IN RE: BHP BILLITON LIMITED SE
Plaintiff: Jackson County Employees' Retirement System, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, James A. Crumpley and Gary Katz, Individually and On Behalf of all others Similarly Situated
Defendant: Andrew Mackenzie, Graham Kerr, Jac Nasser, Peter Beaven, BHP Billiton PLC and BHP Billiton Limited
Not Yet Classified: John W Davis and John W. Davis
Plaintiff / Appellee: City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System and City of Birmingham Firemen's and Policemen's Supplemental Pension System
Case Number: 19-1378
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 29 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant John W. Davis Brief due date as 08/22/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 08/22/2019, FILED.[2598082] [19-1378] [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:52 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2598031] [19-1378] [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:21 AM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, informing Court of proposed due date 08/22/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 06/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2581012] [19-1378] [Entered: 06/05/2019 06:57 PM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee City of Birmingham Firemen's and Policemen's Supplemental Pension System and City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, FILED. Service date 05/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2574528] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:30 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED.[2572683] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/28/2019 08:57 AM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED. Service date 05/24/2019 by CM/ECF.[2572632] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:47 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [17], [18], on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED.[2571807] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:55 AM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED. Service date 05/23/2019 by CM/ECF.[2571760] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:52 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED. Service date 05/23/2019 by CM/ECF.[2571756] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:52 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED. Service date 05/23/2019 by CM/ECF.[2571755] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:51 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED.[2571551] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:08 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [10], on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED.[2571546] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:02 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, C. Benjamin Nutley for John W Davis, in case 19-1378 , [ # 12 ], ADDED.[2571544] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:01 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED. Service date 05/23/2019 by CM/ECF. [2571492] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:33 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED. Service date 05/23/2019 by CM/ECF.[2571430] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:01 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED. Service date 05/22/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2570807] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/22/2019 09:11 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Joseph D. Daley, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney Joseph Russello, SUBSTITUTED.[2569731] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/22/2019 08:41 AM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System and City of Birmingham Firemen's and Policemen's Supplemental Pension System, FILED. Service date 05/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2569667] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:19 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2561457] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:14 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, district court receipt # NYSDC-16858609, FILED.[2561455] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:13 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/10/2019, RECEIVED.[2561453] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:13 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/10/2019, RECEIVED.[2561451] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:12 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John W Davis, FILED. [2561445] [19-1378] [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: BHP BILLITON LIMITED SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jac Nasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Beaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: John W Davis
Represented By: John W. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: John W. Davis
Represented By: John W. Davis
Represented By: C. Benjamin Nutley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System
Represented By: Joseph Russello Esq.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: City of Birmingham Firemen's and Policemen's Supplemental Pension System
Represented By: Joseph Russello Esq.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson County Employees' Retirement System, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Crumpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Katz, Individually and On Behalf of all others Similarly Situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?