Valle v. Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff / Appellant: Nelson Valle
Defendant / Appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee Certificate Holder of CWABS, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificate Holders, Servies 2005-4, FKA The Bank of New York and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 19-2648
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 11/07/2019, appellee's brief due date as 12/12/2019, copy to pro se, TRANSMITTED.[2671142] [19-2648] [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:28 AM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, copy to pro se, ASSIGNED.[2671073] [19-2648] [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:55 AM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Nelson Valle, informing Court of proposed due date 12/10/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/23/2019 by US mail.[2667666] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:08 AM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Nelson Valle, FILED. Service date 09/23/2019 by US mail.[2667658] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:04 AM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Nelson Valle, FILED. Service date 09/23/2019 by US mail.[2667587] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:29 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Nelson Valle, district court receipt # CTXH00016067, FILED.[2650556] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:21 PM]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, dated 09/09/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/30/2019, unless Appellant Nelson Valle, submits Form D-P, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2650112] [19-2648]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by TT] [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:26 AM]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, dated 09/09/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/30/2019, unless Appellant Nelson Valle, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2650096] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:23 AM]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 09/09/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/30/2019, unless Appellant Nelson Valle, submits fee or moves to proceed in forma pauperis, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2650084] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:19 AM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellees Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED.[2647585] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:27 AM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED. Service date 09/05/2019 by US mail.[2647548] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:11 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [6], on behalf of Appellees Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED.[2646631] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:58 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED. Service date 09/04/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2646454] [19-2648] [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:33 AM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2639691] [19-2648] [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:32 AM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2639683] [19-2648] [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:29 AM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2639678] [19-2648] [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:27 AM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Nelson Valle, FILED. [2639670] [19-2648]--[Edited 08/23/2019 by TT] [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Valle v. Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nelson Valle
Represented By: Nelson Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee Certificate Holder of CWABS, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificate Holders, Servies 2005-4, FKA The Bank of New York
Represented By: Pierre-Yves Kolakowski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Pierre-Yves Kolakowski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?