Federation of Independent Businesses in 12-4671, 14-480, National Federation of Independent Businesses in 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, FILED. Service date 03/21/2014 by CM/ECF.[1184429] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/21/2014 03:37 PM]
March 21, 2014 Filing 143 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant National Federation of Independent Businesses in 12-4671, 14-480, National Federation of Independent Businesses in 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, FILED. Service date 03/21/2014 by CM/ECF.[1184426] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/21/2014 03:36 PM]
March 21, 2014 Filing 142 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant National Federation of Independent Businesses in 12-4671, 14-480, National Federation of Independent Businesses in 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, FILED. Service date 03/21/2014 by CM/ECF.[1184423] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/21/2014 03:33 PM]
March 21, 2014 Filing 141 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 12-4671, 14-241, Consumer Union of United States, Inc. in 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, FILED. Service date 03/21/2014 by CM/ECF.[1184413] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/21/2014 03:30 PM]
March 21, 2014 Filing 140 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant First Data Corporation, First Data Government Solutions and First Data Merchant Services Corporation in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 03/21/2014 by CM/ECF.[1184197] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/21/2014 01:18 PM]
March 20, 2014 Filing 139 FORM A, on behalf of Appellant Vicente Consulting LLC in 14-266, FILED. Service date 03/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1183080] [14-266, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/20/2014 02:29 PM]
March 20, 2014 Filing 138 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Vicente Consulting LLC in 14-266, FILED. Service date 03/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1183076] [14-266, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/20/2014 02:28 PM]
March 20, 2014 Filing 137 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Vicente Consulting LLC in 14-266, FILED. Service date 03/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1183073] [14-266, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/20/2014 02:27 PM]
March 20, 2014 Filing 136 FORM A, on behalf of Appellant Vicente Consulting LLC in 14-266, FILED. Service date 03/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1183067] [14-266, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/20/2014 02:24 PM]
March 19, 2014 Filing 135 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc. and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 12-4671, Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 12-4708, -- Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 12-4765, Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., NATSO, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO, RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4719, Appellant 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., NATSO, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO, RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. in 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., David's Bridal, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Family Dollar, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., General Nutrition Corporation, Genesco Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, J. Crew Group, Inc., Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak), National Restaurant Association, Nike, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Panera Bread, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Stein Mart, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wendy's Company, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc. and Appellee NATSO, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO in 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, -- 7-Eleven, Academy, Ltd., Affiliated Foods Midwest, Aldo US Inc., Alon USA Energy, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., Barnes & Nobles College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Nobles, Inc, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Carter's, Inc., Coborn's Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Darden Restaurants, Inc., Da
March 19, 2014 Filing 134 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant National Federation of Independent Businesses in 12-4671, 14-480, National Federation of Independent Businesses in 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, FILED. Service date 03/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1182180] [14-241, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/19/2014 04:35 PM]
March 19, 2014 Filing 133 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant National Federation of Independent Businesses in 12-4671, 14-480, National Federation of Independent Businesses in 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606, FILED. Service date 03/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1182156] [14-241, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/19/2014 04:27 PM]
March 19, 2014 Filing 132 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant 1001 Property Solutions LLC and Temple Eagle Partners LLC in 14-159, 12-4671, FILED. Service date 03/19/2014 by CM/ECF, US mail.[1181601] [14-159, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/19/2014 12:12 PM]
March 19, 2014 Filing 131 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant 1001 Property Solutions LLC and Temple Eagle Partners LLC in 14-159, 12-4671, FILED. Service date 03/19/2014 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1181596] [14-159, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/19/2014 12:10 PM]
March 18, 2014 Filing 130 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 14-567, 12-4671, informing Court of proposed due date 05/29/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2014 by CM/ECF.[1181058] [14-567, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/18/2014 08:11 PM]
March 18, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant 1001 Property Solutions LLC and Temple Eagle Partners LLC in 14-159, FILED. Service date 03/18/2014 by CM/ECF, US mail. [1180725] [14-159, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/18/2014 02:39 PM]
March 10, 2014 Filing 128 ATTORNEY, Jason Cowart, for Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076 JG JO, Plaintiffs in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5075 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3924 JG-JO, TERMINATED.[1173796] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/10/2014 08:52 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant WalMart Stores, Inc. in 14-606, FILED. Service date 03/06/2014 by CM/ECF. [1172210] [14-606, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-266, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584] [Entered: 03/06/2014 01:07 PM]
March 4, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 14-567, 12-4671, 14-157, FILED. Service date 03/04/2014 by CM/ECF. [1170590] [14-567, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/04/2014 09:26 PM]
March 4, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 14-567, 12-4671, 14-157, FILED. Service date 03/04/2014 by CM/ECF. [1170588] [14-567, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/04/2014 09:21 PM]
March 4, 2014 Filing 124 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 14-567, 12-4671, Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, FILED. Service date 03/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1170586] [14-567, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/04/2014 09:14 PM]
March 4, 2014 Filing 123 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 14-567, 12-4671, Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, FILED. Service date 03/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1170583] [14-567, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/04/2014 09:07 PM]
March 4, 2014 Filing 122 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 14-567, 12-4671, Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, FILED. Service date 03/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1170582] [14-567, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/04/2014 09:05 PM]
March 4, 2014 Filing 121 ATTORNEY, Candice Chiu for Payless Shoe Source, Inc. Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO [ # 120 ], ADDED.[1170431] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/04/2014 04:23 PM]
March 4, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee CHS Inc., Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Crystal Rock LLC, Leons Transmission Service, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO and Traditions, Ltd. in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 03/04/2014 by CM/ECF. [1170302] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/04/2014 03:40 PM]
March 4, 2014 Filing 119 ATTORNEY, Joanne Elin Zack, TERMINATED.[1169729] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, 14-584, 14-606] [Entered: 03/04/2014 11:11 AM]
February 28, 2014 Filing 118 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 14-584, 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, FILED. Service date 02/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1168282] [14-584, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567] [Entered: 02/28/2014 08:45 PM]
February 28, 2014 Filing 117 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 14-584, 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, FILED. Service date 02/28/2002 by CM/ECF.[1168281] [14-584, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567] [Entered: 02/28/2014 08:44 PM]
February 28, 2014 Filing 116 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 14-584, 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567, FILED. Service date 02/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1168280] [14-584, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567] [Entered: 02/28/2014 08:41 PM]
February 27, 2014 Filing 115 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant The Iron Barley Restaurant in 12-4671, 14-133, FILED. Service date 02/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1167264] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567] [Entered: 02/27/2014 05:55 PM]
February 27, 2014 Filing 114 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant The Iron Barley Restaurant in 12-4671, 14-133, FILED. Service date 02/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1167263] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567] [Entered: 02/27/2014 05:53 PM]
February 27, 2014 Filing 113 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant The Iron Barley Restaurant in 12-4671, 14-133, FILED. Service date 02/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1167259] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, 14-567] [Entered: 02/27/2014 05:49 PM]
February 27, 2014 Filing 112 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jon M. Zimmerman in 14-197, 12-4671, Jon M. Zimmerman in 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530, FILED. Service date 02/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1166777] [14-197, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530] [Entered: 02/27/2014 12:48 PM]
February 27, 2014 Filing 111 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Sunoco, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1166410] [14-422, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530] [Entered: 02/27/2014 09:51 AM]
February 27, 2014 Filing 110 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Sunoco, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1166403] [14-422, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-480, 14-497, 14-530] [Entered: 02/27/2014 09:50 AM]
February 26, 2014 Filing 109 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., C.S. Ross Company, Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Limited Brands, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, PNS Stores, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., Target Corporation and The TJX Companies, Inc. in 14-530, FILED. Service date 02/26/2014 by CM/ECF.[1165694] [14-530, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497] [Entered: 02/26/2014 11:07 AM]
February 26, 2014 Filing 108 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., C.S. Ross Company, Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Limited Brands, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, PNS Stores, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., Target Corporation and The TJX Companies, Inc. in 14-530, FILED. Service date 02/26/2014 by CM/ECF.[1165661] [14-530, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497] [Entered: 02/26/2014 10:50 AM]
February 26, 2014 Filing 107 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., C.S. Ross Company, Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Limited Brands, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, PNS Stores, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., Target Corporation and The TJX Companies, Inc. in 14-530, FILED. Service date 02/26/2014 by CM/ECF.[1165657] [14-530, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422, 14-480, 14-497] [Entered: 02/26/2014 10:48 AM]
February 19, 2014 Filing 104 ATTORNEY, Anthony Shelley [ # 100 ], in place of attorney Wendy Schwartz, SUBSTITUTED.[1159069] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379, 14-422] [Entered: 02/19/2014 09:04 AM]
February 13, 2014 Filing 103 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, 12-4671, informing Court of proposed due date 05/29/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 02/13/2014 by CM/ECF.[1156547] [14-157, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379] [Entered: 02/13/2014 05:58 PM]
February 13, 2014 Filing 102 ATTORNEY, Robert J. Vizas for Visa U.S.A. Inc. Visa International Service Association, [ # 101 ], ADDED.[1156058] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379] [Entered: 02/13/2014 10:55 AM]
February 12, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc. in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 02/12/2014 by CM/ECF. [1155836] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379] [Entered: 02/12/2014 03:14 PM]
February 11, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant WellPoint, Inc. in 14-157, 12-4671, FILED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1155570] [14-157, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, 14-379] [Entered: 02/11/2014 04:39 PM]
February 11, 2014 Filing 99 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant National Retail Federation in 14-32, 12-4671, informing Court of proposed due date 05/29/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF.[1155476] [14-32, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/11/2014 04:12 PM]
February 11, 2014 Filing 98 ATTORNEY, Adam P. Feinberg, Michael N. Khalil for Blue Cross Blue Shield entities, [ # 97 ], [ # 96 ], ADDED.[1155249] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/11/2014 02:00 PM]
February 11, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 14-157, 12-4671, FILED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1155140] [14-157, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/11/2014 01:04 PM]
February 11, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities and WellPoint, Inc. in 14-157, 12-4671, FILED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1155131] [14-157, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/11/2014 12:58 PM]
February 11, 2014 Filing 95 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, 12-4671, FILED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF.[1154998] [14-157, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/11/2014 11:49 AM]
February 7, 2014 Filing 94 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jon M. Zimmerman in 14-197, 12-4671, Jon M. Zimmerman in 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, FILED. Service date 02/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1153281] [14-197, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/07/2014 08:50 PM]
February 7, 2014 Filing 93 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jon M. Zimmerman in 14-197, 12-4671, Jon M. Zimmerman in 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, FILED. Service date 02/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1153279] [14-197, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/07/2014 08:45 PM]
February 7, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331, FILED. Service date 02/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1152650] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/07/2014 12:17 PM]
February 7, 2014 Filing 91 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Etc. Optical in 14-250, 12-4671, Etc. Optical in 14-303, 14-331, FILED. Service date 02/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1152325] [14-250, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/07/2014 09:59 AM]
February 7, 2014 Filing 90 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Etc. Optical in 14-250, 12-4671, Etc. Optical in 14-303, 14-331, FILED. Service date 02/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1152318] [14-250, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/07/2014 09:57 AM]
February 7, 2014 Filing 89 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Etc. Optical in 14-250, 12-4671, Etc. Optical in 14-303, 14-331, FILED. Service date 02/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1152280] [14-250, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-303, 14-331] [Entered: 02/07/2014 09:48 AM]
February 6, 2014 Filing 88 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant National Retail Federation in 14-32, 12-4671, FILED. Service date 02/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1151882] [14-32, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, 14-303] [Entered: 02/06/2014 04:19 PM]
February 5, 2014 Filing 87 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery in 12-4671, 14-219, Falls Auto Gallery in 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, FILED. Service date 02/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1150147] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250] [Entered: 02/05/2014 10:56 AM]
February 3, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4750, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250, FILED. Service date 02/03/2014 by CM/ECF. [1148558] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4750, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241, 14-250] [Entered: 02/03/2014 03:10 PM]
February 3, 2014 Filing 85 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery in 12-4671, 14-219, Falls Auto Gallery in 14-225, 14-241, FILED. Service date 02/03/2014 by CM/ECF.[1148144] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241] [Entered: 02/03/2014 11:21 AM]
February 3, 2014 Filing 84 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery in 12-4671, 14-219, Falls Auto Gallery in 14-225, 14-241, FILED. Service date 02/03/2014 by CM/ECF.[1148132] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241] [Entered: 02/03/2014 11:19 AM]
February 3, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery in 12-4671, 14-219, Falls Auto Gallery in 14-225, 14-241, FILED. Service date 02/03/2014 by CM/ECF. [1148118] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219, 14-225, 14-241] [Entered: 02/03/2014 11:11 AM]
January 30, 2014 Filing 82 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, FILED. Service date 01/30/2014 by CM/ECF.[1146541] [14-157, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219] [Entered: 01/30/2014 05:24 PM]
January 30, 2014 Filing 81 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-157, Blue Cross Blue Shield entities in 14-219, FILED. Service date 01/30/2014 by CM/ECF.[1146539] [14-157, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-133, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197, 14-219] [Entered: 01/30/2014 05:22 PM]
January 30, 2014 Filing 80 ATTORNEY, Candice Chiu for Payless Shoe Source, Inc. Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, [ # 79 ], ADDED.[1145526] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, 14-197] [Entered: 01/30/2014 09:07 AM]
January 29, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192, FILED. Service date 01/29/2014 by CM/ECF. [1144889] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119, 14-157, 14-159, 14-192] [Entered: 01/29/2014 01:42 PM]
January 27, 2014 Filing 77 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, 14-119, FILED. Service date 01/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1142234] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119] [Entered: 01/27/2014 12:47 PM]
January 27, 2014 Filing 76 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant R&M Objectors in 12-4671, 14-119, FILED. Service date 01/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1142229] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32, 14-117, 14-119] [Entered: 01/27/2014 12:46 PM]
January 24, 2014 Filing 75 ATTORNEY, Mark R. Merley for Visa U.S.A. Inc. Visa International Service Association , [ # 74 ], ADDED.[1140899] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32] [Entered: 01/24/2014 11:16 AM]
January 24, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc. in 12-4671, 14-32, FILED. Service date 01/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1140871] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32] [Entered: 01/24/2014 11:03 AM]
January 24, 2014 Filing 73 ATTORNEY, Joseph Goldberg for Payless Shoe Source, Inc. Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, ADDED.[1140656] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, 14-32] [Entered: 01/24/2014 09:48 AM]
January 23, 2014 Filing 72 ATTORNEY, Paul D. Clement for Payless Shoe Source, Inc. Capital Audio Electronics, Inc. Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, [ # 68 ], ADDED.[1140365] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/23/2014 04:28 PM]
January 23, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 01/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1140208] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/23/2014 03:41 PM]
January 23, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 01/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1140191] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/23/2014 03:34 PM]
January 23, 2014 Filing 69 ATTORNEY, Steig David Olson for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., [ # 66 ], ADDED.[1139316] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/23/2014 08:37 AM]
January 22, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO and Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1139280] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/22/2014 07:47 PM]
January 22, 2014 Filing 67 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank Delaware and Barclays Bank PLC in 12-4671, FILED. Service date 01/22/2014 by CM/ECF.[1138966] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/22/2014 02:55 PM]
January 22, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 13-4750, 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1138926] [13-4750, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/22/2014 02:30 PM]
January 22, 2014 Filing 65 ATTORNEY, Cleland B. Welton II, and Sanford Ian Weisburst for Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., [ # 63 ], [ # 62 ], ADDED.[1138595] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/22/2014 11:12 AM]
January 21, 2014 Filing 64 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, informing Court of proposed due date 05/29/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 01/21/2014 by CM/ECF, email.[1138425] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/21/2014 05:06 PM]
January 21, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/21/2014 by CM/ECF. [1138368] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/21/2014 03:38 PM]
January 21, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/21/2014 by CM/ECF. [1138360] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/21/2014 03:33 PM]
January 10, 2014 Filing 61 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., C.S. Ross Company, Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Limited Brands, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, PNS Stores, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., Target Corporation and The TJX Companies, Inc. in 13-4751, FILED. Service date 01/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1131433] [13-4751, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/10/2014 05:52 PM]
January 8, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and Defendants in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO in 12-4671, Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A. in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/08/2014 by CM/ECF. [1128778] [12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/08/2014 02:41 PM]
January 8, 2014 Filing 59 ATTORNEY, Michael Shuster for Visa U.S.A. Inc. and Visa International Service Association [ # 56 ], ADDED.[1128175] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/08/2014 09:46 AM]
January 8, 2014 Filing 58 ATTORNEY, Abby Rudzin for Capital One Bank, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One F S B, [ # 57 ], ADDED.[1128163] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/08/2014 09:41 AM]
January 8, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Bank, Capital One F S B and Capital One Financial Corporation in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/08/2014 by CM/ECF. [1128100] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/08/2014 09:10 AM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc. in 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1127950] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/07/2014 05:09 PM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee First National Bank of Omaha in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1127906] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/07/2014 04:36 PM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 54 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee First National Bank of Omaha in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1127900] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/07/2014 04:33 PM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Bank, Capital One F S B and Capital One Financial Corporation in 13-4719, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1127893] [13-4719, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/07/2014 04:27 PM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 52 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Bank, Capital One F S B and Capital One Financial Corporation in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1127826] [13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/07/2014 04:04 PM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc, FILED. Service date 01/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1127780] [13-4750] [Entered: 01/07/2014 03:50 PM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mastercard Incorporated and Mastercard International Incorporated in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1127561] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/07/2014 02:20 PM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 49 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation and HSBC North America Holdings, Inc in 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1127515] [13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/07/2014 01:48 PM]
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER, lifting the FRAP 4(a)4 stay of appeals in 12-4671, 12-4708, and 12-4765, and directing Appellants to file scheduling notifications within 14 days, FILED.[1127154] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/07/2014 11:01 AM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 46 ATTORNEY, Eamon Paul Joyce for Citibank N.A. Citigroup Inc Citicorp, in case 13-4752, 13-4751, and 13-4750 , [ # 1126737-2 ], [ # 1126736-2 ], [ # 44 ], ADDED.[1126889] [13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/07/2014 09:20 AM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 45 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee SunTrust Bank, Inc. and Suntrust Bank in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1126738] [12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/06/2014 09:00 PM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc, FILED. Service date 01/06/2014 by CM/ECF. [1126735] [13-4750] [Entered: 01/06/2014 08:31 PM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 43 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Defendants in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1126730] [12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/06/2014 07:33 PM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 42 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Defendants iin civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5074-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5073-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4799- JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5069-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05--cv-4728 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 -JG-JO, Defendants in civil actionNational Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc. in 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, Appellee Defendants iin civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5074-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5073-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4799- JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5069-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05--cv-4728 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 -JG-JO, Defendants in civil actionNational Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO, Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc. in 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/06/2013 by CM/ECF.[1126708] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/06/2014 06:03 PM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 41 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank N.A., Citicorp and Citigroup Inc, FILED. Service date 01/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1126697] [13-4750] [Entered: 01/06/2014 05:47 PM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 40 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Chase Bank USA, N.A., Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC and JP Morgan Chase & Co. in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1126643] [12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/06/2014 04:53 PM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 39 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mastercard Incorporated and Mastercard International Incorporated in 12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752, FILED. Service date 01/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1126548] [12-4671, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/06/2014 04:08 PM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 38 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[1125977] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 01/06/2014 11:57 AM]
January 2, 2014 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, William H. Pratt for Discover Bank Discover Home Loans, Inc. DFS Services, LLC, in case 13-4752, 13-4751, 13-4750 William H. Pratt for Discover Bank Discover Home Loans, Inc. DFS Services, LLC, in case 13-4719 , [ # 1124644-2 ], ADDED.[1124786] [13-4752, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751] [Entered: 01/02/2014 12:57 PM]
December 30, 2013 Filing 32 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., C.S. Ross Company, Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, L Brands, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, PNS Stores, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., Target Corporation and The TJX Companies, Inc. in 13-4751, FILED. Service date 12/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[1123791] [13-4751, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4752] [Entered: 12/30/2013 05:08 PM]
December 30, 2013 Filing 31 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., C.S. Ross Company, Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, L Brands, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, PNS Stores, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., Target Corporation and The TJX Companies, Inc. in 13-4751, FILED. Service date 12/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[1123788] [13-4751, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4752] [Entered: 12/30/2013 05:06 PM]
December 30, 2013 Filing 30 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Jennifer M. Selendy, Esq. for Appellant Discover Bank, DFS Services, LLC and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 13-4752, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[1123169] [13-4752, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751] [Entered: 12/30/2013 10:49 AM]
December 30, 2013 Filing 29 CAPTION, new cases and parties added, AMENDED.[1123162] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 12/30/2013 10:40 AM]
December 30, 2013 Filing 24 NOTE: See lead case, # 12-4671, containing complete set of docket entries.[1123126] [13-4752, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751] [Entered: 12/30/2013 10:22 AM]
December 30, 2013 Filing 18 NOTE: See lead case, # 12-4671, containing complete set of docket entries.[1123074] [13-4751, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750] [Entered: 12/30/2013 09:45 AM]
December 27, 2013 Filing 13 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 13-4750, 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, FILED. Service date 12/27/2013 by CM/ECF.[1122558] [13-4750, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719] [Entered: 12/27/2013 11:18 AM]
December 27, 2013 Filing 12 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 13-4750, 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, FILED. Service date 12/27/2013 by CM/ECF.[1122554] [13-4750, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719] [Entered: 12/27/2013 11:15 AM]
December 27, 2013 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 13-4750, 12-4671, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, FILED. Service date 12/27/2013 by CM/ECF.[1122547] [13-4750, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719] [Entered: 12/27/2013 11:13 AM]
December 26, 2013 Filing 9 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., FILED. Service date 12/26/2013 by CM/ECF.[1122332] [13-4750] [Entered: 12/26/2013 10:23 PM]
December 26, 2013 Filing 8 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., FILED. Service date 12/26/2013 by CM/ECF.[1122331] [13-4750] [Entered: 12/26/2013 10:15 PM]
December 26, 2013 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., FILED. Service date 12/26/2013 by CM/ECF.[1122329] [13-4750] [Entered: 12/26/2013 09:46 PM]
December 19, 2013 Filing 26 NEW CASE # 13-4752, on behalf of DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 12-4671, FILED.[1123138] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751, 13-4752] [Entered: 12/30/2013 10:28 AM]
December 19, 2013 Filing 23 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 13-4752, district court receipt # 0207-6625665, FILED.[1123125] [13-4752, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751] [Entered: 12/30/2013 10:21 AM]
December 19, 2013 Filing 22 THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1123120] [13-4752, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751] [Entered: 12/30/2013 10:18 AM]
December 19, 2013 Filing 21 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/13/2013, RECEIVED.[1123111] [13-4752, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751] [Entered: 12/30/2013 10:08 AM]
December 19, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank and Discover Home Loans, Inc. in 13-4752, FILED. [1123106] [13-4752, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751] [Entered: 12/30/2013 10:02 AM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 19 NEW CASE # 13-4751, on behalf of Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., C.S. Ross Company, Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Limited Brands, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, PNS Stores, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., Target Corporation and The TJX Companies, Inc. in 12-4671, FILED.[1123085] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750, 13-4751] [Entered: 12/30/2013 09:52 AM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 16 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., American Signature, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., BonTon Stores, Inc., C.S. Ross Company, Chicos FAS, Inc., Closeout Distribution, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., L Brands, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Macys, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax Incorporated, PNS Stores, Inc., Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., Target Corporation and The TJX Companies, Inc. in 13-4751, district court receipt # 0207-6616018, FILED.[1123070] [13-4751, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750] [Entered: 12/30/2013 09:44 AM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 15 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1123058] [13-4751, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750] [Entered: 12/30/2013 09:39 AM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 14 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/13/2013, RECEIVED.[1123047] [13-4751, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750] [Entered: 12/30/2013 09:35 AM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 6 NEW CASE # 13-4750, on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 12-4671, FILED.[1121540] [12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719, 13-4750] [Entered: 12/23/2013 04:54 PM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in 13-4750, USCA receipt # 0207-6615025, FILED.[1121507] [13-4750, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719] [Entered: 12/23/2013 04:45 PM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1121488] [13-4750, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719] [Entered: 12/23/2013 04:40 PM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/13/2013, RECEIVED.[1121483] [13-4750, 12-4671, 12-4708, 12-4765, 13-4719] [Entered: 12/23/2013 04:38 PM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., FILED. [1121452] [13-4750] [Entered: 12/23/2013 04:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re Payment Card Interchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Bernard Persky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076 JG JO
Represented By: Jason S. Kilene Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: QVC, Inc.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Paul E. Slater Esq.
Represented By: L. Webb Campbell Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4728-JG-JO
Represented By: Walter W. Noss Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GMRI, Inc.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: K. Craig Wildfang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Keithco Petroleum, Inc., BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC.
Represented By: John F. Hawkins Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Clement Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-3800 JG-JO
Represented By: Jerald M. Stein Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Capital Audio Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Levinson Esq.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Represented By: Paul D. Clement Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Christopher McDonald
Represented By: K. Craig Wildfang Esq.
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO
Represented By: Daniel O. Myers Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081JG JO
Represented By: Charles N. Nauen Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677 - JG-JO
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Thomas M. Campbell Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Paul E. Slater Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3924 JG-JO
Represented By: Ann D. White Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Gulfside Casino Partnership. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-03225 JG-JO
Represented By: Jennifer Ingram Wilkinson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Payless Shoe Source, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Represented By: Paul D. Clement Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman Esq.
Represented By: K. Craig Wildfang Esq.
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3925-JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO
Represented By: Paul D. Clement Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: K. Craig Wildfang Esq.
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2532 JG-JO
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974 JG-JO
Represented By: Tracey Kitzman
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Mastercard Incorporated et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in Civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5074 JG-JO
Represented By: Dean M. Solomon
Represented By: Mark Reinhardt Esq.
Represented By: Craig Gordon Harley Esq.
Represented By: Gary Bruce Friedman Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-5153 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Francis Joseph Balint Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5885 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: William J. Ban Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO
Represented By: Robert Joseph LaRocca Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Clement Esq.
Represented By: Jason Louis Solotaroff Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Hadley P. Roeltgen Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5075 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Donald L. Perelman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-5882 JG-JO
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131-JG-JO
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Paul E. Slater Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action BKS. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-2264-JG-JO
Represented By: John F. Hawkins Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer Ingram Wilkinson Esq.
Represented By: Carroll H. Ingram Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO
Represented By: Robert D. Greenbaum Esq.
Represented By: Patricia Avery Esq.
Represented By: Robert S. Kitchenoff Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Steven A. Asher Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 JG-JO
Represented By: Merrill G. Davidoff
Represented By: Michael J. Kane Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: H. Laddie Montague Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv- 4799 JG-JO
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Thomas M. Campbell Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Paul E. Slater Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5880 JG-JO
Represented By: Richard P. Rouco Esq.
Represented By: Charles S. Hellman Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Performance Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5869 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al . 05-cv-5866 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070 JG-JO
Represented By: Brian N. Toder Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Thomas M. Campbell Esq.
Represented By: Robert C. Mason Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Paul E. Slater Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5871 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5073 JG-JO
Represented By: Jay S. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Patrick A. Klingman Esq.
Represented By: Thomas M. Campbell Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action 06-cv-5583, Esdacy, INC. v. Visa USA, INC. et al
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Keith Superstores, BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC.
Represented By: John F. Hawkins Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG-JO
Represented By: Thomas M. Campbell Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: K. Craig Wildfang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-CV-5069 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh Esq.
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin Esq.
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO
Represented By: William Jay Blechman Esq.
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BonTon Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A. Clarick Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: P.C. Richard & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Retail Industry Leaders Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chico's FAS, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A. Clarick Esq.
Represented By: Isaac Zaur Esq.
Represented By: Emily S. Reisbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: American Booksellers Association
Represented By: Gregory A. Clarick Esq.
Represented By: Isaac Zaur Esq.
Represented By: Emily S. Reisbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David's Bridal, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carter's, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Panera Bread Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: J. Crew Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: American Signature, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A. Clarick Esq.
Represented By: Isaac Zaur Esq.
Represented By: Emily S. Reisbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barnes & Nobles, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A. Clarick Esq.
Represented By: Isaac Zaur Esq.
Represented By: Emily S. Reisbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Discover Bank
Represented By: William H. Pratt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Selendy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Macy's Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A. Clarick Esq.
Represented By: Isaac Zaur Esq.
Represented By: Emily S. Reisbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Martin's Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Foot Locker, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ascena Retail Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A. Clarick Esq.
Represented By: Isaac Zaur Esq.
Represented By: Emily S. Reisbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Discover Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Pratt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Selendy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kwik Trip, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Saks Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory A. Clarick Esq.
Represented By: Isaac Zaur Esq.
Represented By: Emily S. Reisbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Gregory A. Clarick Esq.
Represented By: Isaac Zaur Esq.
Represented By: Emily S. Reisbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets |