Rodrigues v. American Security Insurance Co
Plaintiff / Appellant: Elder Toledo Rodrigues
Defendant / Appellee: Green Tree Servicing, LLC, its affiliates and/or assigns, American Security Insurance Company and Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 19-2337
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, [ # 8 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Elder Toledo Rodrigues failure to file form D-P, EFFECTIVE. [2660072] [19-2337] [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:42 AM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[2660066] [19-2337] [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:38 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Elder Toledo Rodrigues, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by US mail.[2653276] [19-2337] [Entered: 09/11/2019 07:26 PM]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, dated 08/22/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/12/2019, unless Elder Toledo Rodrigues, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2639585] [19-2337] [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:10 PM]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, dated 08/19/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/09/2019, unless Appellant Elder Toledo Rodrigues, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2635791] [19-2337] [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:06 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE, to Appellees American Security Insurance Company, Ditech Financial LLC and Green Tree Servicing, LLC, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2635784] [19-2337] [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:02 PM]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, dated 08/19/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/09/2019, unless Appellant Elder Toledo Rodrigues, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2635779] [19-2337] [Entered: 08/19/2019 12:58 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/02/2019, denying IFP, RECEIVED.[2623994] [19-2337] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:24 AM]
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2620374] [19-2337] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:20 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2620371] [19-2337] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:17 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 05/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2620366] [19-2337] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:15 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Elder Toledo Rodrigues, FILED. [2620359] [19-2337] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rodrigues v. American Security Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Elder Toledo Rodrigues
Represented By: Elder Toledo Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Green Tree Servicing, LLC, its affiliates and/or assigns
Represented By: Casey Devin Laffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Judith Treger Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Casey Devin Laffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?