Stacey v. Commissioner of Social Securit
Defendant / Appellee: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff / Appellant: Albert A. Stacey, II
Case Number: 19-108
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 27 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Albert A. Stacey, II Brief due date as 04/16/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 04/16/2019, FILED.[2485120] [19-108] [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:36 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 24 NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[2484809] [19-108] [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:25 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Nikolas P. Kerest for Commissioner of Social Security Administration, in case 19-108, [ # 20 ], ADDED.[2477574] [19-108] [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:31 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security Administration, FILED. Service date 01/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2477564] [19-108] [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:25 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Albert A. Stacey, II, FILED. Service date 01/17/2019 by CM/ECF.[2477319] [19-108] [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:19 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security Administration, FILED. Service date 01/17/2019 by CM/ECF.[2477249] [19-108] [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:50 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Rebecca Estelle, [ # 16 ], in place of attorney Lauren Myers, SUBSTITUTED.[2477198] [19-108] [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:28 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security Administration, FILED. Service date 01/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2477183] [19-108] [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:22 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Albert A. Stacey, II, informing the Court that Pursuant Local Rule 30.1(e)(1)(B), Appellant Albert A. Stacey will not file an appendix to his brief, RECEIVED. Service date 01/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2476440] [19-108] [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:15 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Albert A. Stacey, II, informing Court of proposed due date 04/16/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 01/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2476437] [19-108] [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:12 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Albert A. Stacey, II, FILED. Service date 01/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2476087] [19-108] [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:36 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Albert A. Stacey, II, FILED. Service date 01/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2476085] [19-108] [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:35 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2475682] [19-108] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:53 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Carolyn A. Kubitschek, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Phyllis E. Rubenstein, SUBSTITUTED.[2473731] [19-108] [Entered: 01/11/2019 04:48 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Albert A. Stacey, II, FILED. Service date 01/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2473723] [19-108] [Entered: 01/11/2019 04:43 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Phyllis E. Rubenstein, Esq. for Appellant Albert A. Stacey, II, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2473078] [19-108] [Entered: 01/11/2019 10:47 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/15/2018, RECEIVED.[2473065] [19-108] [Entered: 01/11/2019 10:42 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Albert A. Stacey, II, FILED. [2473050] [19-108] [Entered: 01/11/2019 10:36 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Stacey v. Commissioner of Social Securit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Rebecca Hope Estelle
Represented By: Nikolas P. Kerest Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Albert A. Stacey, II
Represented By: Carolyn A. Kubitschek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?