French v. Erie County Board of Election

Defendant: Ralph Mohr, Commissioner, Dennis Ward, Commissioner and Erie County Board of Election
Defendant / Appellee: The County of Erie
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jacqueline French
Case Number: 19-110
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 37 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2491798] [19-110] [Entered: 02/07/2019 02:00 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2490606] [19-110] [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:55 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jacqueline French, FILED. Service date 02/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2489424] [19-110] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:26 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 32 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/25/2019, Start Time: 1:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2489393] [19-110] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:04 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 30 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/15/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2487510] [19-110] [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:42 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 28 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/19/2019, Start Time: 1:00 PM, Conference Note: conference remains as previously scheduled, please see corrected attachment, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2485829] [19-110] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:01 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 27 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/19/2019, Start Time: 1:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2485796] [19-110] [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:50 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 24 INDEX/ROA NOTICE, to Appellant Jacqueline French, past due material(s) to be submitted by 02/08/2019, SENT.[2483942] [19-110] [Entered: 01/29/2019 08:59 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 21 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jacqueline French, FILED. Service date 01/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2483410] [19-110] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:55 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jacqueline French, FILED. Service date 01/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2483407] [19-110] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:53 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 12 ] filed by Appellant Jacqueline French Counsel is directed to register as a Filing User under Local Rule 25.1 to file documents electronically in this case within three (3) days of the date of this order, by DC, FILED. [2482743][19] [19-110] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:04 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant Jacqueline French, FILED. Service date 01/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2478503][15] [19-110] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:47 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellant Jacqueline French, FILED. Service date 01/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2475910] [19-110] [Entered: 01/15/2019 04:49 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 CAPTION, Erie County Board of Election, Ralph Mohr, and Dennis Ward, no longer designated as appellees, AMENDED.[2473978] [19-110] [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:48 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 9 ], on behalf of Appellee County of Erie, FILED.[2473577] [19-110] [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:38 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee County of Erie, FILED. Service date 01/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2473571] [19-110] [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:35 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [7], on behalf of Appellee County of Erie, FILED.[2473538] [19-110] [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:22 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee County of Erie, FILED. Service date 01/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2473520] [19-110] [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:09 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Le Roi C. Johnson, Esq. for Appellant Jacqueline French, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2473189] [19-110] [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:42 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jacqueline French, district court receipt # 02093328305, FILED.[2473187] [19-110] [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:41 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2473183] [19-110] [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:40 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jacqueline French, FILED. [2473162] [19-110] [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French v. Erie County Board of Election
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The County of Erie
Represented By: Melinda G. Disare Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Mohr, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Ward, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie County Board of Election
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jacqueline French
Represented By: LeRoi C. Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?