United States of America v. Lowe (Huertas)
Defendant: Robert Williams, AKA Sealed Defendant 4, Samantha Livingston, AKA Sealed Defendant 16, Bryan Rivera, AKA Sealed Defendant 15, Kevin Lowe, AKA Sealed Defendant 1, Ronald Carr, AKA Sealed Defendant 24, David Stewart, AKA Sealed Defendant 18, AKA Cash Money, AKA Pork Chop, Darryl Brathwaite, AKA Sealed Defendant 21, Ravelo Manzanillo, AKA Sealed Defendant 12, AKA Grande, Vokart Alsaidi, AKA Sealed Defendant 19, George Barrow, AKA Sealed Defendant 6, AKA Coco, Evelyn White, AKA Sealed Defendant 9, Theodore Roosevelt Johnson, AKA Sealed Defendant 22, John Coleman, AKA John John, Kendrick Chandler, AKA Sealed Defendant 20, Sheila Carter, AKA Sealed Defendant 11, Bridget Higgins, AKA Sealed Defendant 17, Waleed Alsaidi, AKA Sealed Defendant 23, Robert Terdiman, Cedric White, AKA Sealed Defendant 10, AKA Sin, Olga Mendoza Delarosa, AKA Sealed Defendant 14, Donald Carr, AKA Sealed Defendant 5, AKA Buster, Elijah Pinckney, AKA Sealed Defendant 8, David Moody, AKA Sealed Defendant 2, Bradley Mitchell, AKA Sealed Defendant 7 and Rashawn Whidbee
Not Yet Classified: United States of America
Defendant / Appellant: Jonathan Huertas, AKA Sealed Defendant 13
Case Number: 19-2296
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by CM/ECF. [2623600] [19-2296] [Entered: 08/02/2019 05:20 PM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Christopher Booth, for Jonathan Huertas, TERMINATED.[2621152] [19-2296] [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:29 AM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to be relieved as attorney [ # 8 ] filed by Appellant Jonathan Huertas, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Within 30 days of the date of this order, Appellant must inform the Court of whether he has retained new counsel, whether he wishes to proceed pro se, or whether he would like the Court to appoint new counsel pursuant to the Criminal Justice Act. Any request for appointment of counsel must include a completed CJA Form 23 Financial Affidavit, copy to pro se, FILED. [2621145][12] [19-2296] [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:26 AM]
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS ATTORNEY [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Huertas, FILED.[2620538] [19-2296] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:06 PM]
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION, to be relieved as attorney, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Huertas, FILED. Service date 07/30/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2620503] [19-2296] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:56 PM]
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to be relieved as attorney, [6], on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Huertas, FILED.[2620363] [19-2296] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:10 PM]
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION, to be relieved as attorney, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Huertas, FILED. Service date 07/30/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2620268] [19-2296] [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:06 PM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2617849] [19-2296] [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:12 AM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2617848] [19-2296] [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:11 AM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Huertas, FILED. [2617828] [19-2296] [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lowe (Huertas)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Williams, AKA Sealed Defendant 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Livingston, AKA Sealed Defendant 16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Rivera, AKA Sealed Defendant 15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lowe, AKA Sealed Defendant 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Carr, AKA Sealed Defendant 24
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stewart, AKA Sealed Defendant 18, AKA Cash Money, AKA Pork Chop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Brathwaite, AKA Sealed Defendant 21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravelo Manzanillo, AKA Sealed Defendant 12, AKA Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vokart Alsaidi, AKA Sealed Defendant 19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Barrow, AKA Sealed Defendant 6, AKA Coco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn White, AKA Sealed Defendant 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Roosevelt Johnson, AKA Sealed Defendant 22
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Coleman, AKA John John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendrick Chandler, AKA Sealed Defendant 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Carter, AKA Sealed Defendant 11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget Higgins, AKA Sealed Defendant 17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waleed Alsaidi, AKA Sealed Defendant 23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Terdiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric White, AKA Sealed Defendant 10, AKA Sin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Mendoza Delarosa, AKA Sealed Defendant 14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Carr, AKA Sealed Defendant 5, AKA Buster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elijah Pinckney, AKA Sealed Defendant 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Moody, AKA Sealed Defendant 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Mitchell, AKA Sealed Defendant 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashawn Whidbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Kathleen Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Jonathan Huertas, AKA Sealed Defendant 13
Represented By: Jonathan Huertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?