Means v. Jolsten
Defendant: Ms. Tolomeo, Therapist and Mr. Galant, M.D
Defendant / Appellee: Jared Olmsted, C.O, FKA Jolsten and John Bergman, FKA John Doe
Plaintiff / Appellant: Antuane Means
Case Number: 19-1776
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 08/07/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/28/2019, unless Appellant Antuane Means submits, a signed prisoner authorization form, copy to pro se, FILED.[2626504] [19-1776] [Entered: 08/07/2019 12:54 PM]
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 07/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 07/31/2019, unless Appellant Antuane Means submits, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2604146] [19-1776] [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:16 AM]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, dated 07/03/2019, dismissing appeal by 07/24/2019, unless Appellant Antuane Means submits, Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2600383] [19-1776] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:05 AM]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, dated 07/03/2019, dismissing appeal by 07/24/2019, unless Appellant Antuane Means submits, fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se, FILED.[2600374] [19-1776] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:02 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY, Jennifer L. Clark, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney Barbara Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2599897] [19-1776] [Entered: 07/02/2019 04:01 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee John Bergman and Jared Olmsted, FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by US mail. [2599858] [19-1776] [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:44 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2590281] [19-1776] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:59 AM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2590278] [19-1776] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:58 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2590276] [19-1776] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:56 AM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT REPORT and RECOMMENDATION, dated 06/03/2019, RECEIVED.[2590271] [19-1776] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:55 AM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Antuane Means, FILED. [2590265] [19-1776] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Means v. Jolsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jared Olmsted, C.O, FKA Jolsten
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Jennifer L. Clark Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Bergman, FKA John Doe
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Jennifer L. Clark Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Tolomeo, Therapist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Galant, M.D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Antuane Means
Represented By: Antuane Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?