Frost v. New York City Police Departmen
Defendant: Correctional Officer John Doe, #1-5 individually and in their official capacity as New York Police Officers, C.O. Thomas, Detectives John Doe, #14 individually and in their official capacity as New York City Police Officers and C.O. John Doe #1-5
Defendant / Appellee: District Attorney Robert Hertz, Assistant, Detective Joseph O'Neil, C.O. Souffrant, C.O. Captain McDuffie, Detective Michael Lopuzzo, (Tax ID #882662), C.O Previllon, C.O. Tatouli, C.O. Gonzalez, C.O. Soria, C.O. Sanchez, New York City Police Department, New York City Department of Correction, C.O. McLaughlin, C.O. Carty, C.O. Corker, C.O. Hill, C.O. Young, District Attorney Robert T. Johnson, Bronx County, C.O. Jay Joye, C.O. Barksdale, C.O. Captain Clayton Jemmott, C.O. Torres, Detective Richard Spennicchia, City of New York and C.O. Captain Ryan
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jarrett Frost
Case Number: 19-1163
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Filing 26 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/02/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2568606] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/21/2019 10:58 AM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/02/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2568600] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/21/2019 10:54 AM]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER, dated 05/17/2019, setting Appellant Jarrett Frost's brief and appendix filing date for on or before 08/01/2019, as the date selected exceeds the time allowed by the Rule; the appeal is dismissed effective 08/01/2019 if the brief is not filed by that date, FILED.[2566979] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/17/2019 05:07 PM]
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jarrett Frost, informing Court of proposed due date 08/16/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 05/17/2019 by CM/ECF.[2566649] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/17/2019 01:50 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Claibourne Henry, [ # 17 ], in place of attorney Zachary W. Carter, SUBSTITUTED.[2558583] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:56 AM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ms. Barksdale, Carty, City of New York, Corker, Gonzalez, Robert Hertz, Hill, Clayton Jemmott, Robert T. Johnson, Jay Joye, Michael Lopuzzo, McDuffie, McLaughlin, New York City Department of Correction, New York City Police Department, Joseph O'Neil, Previllon, Ryan, Sanchez, Soria, Souffrant, Richard Spennicchia, Tatouli, Torres and Young, FILED. Service date 05/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2558331] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:58 PM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2556429] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/06/2019 01:16 PM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jarrett Frost, FILED. Service date 05/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2554523] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/02/2019 05:25 PM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jarrett Frost, FILED. Service date 05/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2554519] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/02/2019 05:23 PM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jarrett Frost, FILED. Service date 05/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2554518] [19-1163] [Entered: 05/02/2019 05:23 PM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jarrett Frost, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16773191, FILED.[2550462] [19-1163] [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:00 PM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/28/2019, RECEIVED.[2550458] [19-1163] [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:59 PM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2550456] [19-1163] [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:58 PM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jarrett Frost, FILED. [2550451] [19-1163] [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. New York City Police Departmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District Attorney Robert Hertz, Assistant
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Detective Joseph O'Neil
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Souffrant
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Captain McDuffie
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Detective Michael Lopuzzo, (Tax ID #882662)
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O Previllon
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Tatouli
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Gonzalez
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Soria
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Sanchez
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York City Police Department
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York City Department of Correction
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. McLaughlin
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Carty
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Corker
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Hill
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Young
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District Attorney Robert T. Johnson, Bronx County
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Jay Joye
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Barksdale
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Captain Clayton Jemmott
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Torres
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Detective Richard Spennicchia
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. Captain Ryan
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Claibourne Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer John Doe, #1-5 individually and in their official capacity as New York Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detectives John Doe, #14 individually and in their official capacity as New York City Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. John Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jarrett Frost
Represented By: Jonathan I. Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?