Santorelli v. Town Of Islip
Defendant / Appellee: Tracey Krut, as Chief of Staff, Jason Mistretta, as Chief Inspector of Code Enforcement, Thomas Owens, as Commissioner of Department of Public Works, Anthony D'Amico, as Islip Town Safety Commissioner, Town of Islip, John Doe No. 2, Angie M. Carpenter, as Town of Islip Supervisor and John Doe No. 1
Plaintiff / Appellant: Thomas Santorelli
Case Number: 19-2153
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to withdraw appeal, [16], on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2629015] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:37 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION, to withdraw appeal, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, FILED. Service date 08/06/2019 by US mail.[2629011] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:36 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 13 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, FILED.[2624280] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:16 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by US mail.[2624239] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:53 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [12], on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623240] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:13 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by US mail.[2623145] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:10 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknolwedgment and Notice of Appearance, [10], on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623033] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:08 AM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by US mail.[2622976] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:41 AM]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, dated 08/01/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/22/2019, unless Appellant Thomas Santorelli, submits Acknoweldgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2622707] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:01 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE, to Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2622529] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:16 PM]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, dated 07/30/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/20/2019, unless Appellant Thomas Santorelli, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2620777] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:53 PM]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, dated 07/30/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/20/2019, unless Appellant Thomas Santorelli, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2620776] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:47 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2610785] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:51 PM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2610776] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:49 PM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2610773] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:45 PM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 06/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2610772] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:45 PM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, FILED. [2610769] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Santorelli v. Town Of Islip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tracey Krut, as Chief of Staff
Represented By: William D. Wexler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jason Mistretta, as Chief Inspector of Code Enforcement
Represented By: William D. Wexler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thomas Owens, as Commissioner of Department of Public Works
Represented By: William D. Wexler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony D'Amico, as Islip Town Safety Commissioner
Represented By: William D. Wexler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Town of Islip
Represented By: William D. Wexler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe No. 2
Represented By: William D. Wexler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Angie M. Carpenter, as Town of Islip Supervisor
Represented By: William D. Wexler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe No. 1
Represented By: William D. Wexler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas Santorelli
Represented By: Thomas Santorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?