Hill v. Veterans Affairs
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Defendant / Appellee: United States of America and Margaret Dean, AKA Margaret Hill
Plaintiff / Appellant: Amanda Hill, as Administrator of the Estate of Walter Hill
Case Number: 19-2704
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 25 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE and FORM D-P, [ # 14 ], [ # 15 ], [ # 19 ], [ # 20 ], [ # 22 ], [ # 23 ], [ # 24 ], on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, FILED.[2689607] [19-2704] [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:46 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, FILED. Service date 10/19/2019 by US mail.[2689599] [19-2704] [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:44 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Amanda Hill, FILED. Service date 10/19/2019 by US mail.[2689590] [19-2704] [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:43 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [21], on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2673847] [19-2704] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:33 AM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Amanda Hill, FILED. No service.[2673842] [19-2704] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:31 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [18], on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2670310] [19-2704] [Entered: 10/02/2019 01:43 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [17], on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2670304] [19-2704] [Entered: 10/02/2019 01:38 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, FILED. Service date 09/21/2019 by US mail.[2670303] [19-2704] [Entered: 10/02/2019 01:36 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Amanda Hill, FILED. Service date 09/21/2019 by US mail.[2670302] [19-2704] [Entered: 10/02/2019 01:35 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [13], on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, FILED.[2653971] [19-2704] [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:14 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, [12], on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, FILED.[2653966] [19-2704] [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:07 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Varuni Nelson, for Margaret Dean, TERMINATED.[2653962] [19-2704] [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:02 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, FILED. Service date 09/10/2019 by US mail.[2653965] [19-2704] [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:04 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Amanda Hill, FILED. Service date 09/10/2019 by US mail.[2653963] [19-2704] [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:03 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/06/2019 by US mail.[2649513] [19-2704] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:59 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2642711] [19-2704] [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:29 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2642708] [19-2704] [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:28 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2642706] [19-2704] [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:27 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM & ORDER, dated 08/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2642703] [19-2704] [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:27 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Amanda Hill, FILED. [2642700] [19-2704] [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Varuni Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Margaret Dean, AKA Margaret Hill
Represented By: Varuni Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Amanda Hill, as Administrator of the Estate of Walter Hill
Represented By: Amanda Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?