American Civil Liberties Union v. Clapper
Petitioner: John Stritzinger
Defendant / Appellee: Robert S. Mueller, III, in his official capacity as Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, Charles T. Hagel, in his official capacity as Secretary of Defense, Keith B. Alexander, in his official capacity as Director of the National Security Agency and Chief of the Central Security Service, Loretta E. Lynch, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States and James R. Clapper, in his official capacity as Director of National Intelligence
Amicus Curiae: Ranjana Natarajan, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Annemarie Bridy, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Peter Raven-Hansen, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Karl Manheim, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Julie Cohen, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Susan Freiwald, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Laura Donohue, Esq., Professor of Law, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Jessica Silbey, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Robert A. Heverly, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Association of the Bar of the City of New York, The Rutherford Institute, Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Edward Lee, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Mark Udall, Senator, Jennifer Granick, Esq., Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Gary Hart, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Michael Froomkin, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Ralph D. Clifford, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Martin Heinrich, Senator, Ahmed Ghappour, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Anne Klinefelter, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Brian Carver, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Ron Wyden, Senator, Walter Mondale, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Katherine J. Strandburg, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, PEN American Center, Inc., National Rifle Association, Inc., W. David Ball, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Experts in Computer Data and Science, Mark A. Lemley, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Peter Swire, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, William C. Banks, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Fred H. Cate, Jonathan Weinberg, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Erwin Chemerinsky, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, David W. Opderbeck, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, David Levine, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors, Shubha Ghosh, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors and Kim Lane Scheppele, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Plaintiff / Appellant: American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation and New York Civil Liberties Union
Case Number: 14-42
Filed: January 6, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2015 Filing 236 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1656924] [14-42] [Entered: 12/04/2015 03:03 PM]
October 29, 2015 Filing 233 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 10/29/2015, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1630525] [14-42] [Entered: 10/29/2015 09:54 AM]
October 29, 2015 Filing 232 MOTION ORDER, denying motion for injunction [ # 191 ] filed by Appellant New York Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, by RDS, GEL, C.JJ., BRODERICK, D.J., FILED. [1630516][232] [14-42] [Entered: 10/29/2015 09:50 AM]
October 29, 2015 Filing 231 NON- DISPOSITIVE OPINION, FILED.[1630509] [14-42] [Entered: 10/29/2015 09:48 AM]
September 2, 2015 Filing 229 CASE, before RDS, GEL, C.JJ., VSB, D.J., HEARD.[1590330] [14-42] [Entered: 09/02/2015 02:10 PM]
September 1, 2015 Filing 225 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 219 ] filed by Movant John Stritzinger, FILED. Copy mail to movant John Stritzinger, [1588818][225] [14-42] [Entered: 09/01/2015 09:09 AM]
August 31, 2015 Filing 224 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/31/2015, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Loretta E. Lynch and Robert S. Mueller, III, RECEIVED. Service date 08/31/2015 by CM/ECF.[1588752] [14-42] [Entered: 08/31/2015 08:16 PM]
August 31, 2015 Filing 223 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/31/2015, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Loretta E. Lynch and Robert S. Mueller, III, RECEIVED. Service date 08/31/2015 by CM/ECF.[1588748] [14-42] [Entered: 08/31/2015 08:11 PM]
August 24, 2015 Filing 219 MOTION, to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Movant John Stritzinger, FILED. Service date 08/24/2015 by email.[1583037] [14-42] [Entered: 08/24/2015 12:00 PM]
August 24, 2015 Filing 218 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party John Stritzinger, FILED. Service date 08/24/2015 by email.[1583025] [14-42] [Entered: 08/24/2015 11:55 AM]
August 24, 2015 Filing 217 NEW PARTY, Movant John Stritzinger, ADDED.[1583013] [14-42] [Entered: 08/24/2015 11:51 AM]
August 21, 2015 Filing 216 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Loretta E. Lynch and Robert S. Mueller, III, FILED. Service date 08/21/2015 by CM/ECF. [1582580] [14-42] [Entered: 08/21/2015 06:15 PM]
August 21, 2015 Filing 215 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 08/21/2015 by CM/ECF. [1582573] [14-42] [Entered: 08/21/2015 05:47 PM]
August 20, 2015 Filing 213 PAPERS, motion for leave of Court to file amicus brief, RECEIVED.[1581853] [14-42] [Entered: 08/21/2015 11:01 AM]
August 20, 2015 Filing 211 ATTORNEY, Henry Charles Whitaker for Charles T. Hagel Robert S. Mueller III Keith B. Alexander James R. Clapper Loretta E. Lynch, in case 14-42 , [ # 210 ], ADDED.[1581659] [14-42] [Entered: 08/21/2015 09:09 AM]
August 20, 2015 Filing 210 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Loretta E. Lynch and Robert S. Mueller, III, FILED. Service date 08/20/2015 by CM/ECF. [1581310] [14-42] [Entered: 08/20/2015 04:05 PM]
August 6, 2015 Filing 207 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 191 ], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 08/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1570945][207] [14-42] [Entered: 08/06/2015 04:55 PM]
July 31, 2015 Filing 206 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1567070] [14-42] [Entered: 07/31/2015 04:37 PM]
July 31, 2015 Filing 205 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 09/02/2015, SET.[1567064] [14-42] [Entered: 07/31/2015 04:35 PM]
July 27, 2015 Filing 200 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Loretta E. Lynch and Robert S. Mueller, III, FILED. Service date 07/27/2015 by CM/ECF.[1563150] [14-42] [Entered: 07/27/2015 07:17 PM]
July 20, 2015 Filing 199 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [ # 195 ] filed by Appellee Robert S. Mueller, III, Loretta E. Lynch, James R. Clapper, Keith B. Alexander and Charles T. Hagel, by GEL, FILED. [1557629][199] [14-42] [Entered: 07/20/2015 11:58 AM]
July 17, 2015 Filing 195 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Loretta E. Lynch and Robert S. Mueller, III, FILED. Service date 07/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1557051] [14-42] [Entered: 07/17/2015 04:31 PM]
July 14, 2015 Filing 191 MOTION, for injunction, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 07/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1553186] [14-42] [Entered: 07/14/2015 12:55 PM]
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER, dated 06/09/2015, stating that the parties are directed to submit supplemental briefs, not to exceed twenty pages in length, regarding the effect of the USA FREEDOM Act on the above-captioned case, and in particular whether any or all of the claims asserted by the plaintiffs-appellants have been rendered moot as a result of that legislation, by July 24, 2015. It is further ORDERED that (1) issuance of the mandate in this action is hereby STAYED pending the parties supplemental briefing, and (2) the deadline for submission of any petitions for rehearing is hereby extended until 14 days after the stay of the mandate has been lifted, absent further order of the Court, FILED.[1528067] [14-42] [Entered: 06/09/2015 12:03 PM]
May 7, 2015 Filing 175 JUDGMENT, FILED.[1504267] [14-42] [Entered: 05/07/2015 12:16 PM]
May 7, 2015 Filing 173 CAPTION, per opinion filed 05/07/15, AMENDED.[1503649] [14-42] [Entered: 05/07/2015 09:08 AM]
May 7, 2015 Filing 170 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 05/07/2015, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1503607] [14-42] [Entered: 05/07/2015 08:56 AM]
May 7, 2015 Filing 169 OPINION, Concurring, by judge RDS, FILED.[1503603] [14-42] [Entered: 05/07/2015 08:54 AM]
May 7, 2015 Filing 168 OPINION, vacating the district court judgment and remanding for further proceedings, by RDS, GEL, C.JJ., BRODERICK, D.J., FILED.[1503586] [14-42] [Entered: 05/07/2015 08:51 AM]
May 7, 2015 Filing 167 NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[1503539] [14-42] [Entered: 05/07/2015 08:42 AM]
February 2, 2015 Filing 161 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 02/02/2015, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Robert S. Mueller, III, RECEIVED. Service date 02/02/2015 by CM/ECF.[1428393] [14-42] [Entered: 02/02/2015 07:47 PM]
January 16, 2015 Filing 159 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 01/16/2015, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, RECEIVED. Service date 01/16/2015 by CM/ECF.[1418279] [14-42] [Entered: 01/16/2015 05:24 PM]
September 2, 2014 Filing 158 CASE, before RDS, GEL, C.JJ., BRODERICK, D.J., HEARD.[1309624] [14-42]
July 22, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Robert S. Mueller, III, FILED. Service date 07/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1276274] [14-42]
July 15, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 07/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1271815] [14-42]
July 7, 2014 Filing 153 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1263957] [14-42]
July 1, 2014 Filing 150 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 09/02/2014, SET.[1261935] [14-42]
June 19, 2014 Filing 147 ATTORNEY, Catherine Crump, for Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil LIberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation , TERMINATED.[1252577] [14-42]
June 18, 2014 Filing 146 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, RECEIVED. Service date 06/18/2014 by CM/ECF.[1251623] [14-42]
June 11, 2014 Filing 143 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF, Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, [140], [ # 141 ], [ # 142 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Anne Klinefelter, FILED.[1245487] [14-42]
June 5, 2014 Filing 142 AMICUS BRIEF, Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, FILED. Service date 06/05/2014 by email. [1241260] [14-42]
June 5, 2014 Filing 141 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [140], on behalf of Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, FILED.[1241224] [14-42]
June 5, 2014 Filing 140 AMICUS BRIEF, Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, FILED. Service date 06/05/2014 by email. [1241153] [14-42]--[Edited 06/05/2014 by EM]
May 21, 2014 Filing 136 PAPERS, Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice, from Mr. John Stritzinger, RECEIVED.[1229709] [14-42]
May 14, 2014 Filing 135 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 09/02/2014, PROPOSED.[1224170] [14-42]
May 8, 2014 Filing 132 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, RECEIVED. Service date 05/08/2014 by CM/ECF.[1219639] [14-42]
May 2, 2014 Filing 128 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 05/02/2014, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Robert S. Mueller, III, RECEIVED. Service date 05/02/2014 by CM/ECF.[1215490] [14-42]
April 24, 2014 Filing 125 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1210084] [14-42]
April 24, 2014 Filing 124 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jameel Jaffer for Appellant New York Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1210083] [14-42]
April 24, 2014 Filing 122 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. David S. Jones for Appellee Eric H. Holder, Jr., Robert S. Mueller, III, James R. Clapper, Keith B. Alexander and Charles T. Hagel, FILED. Service date 04/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1209841] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 120 Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, TERMINATED.[1206264] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 119 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Erwin Chemerinsky, ADDED.[1206255] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 118 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Laura Donohue, ADDED.[1206246] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 117 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Jonathan Weinberg, ADDED.[1206218] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 116 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Peter Swire, ADDED.[1206213] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 115 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Katherine J. Strandburg, ADDED.[1206208] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 114 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Jessica Silbey, ADDED.[1206203] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 113 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Kim Lane Scheppele, ADDED.[1206202] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 112 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Peter Raven-Hansen, ADDED.[1206199] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 111 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae David W. Opderbeck, ADDED.[1206195] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 110 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Ranjana Natarajan, ADDED.[1206191] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 109 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Karl Manheim, ADDED.[1206186] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 108 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae David Levine, ADDED.[1206184] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 107 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Mark A. Lemley, ADDED.[1206176] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 106 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Edward Lee, ADDED.[1206173] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 105 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Anne Klinefelter, ADDED.[1206171] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 104 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Robert A. Heverly, ADDED.[1206170] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 103 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Jennifer Granick, ADDED.[1206165] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 102 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Shubha Ghosh, ADDED.[1206161] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 101 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Ahmed Ghappour, ADDED.[1206158] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 100 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Michael Froomkin, ADDED.[1206155] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 99 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Susan Freiwald, ADDED.[1206153] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 98 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Julie Cohen, ADDED.[1206151] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 97 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Ralph D. Clifford, ADDED.[1206146] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 96 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Fred H. Cate, ADDED.[1206145] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 95 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Brian Carver, ADDED.[1206142] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 94 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Annemarie Bridy, ADDED.[1206119] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 93 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae William C. Banks, ADDED.[1206105] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 92 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae W. David Ball, ADDED.[1206102] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 91 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Walter Mondale, ADDED.[1206096] [14-42]
April 21, 2014 Filing 90 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Gary Hart, ADDED.[1206088] [14-42]
April 10, 2014 Filing 87 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Robert S. Mueller, III, FILED. Service date 04/10/2014 by email, CM/ECF. [1199651] [14-42]
March 18, 2014 Filing 83 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Association of the Bar of the City of New York, ADDED.[1180453] [14-42]
March 18, 2014 Filing 80 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 66 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 60 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, by RJL, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1180309][80] [14-42]
March 14, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Association of the Bar of the City of New York, FILED. Service date 03/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1178616] [14-42]--[Edited 03/18/2014 by EM]
March 14, 2014 Filing 76 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Rutherford Institute, ADDED.[1178457] [14-42]
March 14, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Rutherford Institute, FILED. Service date 03/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1178224] [14-42]--[Edited 03/14/2014 by EM]
March 13, 2014 Filing 73 AMICUS BRIEF, Association of the Bar of the City of New York, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1178029] [14-42]--[Edited 03/18/2014 by EM]
March 13, 2014 Filing 72 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae PEN American Center, ADDED.[1178014] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 71 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Experts in Computer Data and Science, ADDED.[1178006] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 70 AMICUS BRIEF, Experts in Computer and Data Science, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1178002] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 69 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae National Rifle Association, Inc., ADDED.[1178001] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Experts in Computer Data and Science, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1178000] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Erwin Chemerinsky, counsel for Amicus Curiae Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by email.[1177994] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 65 ATTORNEY, Erwin Chemerinsky for Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, in case 14-42 , [ # 64 ], ADDED.[1177992] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Attorney Erwin Chemerinsky, Esq. for Amicus Curiae Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, FILED. Service date 03/13/2013 by email. [1177991] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 63 AMICUS BRIEF, National Rifle Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1177984] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 61 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 60 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by email.[1177977][61] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Laura K. Donohue, counsel for Amicus Curiae Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by email.[1177969] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Attorney Laura Donohue, Esq. for Amicus Curiae Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by email. [1177957] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 58 AMICUS BRIEF,The Rutherford Institute, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1177908] [14-42]--[Edited 03/14/2014 by EM]
March 13, 2014 Filing 57 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors, ADDED.[1177893] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 56 AMICUS BRIEF, PEN American Center, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1177739] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, PEN American Center, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1177734] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 50 AMICUS BRIEF, Senator Ron Wyden, Senator Mark Udall, and Senator Martin Heinrich, FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1177297] [14-42]
March 13, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Rifle Association, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1177192] [14-42]
March 12, 2014 Filing 46 NEW PARTY, Movant Ron Wyden, Mark Udall and Martin Heinrich, ADDED.[1176331] [14-42]
March 11, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Senator Ron Wyden, Senator Mark Udall, Senator Martin Heinrich, FILED. Service date 03/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1175077] [14-42]
March 10, 2014 Filing 43 CURED DEFECTIVE: BRIEF, [ # 42 ], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED.[1174230] [14-42]
March 7, 2014 Filing 42 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 03/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1173078] [14-42]
March 7, 2014 Filing 41 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief, [37], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED.[1172969] [14-42]
March 6, 2014 Filing 40 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 258-394), on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 03/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1172720] [14-42]
March 6, 2014 Filing 39 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 001-257), on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 03/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1172719] [14-42]
March 6, 2014 Filing 38 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 03/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1172718] [14-42]
March 6, 2014 Filing 37 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 03/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1172717] [14-42]
February 25, 2014 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Arthur Nelson Eisenberg for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation New York Civil Liberties Union New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation American Civil Liberties Union, in case 14-42 , [ # 35 ], ADDED.[1165333] [14-42]
February 24, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 02/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1163727] [14-42]
February 18, 2014 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Patrick Toomey for American Civil Liberties Union, in case 14-42 , [ # 33 ], ADDED.[1158296] [14-42]
February 11, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1154853] [14-42]
January 30, 2014 Filing 32 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant' brief and joint appendix, due date as 03/06/2014, appellee's brief due date as 04/10/2014,TRANSMITTED.[1145907] [14-42]
January 29, 2014 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Brett Max Kaufman for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation New York Civil Liberties Union New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation American Civil Liberties Union, in case 14-42 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[1145380] [14-42]
January 29, 2014 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Catherine Newby Crump for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation New York Civil Liberties Union New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation American Civil Liberties Union, in case 14-42 , [ # 26 ], ADDED.[1145378] [14-42]
January 29, 2014 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Alexander Abdo for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation New York Civil Liberties Union New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation American Civil Liberties Union, in case 14-42 , [ # 25 ], ADDED.[1145375] [14-42]
January 28, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF. [1144036] [14-42]
January 28, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF. [1143932] [14-42]
January 28, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF. [1143923] [14-42]
January 27, 2014 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, Christopher Thomas Dunn for New York Civil Liberties Union New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, in case 14-42 , [ # 22 ], ADDED.[1142905] [14-42]
January 27, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 01/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1142399] [14-42]
January 27, 2014 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, David S. Jones for Eric H. Holder Jr. Robert S. Mueller III James R. Clapper Charles T. Hagel Keith B. Alexander, in case 14-42 , [ # 19 ], ADDED.[1141854] [14-42]
January 24, 2014 Filing 20 NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[1141305] [14-42]
January 17, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Robert S. Mueller, III, FILED. Service date 01/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1137517] [14-42]
January 17, 2014 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, Charles T. Hagel, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Robert S. Mueller, III, FILED. Service date 01/17/2014 by CM/ECF.[1137439] [14-42]
January 16, 2014 Filing 11 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 01/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1136259] [14-42]
January 16, 2014 Filing 10 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 01/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1136258] [14-42]
January 16, 2014 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 01/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1136256] [14-42]
January 6, 2014 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1135557] [14-42]
January 6, 2014 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/27/2013, RECEIVED.[1135555] [14-42]
January 6, 2014 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/27/2013, RECEIVED.[1135554] [14-42]
January 6, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, New York Civil Liberties Union and New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. [1135546] [14-42]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union v. Clapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert S. Mueller, III, in his official capacity as Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: David S. Jones
Represented By: Henry Charles Whitaker Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles T. Hagel, in his official capacity as Secretary of Defense
Represented By: David S. Jones
Represented By: Henry Charles Whitaker Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith B. Alexander, in his official capacity as Director of the National Security Agency and Chief of the Central Security Service
Represented By: David S. Jones
Represented By: Henry Charles Whitaker Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Loretta E. Lynch, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: David S. Jones
Represented By: Henry Charles Whitaker Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James R. Clapper, in his official capacity as Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: David S. Jones
Represented By: Henry Charles Whitaker Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Stritzinger
Represented By: John Stritzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ranjana Natarajan, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Annemarie Bridy, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Raven-Hansen, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Karl Manheim, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Julie Cohen, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Susan Freiwald, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Laura Donohue, Esq., Professor of Law, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jessica Silbey, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert A. Heverly, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of the Bar of the City of New York
Represented By: Gary D. Sesser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Rutherford Institute
Represented By: Daniel L. Ackman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Former Members of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Edward Lee, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark Udall, Senator
Represented By: Charles S. Sims Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jennifer Granick, Esq., Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gary Hart, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Froomkin, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ralph D. Clifford, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Martin Heinrich, Senator
Represented By: Charles S. Sims Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ahmed Ghappour, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Anne Klinefelter, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brian Carver, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ron Wyden, Senator
Represented By: Charles S. Sims Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Walter Mondale, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Katherine J. Strandburg, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PEN American Center, Inc.
Represented By: Linda Jane Steinman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Rifle Association, Inc.
Represented By: John Frazer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: W. David Ball, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Experts in Computer Data and Science
Represented By: Cindy Cohn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark A. Lemley, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Swire, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: William C. Banks, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fred H. Cate
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jonathan Weinberg, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Erwin Chemerinsky, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David W. Opderbeck, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Levine, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Shubha Ghosh, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kim Lane Scheppele, Former Member of The Church Committee and Law Professors
Represented By: Laura Donohue Esq.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Arthur Nelson Eisenberg Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Toomey Esq.
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman Esq.
Represented By: Alexander Abdo
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Arthur Nelson Eisenberg Esq.
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman Esq.
Represented By: Alexander Abdo
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: New York Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Arthur Nelson Eisenberg Esq.
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Alexander Abdo
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: New York Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Arthur Nelson Eisenberg Esq.
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Alexander Abdo
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?