Gonzalez v. Morris
Defendant: Joseph Payton, Deputy Superintendent of Programs of ADK and Jeffrey Tedford, Superintendent; Adirondack Correctional Facility
Defendant / Appellee: Cheryl Morris, Director of Ministerial, Family and Volunteer Services and Stan Barton, Deputy Superintendent of Programs of ADK
Plaintiff / Appellant: Michael Gonzalez
Case Number: 19-1046
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 27 ADDRESS CHANGE REQUEST, dated 06/07/2019, COMPLETED.[2584104] [19-1046] [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:31 AM]
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 PAPERS, Motion, for change of address filed by Appellant Michael Gonzalez, not required per letter filed on 06/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2584098] [19-1046] [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:26 AM]
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 ADDRESS CHANGE LETTER, dated 06/03/2019, on behalf of Appellant Michael Gonzalez, informing the Court of his new address, RECEIVED. No service date.[2584095] [19-1046] [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:25 AM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[2576408] [19-1046] [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:53 AM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 22 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Michael Gonzalez, informing Court of proposed due date 07/18/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 05/09/2019 by US mail.[2564275] [19-1046] [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:52 AM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2556418] [19-1046] [Entered: 05/06/2019 01:06 PM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE, to Appellee Stan Barton and Cheryl Morris, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2556226] [19-1046] [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:26 AM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/24/2019, denying IFP, RECEIVED.[2556221] [19-1046] [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:23 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Michael Gonzalez, FILED. Service date 04/29/2019 by US mail.[2556260] [19-1046] [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:41 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Michael Gonzalez, FILED. Service date 04/29/2019 by US mail.[2556255] [19-1046] [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:37 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Michael Gonzalez, FILED. Service date 04/29/2019 by US mail.[2556245] [19-1046] [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:35 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERS, copy of district court order denying IFP, RECEIVED.[2556216] [19-1046] [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:21 AM]
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2544078] [19-1046] [Entered: 04/19/2019 12:43 PM]
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE, re: pending district court IFP motion, to district court, SENT.[2544074] [19-1046] [Entered: 04/19/2019 12:39 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/25/2018, RECEIVED.[2544072] [19-1046] [Entered: 04/19/2019 12:38 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 04/09/1949, RECEIVED.[2544069] [19-1046] [Entered: 04/19/2019 12:37 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael Gonzalez, FILED. [2544064] [19-1046] [Entered: 04/19/2019 12:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cheryl Morris, Director of Ministerial, Family and Volunteer Services
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stan Barton, Deputy Superintendent of Programs of ADK
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Payton, Deputy Superintendent of Programs of ADK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Tedford, Superintendent; Adirondack Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?