Zarda v. Altitude Express, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant: Melissa Zarda, co-independent executors of the estate of Donald Zarda and William Allen Moore, Jr., co-independent executor of the estate of Donald Zarda
Defendant - Appellee: Altitude Express, Inc., doing business as Skydive Long Island and Ray Maynard
Amicus Curiae: New York Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union, 9 to 5, National Association of Working Women, A Better Balance, Coalition of Labor Union Women, Equal Rights Advocates, Gender Justice, Legal Voice, National Women's Law Center, Southwest Women's Law Center, Women Employed, Women's Law Center of Maryland, Women's Law Project and Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
Case Number: 15-3775
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: CIVIL RIGHTS-Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 25, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Filing 496 CASE, before RAK, Ch.J., DJ, JAC, RSP, RDS, RR, PWH, DAL, GEL, DC, RJL, SLC, CFD, C.JJ., HEARD.[2133921] [15-3775] [Entered: 09/26/2017 04:30 PM]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER, dated 09/26/2017, LETTER, requesting to bring electronics into the courtroom has been, on behalf of Appellant has been GRANTED, FILED.[2133546] [15-3775]--[Edited 10/18/2017 by HT] [Entered: 09/26/2017 01:03 PM]
September 23, 2017 Filing 487 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 09/23/2017, on behalf of Appellant William Allen Moore, Jr. and Melissa Zarda, RECEIVED. Service date 09/23/2017 by CM/ECF.[2132029] [15-3775] [Entered: 09/23/2017 03:37 PM]
September 23, 2017 Filing 486 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant William Allen Moore, Jr. and Melissa Zarda, requesting to bring in electronic device for en banc re-hearing, RECEIVED. Service date 09/23/2017 by CM/ECF.[2132028] [15-3775]--[Edited 09/25/2017 by AJ] [Entered: 09/23/2017 02:04 PM]
September 20, 2017 Filing 484 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant William Allen Moore, Jr. and Melissa Zarda, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2129115] [15-3775] [Entered: 09/20/2017 10:42 AM]
September 14, 2017 Filing 482 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., ADDED.[2125027] [15-3775] [Entered: 09/14/2017 04:46 PM]
September 14, 2017 Filing 481 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of amicus curiae Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2124913] [15-3775]--[Edited 09/14/2017 by AJ] [Entered: 09/14/2017 03:57 PM]
September 14, 2017 Filing 480 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of amicus curiae Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2124604] [15-3775]--[Edited 09/14/2017 by AJ] [Entered: 09/14/2017 12:57 PM]
September 12, 2017 Filing 478 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Amicus Curiae United States, FILED. Service date 09/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2122337] [15-3775] [Entered: 09/12/2017 11:53 AM]
September 11, 2017 Filing 476 ATTORNEY, Hashim M. Mooppan for United States, in case 15-3775, [475], ADDED.[2120854] [15-3775] [Entered: 09/11/2017 09:36 AM]
September 7, 2017 Filing 475 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of amicus curiae United States, FILED. Service date 09/07/2017 by CM/ECF. [2119446] [15-3775]--[Edited 09/11/2017 by AJ] [Entered: 09/07/2017 04:22 PM]
August 22, 2017 Filing 474 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107602] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/22/2017 03:39 PM]
August 22, 2017 Filing 473 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Altitude Express, Inc. and Ray Maynard, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107359] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/22/2017 01:05 PM]
August 22, 2017 Filing 472 ATTORNEYS, Frederick H. Rein, Michael B. Cottier, Tiffany Mahmood, Christopher J. Morten, Nicole Tate-Naghi, Amanda B. Protess and Jonathan J. Whitney, for Amicus Curiae Legal Aid Society, TERMINATED.[2107120] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:35 AM]
August 22, 2017 Filing 470 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Amicus Curiae EEOC, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2106892] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/22/2017 10:45 AM]
August 21, 2017 Filing 468 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Adam K. Mortara, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105913] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/21/2017 01:12 PM]
August 18, 2017 Filing 467 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Gregory Antollino for Appellant William Allen Moore, Jr. and Melissa Zarda, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104991] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/18/2017 08:16 PM]
August 18, 2017 Filing 466 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Adam K. Mortara, Esq. for Amicus Curiae Adam K. Mortara, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104946] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/18/2017 05:43 PM]
August 18, 2017 Filing 465 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2104874] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:46 PM]
August 14, 2017 Filing 464 ATTORNEY, Stephanie Robin Marcus for United States, in case 15-3775 , [446], ADDED.[2099344] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/14/2017 09:39 AM]
August 9, 2017 Filing 461 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant William Allen Moore, Jr. and Melissa Zarda, FILED. Service date 08/09/2017 by CM/ECF. [2097226] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/09/2017 06:28 PM]
August 8, 2017 Filing 459 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [452] filed by Appellant Melissa Zarda and William Allen Moore, Jr., by RAK, FILED. [2096209][459] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/08/2017 04:24 PM]
August 6, 2017 Filing 452 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant William Allen Moore, Jr. and Melissa Zarda, FILED. Service date 08/06/2017 by CM/ECF. [2094407] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/06/2017 11:06 PM]
August 3, 2017 Filing 451 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Legal Aid Society, ADDED.[2092958] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/03/2017 12:50 PM]
August 3, 2017 Filing 450 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Legal Aid Society, FILED. Service date 08/03/2017 by CM/ECF. [2092940] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/03/2017 12:37 PM]
August 3, 2017 Filing 449 LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Legal Aid Society, RECEIVED. Service date 08/03/2017 by CM/ECF.[2092936] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/03/2017 12:36 PM]
August 2, 2017 Filing 447 ATTORNEY, Charles W. Scarborough for United States, in case 15-3775, [446], ADDED.[2091938] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/02/2017 02:04 PM]
August 2, 2017 Filing 446 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae United States, FILED. Service date 08/02/2017 by CM/ECF. [2091912] [15-3775] [Entered: 08/02/2017 01:41 PM]
July 28, 2017 Filing 438 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, APPENDIX, [436], [437], on behalf of Appellee Altitude Express, Inc. and Ray Maynard, FILED.[2088413] [15-3775] [Entered: 07/28/2017 10:24 AM]
July 28, 2017 Filing 437 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-96), on behalf of Appellee Altitude Express, Inc. and Ray Maynard, FILED. Service date 07/28/2017 by CM/ECF.[2088400] [15-3775] [Entered: 07/28/2017 10:18 AM]
July 28, 2017 Filing 436 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Altitude Express, Inc. and Ray Maynard, FILED. Service date 07/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [2088390] [15-3775] [Entered: 07/28/2017 10:16 AM]
July 27, 2017 Filing 434 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae New York Civil Liberties Union, ADDED.[2087899] [15-3775] [Entered: 07/27/2017 04:03 PM]
July 27, 2017 Filing 433 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae New York Civil Liberties Union, FILED. Service date 07/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2087852] [15-3775] [Entered: 07/27/2017 03:47 PM]
July 27, 2017 Filing 431 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, for admission pro hac vice [428], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Public Advocate of the United States, and United States Justice Foundation, FILED.[2087536] [15-3775] [Entered: 07/27/2017 12:23 PM]
July 26, 2017 Filing 417 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of United States, FILED. Service date 07/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [2087034] [15-3775]--[Edited 07/27/2017 by AJ] [Entered: 07/26/2017 06:55 PM]
June 28, 2017 Filing 385 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/28/2017 by CM/ECF.[2068609] [15-3775] [Entered: 06/28/2017 05:39 PM]
June 26, 2017 Filing 334 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union, New York Civil Liberties Union, National Women’ Law Center, 9to5, National Association of Working Women, A Better Balance, California Women’ Law Center, Equal Rights Advocates, Feminist Majority Foundation, Gender Justice, Legal Voice, National Organization for Women (NOW) Foundation, National Partnership for Women & Families, Southwest Women’ Law Center, Women Employed, Women’ Law Center of Maryland, Inc., Women’s Law Project, FILED. Service date 06/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [2066529] [15-3775] [Entered: 06/26/2017 05:28 PM]
June 26, 2017 Filing 333 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The LGBT Bar Association of Greater New York, Anti-Defamation League, Asian American Bar Association of New York, Association of the Bar of the City of New York, Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, Hispanic National Bar Association, Legal Aid at Work, National Queer Asian Pacific Islander Alliance, New York County Lawyers' Association and Women's Bar Association of the State of New York, , FILED. Service date 06/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [2066524] [15-3775] [Entered: 06/26/2017 05:26 PM]
June 26, 2017 Filing 330 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders and National Center for Lesbian Rights, FILED. Service date 06/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [2066510] [15-3775] [Entered: 06/26/2017 05:19 PM]
November 4, 2016 Filing 219 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae New York Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union, 9 to 5, A Better Balance, Coalition of Labor Union Women, Equal Rights Advocates, Gender Justice, Legal Voice, National Women's Law Center, Southwest Women's Law Center, Women Employed, Women's Law Center of Maryland and Women's Law Project, FILED. Service date 11/04/2016 by CM/ECF.[1900229] [15-3775] [Entered: 11/04/2016 09:50 AM]
November 3, 2016 Filing 218 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/03/2016 by CM/ECF.[1899746] [15-3775] [Entered: 11/03/2016 03:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Zarda v. Altitude Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Melissa Zarda, co-independent executors of the estate of Donald Zarda
Represented By: Gregory Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: William Allen Moore, Jr., co-independent executor of the estate of Donald Zarda
Represented By: Gregory Antollino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Altitude Express, Inc., doing business as Skydive Long Island
Represented By: Saul D. Zabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Ray Maynard
Represented By: Saul D. Zabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 9 to 5, National Association of Working Women
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: A Better Balance
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition of Labor Union Women
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Equal Rights Advocates
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gender Justice
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Voice
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Women's Law Center
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southwest Women's Law Center
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women Employed
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women's Law Center of Maryland
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women's Law Project
Represented By: Erin B. Harrist
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Michael Donald Barton Kavey
Represented By: Gregory R. Nevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?