Komatsu v. The City of New York
Defendant: New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities, New York City Police Department and John Doe 1
Defendant / Appellee: Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer, Pinny Ringel, Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508), Deputy Inspector Redmond Howard, New York City Police Department (NYPD), Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141, NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves, NYPD Officer Yu Lie, NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326, NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577, Harold Miller, Rachel Atcheson, City of New York and Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478)
Plaintiff / Appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Case Number: 19-1612
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 07/15/2019, DISMISSED.[2608288] [19-539, 19-701, 19-805, 19-809, 19-938, 19-1375, 19-1376, 19-1382, 19-1387, 19-1388, 19-1488, 19-1612] [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:34 AM]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, dated 07/15/2019, dismissing the appeal by DC, RJS, JFB, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[2608274] [19-539, 19-701, 19-805, 19-809, 19-938, 19-1375, 19-1376, 19-1382, 19-1387, 19-1388, 19-1488, 19-1612] [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:30 AM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2608252] [19-539, 19-701, 19-805, 19-809, 19-938, 19-1375, 19-1376, 19-1382, 19-1387, 19-1388, 19-1488, 19-1612] [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:25 AM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/03/2019, to SDNY/NYNY, ISSUED.[2577442] [19-539, 19-701, 19-805, 19-809, 19-938, 19-1375, 19-1376, 19-1382, 19-1387, 19-1388, 19-1488, 19-1612] [Entered: 06/03/2019 10:25 AM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to stay [ # 2572451-2 ], filed by Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 19-539. It is ordered that the appeals will be dismissed effective August 12, 2019 if Appellant's Form D-P and Acknowledgment Form are not filed by that date, by RJL, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2577406][10] [19-539, 19-701, 19-805, 19-809, 19-938, 19-1375, 19-1376, 19-1382, 19-1387, 19-1388, 19-1488, 19-1612] [Entered: 06/03/2019 10:16 AM]
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2576507] [19-1612] [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:41 AM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2576500] [19-1612] [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:38 AM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTE: See lead case, 19-539, containing complete set of docket entries.[2576497] [19-1612] [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:37 AM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 05/29/2019, RECEIVED.[2576433] [19-1612] [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:05 AM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. [2576399] [19-1612] [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komatsu v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pinny Ringel
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508)
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Inspector Redmond Howard, New York City Police Department (NYPD)
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Yu Lie
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Harold Miller
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rachel Atcheson
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478)
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Represented By: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?