Aegis Managing Agency Limited v. Micron Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Argo Managing Agency Limited, Pembroke Managing Agency Limited, Chubb Managing Agent Limited, Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited, Liberty Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Furlonge Ltd, Pioneer Underwriting Ltd., MS AMLIN Underwriting Limited, Novae Syndicates Limited, Aegis Managing Agency Limited, Antares Managing Agency Limited and Allied World Managing Agency Limited
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, China Re UK Ltd., MS Amlin plc, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, Chaucer Syndicates Limited, Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Aegis London Holdings Ltd and Ironshore, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: Micron Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 19-1118
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to expedite appeal [ # 35 ] filed by Appellant Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Chaucer Syndicates Limited, MS Amlin plc, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, China Re UK Ltd., Beazley Group Limited, Ironshore, Inc., Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Antares Underwriting Limited, Aegis London Holdings Ltd and Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), by RJL, FILED. [2586430][48] [19-1118] [Entered: 06/13/2019 02:32 PM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 41 ], on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED. Service date 06/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2580011][44] [19-1118] [Entered: 06/05/2019 07:14 AM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 41 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 35 ], on behalf of Appellee Micron Technology, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/28/2019 by CM/ECF. [2573585] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:10 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 39 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, informing Court of proposed due date 07/10/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 05/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2569638] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:50 PM]
May 17, 2019 Filing 37 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Micron Technology, Inc., in re: advising Court party plans on filing an opposition, RECEIVED. Service date 05/17/2019 by CM/ECF.[2566432] [19-1118]--[Edited 05/17/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/17/2019 11:36 AM]
May 16, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED. Service date 05/16/2019 by CM/ECF. [2566021] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:05 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 34 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/24/2019, Start Time: 1:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2559955] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:43 AM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 33 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2559649] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:20 AM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Micron Technology, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2559152] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:41 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 27 CURED DEFECTIVE Form D [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED.[2558332] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:58 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 26 CURED DEFECTIVE Form C [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED.[2558327] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:56 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 25 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED.[2558311] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:50 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 24 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED.[2558288] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:40 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY, Patrick Ryan McElduff for MS Amlin plc Ironshore, Inc. Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited Beazley Group Limited Argo Managing Agency Limited Canopius Managing Agents Limited Chaucer Syndicates Limited China Re UK Ltd. Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd Antares Underwriting Limited Aegis London Holdings Ltd Argenta Syndicate Management Limited Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), in case 19-1118, [ # 22 ], ADDED.[2558284] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:39 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED. Service date 05/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2558176] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:06 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 21 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED. Service date 05/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2558108] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:49 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 20 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [13], on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED.[2558107] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:49 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 19 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED. Service date 05/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2558099] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:48 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 18 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [12], on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED.[2558085] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:44 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED. Service date 05/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2558084] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:43 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [11], on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED.[2558059] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:37 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [10], on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED.[2558020] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:26 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd and MS Amlin plc, FILED. Service date 05/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2557845] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:32 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED. Service date 05/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2557803] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:12 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED. Service date 05/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2557799] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:08 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd and MS Amlin plc, FILED. Service date 05/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2557794] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:05 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Martin Howard Myers for Micron Technology, Inc., in case 19-1118, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[2555724] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/03/2019 04:48 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Micron Technology, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/03/2019 by CM/ECF. [2555392] [19-1118] [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:17 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16746012, FILED.[2548822] [19-1118] [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:58 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2548819] [19-1118] [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:56 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/12/2019, RECEIVED.[2548815] [19-1118] [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:52 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 04/11/2019, RECEIVED.[2548814] [19-1118] [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:51 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Aegis London Holdings Ltd, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Beazley Group Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd, MS Amlin plc and Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, FILED. [2548782] [19-1118] [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Aegis Managing Agency Limited v. Micron Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Liberty Corporate Capital Ltd
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hiscox Insurance Company Ltd
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: China Re UK Ltd.
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MS Amlin plc
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Antares Underwriting Limited
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Canopius Managing Agents Limited
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Argenta Syndicate Management Limited
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Beazley Group Limited
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chaucer Syndicates Limited
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chubb Underwriting Agencies Limited
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK)
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Aegis London Holdings Ltd
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ironshore, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Carbin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Ryan McElduff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argo Managing Agency Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pembroke Managing Agency Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb Managing Agent Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiscox Syndicates Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathedral Underwriting Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Managing Agency Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beazley Furlonge Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Underwriting Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MS AMLIN Underwriting Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novae Syndicates Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aegis Managing Agency Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antares Managing Agency Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Managing Agency Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: David Andrew Luttinger Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Martin Howard Myers Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?