Powell v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: Does, 1-50, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, as Servicer for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Litton Loan Servicing LP
Plaintiff / Appellant: Gary Powell and Gail Powell
Case Number: 19-2735
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM D-P, [22], on behalf of Appellant Gail Powell and Gary Powell, copy to pro se litigants, FILED.[2687844] [19-2735] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:25 AM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Gary Powell, FILED. Service date 10/21/2019 by US mail.[2687349] [19-2735] [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:33 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Gail Powell, FILED. Service date 10/21/2019 by US mail.[2687341] [19-2735] [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:29 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 22 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Gail Powell and Gary Powell, FILED. No Service date 10/21/2019 by US mail.[2687496] [19-2735] [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:38 PM]
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, vacating dismissal order dated 10/09/2019, FILED.[2677666] [19-2735] [Entered: 10/10/2019 04:35 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Gail Powell and Gary Powell, district court receipt # CTXN00020179, FILED.[2676562] [19-2735] [Entered: 10/09/2019 03:42 PM]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, [ # 10 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Gail Powell and Gary Powell failure to pay fee, EFFECTIVE. [2676189] [19-2735] [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:45 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Gail Powell and Gary Powell Form D-P, [ # 4 ] from the docket, copy to pro se litigants, FILED.[2676084] [19-2735]--[Edited 10/09/2019 by RD] [Entered: 10/09/2019 10:23 AM]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 09/17/2019, dismissing appeal by 10/8/19, unless the appellants pay the filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis by that date, copy to pro se appellants, FILED.[2657016] [19-2735] [Entered: 09/17/2019 11:07 AM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Litton Loan Servicing LP and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, FILED. Service date 09/05/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2647459] [19-2735] [Entered: 09/05/2019 09:36 AM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [4], on behalf of Appellant Gail Powell and Gary Powell, copy to pro se, FILED.[2644583] [19-2735] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:35 AM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2644576] [19-2735] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:33 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Gail Powell and Gary Powell, FILED. No Service.[2644569] [19-2735] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:31 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2644564] [19-2735] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:30 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2644562] [19-2735] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:30 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Gail Powell and Gary Powell, FILED. [2644556] [19-2735] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does, 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, as Servicer for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Marissa Delinks Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Litton Loan Servicing LP
Represented By: Marissa Delinks Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary Powell
Represented By: Gary Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gail Powell
Represented By: Gail Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?