Emamian v. Rockefeller University
Plaintiff / Appellant: Effat S. Emamian
Defendant / Appellee: Rockefeller University
Case Number: 19-127
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 47 CURED DEFECTIVE LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification [ # 46 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Rockefeller University, FILED.[2496641] [19-127, 19-168] [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:37 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 46 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [ # 2495312-2 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Rockefeller University, FILED.[2496633] [19-127, 19-168] [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:31 AM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 45 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Effat S. Emamian Brief due date as 04/26/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 04/26/2019, FILED.[2493890] [19-127, 19-168] [Entered: 02/11/2019 01:36 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 42 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Effat S. Emamian, informing Court of proposed due date 04/26/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2493199] [19-127] [Entered: 02/08/2019 04:40 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 41 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2486855] [19-127, 19-168] [Entered: 01/31/2019 04:28 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 38 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/05/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2486107] [19-168] [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:14 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 36 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/05/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2482789] [19-127] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:25 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 33 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Effat S. Emamian, FILED. Service date 01/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2482530] [19-127] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:04 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 32 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Effat S. Emamian, FILED. Service date 01/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2482528] [19-127] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:04 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Effat S. Emamian, FILED. Service date 01/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2482516] [19-127] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:49 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Luna Droubi for Effat S. Emamian, in case 19-168 , [ # 2481868-2 ], ADDED.[2481955] [19-168] [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:37 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Luna Droubi for Effat S. Emamian, in case 19-127 , [ # 28 ], ADDED.[2481821] [19-127] [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:39 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Effat S. Emamian in 19-127, Appellee Effat S. Emamian in 19-168, FILED. Service date 01/24/2019 by CM/ECF. [2481767] [19-127, 19-168] [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:02 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Mariya Nazginova for Rockefeller University, in case 19-127 Mariya Nazginova for Rockefeller University, in case 19-168 , [ # 25 ], ADDED.[2479548] [19-127, 19-168] [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:35 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Harris Michael Mufson for Rockefeller University, in case 19-127 Harris Michael Mufson for Rockefeller University, in case 19-168 , [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2479546] [19-127, 19-168] [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:34 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Rockefeller University in 19-127, Appellant Rockefeller University in 19-168, FILED. Service date 01/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2479539] [19-127, 19-168] [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:28 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Rockefeller University in 19-127, Appellant Rockefeller University in 19-168, FILED. Service date 01/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2479517] [19-127, 19-168] [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:22 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY, Bettina Plevan for Rockefeller University, in case 19-168 , [ # 2479501-2 ], ADDED.[2479505] [19-168] [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:18 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, Bettina Plevan for Rockefeller University, in case 19-127 , [ # 21 ], ADDED.[2479407] [19-127] [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:30 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Rockefeller University, FILED. Service date 01/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2479339] [19-127] [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:54 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Rockefeller University, FILED. Service date 01/22/2019 by CM/ECF.[2479329] [19-127] [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:47 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 CAPTION, cross appeal added, AMENDED.[2477057] [19-127] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:19 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTE: See lead case, 19-127, containing complete set of docket entries.[2477056] [19-168] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:19 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 NEW CASE 19-168, on behalf of Rockefeller University, FILED.[2477048] [19-127] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:15 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2477044] [19-168] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:13 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2477043] [19-168] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:13 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Rockefeller University, district court receipt # BNYSDC-16173945, FILED.[2477042] [19-168] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:12 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/15/2018, RECEIVED.[2477039] [19-168] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:11 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 06/08/2018, RECEIVED.[2477038] [19-168] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:10 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 DISTRICT COURT OPINION & ORDER, dated 02/21/2018, RECEIVED.[2477036] [19-168] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:10 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Rockefeller University, FILED. [2477031] [19-168] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:08 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2474132] [19-127] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:09 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Effat S. Emamian, district court receipt # BNYSDC16173945, FILED.[2474129] [19-127] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:08 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2474126] [19-127] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:07 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 06/08/2018, RECEIVED.[2474124] [19-127] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:06 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Effat S. Emamian, FILED. [2474117] [19-127] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:01 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emamian v. Rockefeller University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Effat S. Emamian
Represented By: Jonathan Clifford Moore
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rockefeller University
Represented By: Harris Michael Mufson Esq.
Represented By: Elise M. Bloom Esq.
Represented By: Bettina Plevan
Represented By: Mariya Nazginova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?