In Re: New York City Board of
Plaintiff: Mayling Ralph, Elsa Gulino, Peter Wilds and Nia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Defendant: New York State Education Department
Defendant / Appellant: Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
Plaintiff / Appellee: Eslin Leona Hughes
Case Number: 19-2801
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY, Dina Kolker for Eslin Leona Hughes, in case 19-2801, [ # 18 ], ADDED.[2665764] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:52 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Eslin Leona Hughes, FILED. Service date 09/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2665755] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:49 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2665704] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:29 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Francis Healy for Eslin Leona Hughes, in case 19-2801, [ # 13 ], ADDED.[2665053] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/26/2019 09:48 AM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Eslin Leona Hughes, FILED. Service date 09/25/2019 by CM/ECF. [2664806] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:58 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTE: See lead case 19-1162. Pursuant to order at entry [10], see 19-1162 for a complete set of docket entries.[2664080] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/25/2019 11:14 AM]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, directing appeals dated June 3, 2019, providing for case management and other relief, designating 19-1162 as the lead appeal for the limited purpose of filing documents, and directing appeals 19-1162, 19-1164, 19-1165, 19-1168, 19-1172, 19-1174, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1178, 19-1179, 19-1180, 19-1181, 19-1182, 19-1183, 19-1184, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189, 19-1190, 19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1205, 19-1209, 19-1214, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1231, 19-1235, 19-1236, 19-1238, 19-1240, 19-1243, 19-1246, 19-1268, 19-1269, 19-1270, 19-1275, 19-1316, 19-1317, 19-1318, 19-1319, 19-1324, 19-1325, 19-1326, 19-1327, 19-1328, 19-1329, 19-1332, 19-1334, 19-1336, 19-1339, 19-1341, 19-1489, 19-1494, 19-1495, 19-1497, 19-1498, 19-1501, 19-1502, 19-1503, 19-1504, 19-1505, 19-1506, 19-1507, 19-1508, 19-1509, 19-1512, 19-1513, 19-1515, 19-1516, 19-1517, 19-1518, 19-1522, 19-1532, 19-1533, 19-1536, 19-1539, 19-1541, 19-1543, 19-1547, 19-1548, 19-1593, 19-1899, 19-1912, 19-1914, 19-1915, 19-1916, 19-1918, 19-1922, 19-1924, 19-1925, 19-1926, 19-1927, 19-1928, 19-1929, 19-1930, 19-1932, 19-1934, 19-1935, 19-1936, 19-1937, 19-1938, 19-1939, 19-1940, 19-1941, 19-1945, 19-1946, 19-1947, 19-1948, 19-1949, 19-1950, 19-1951, 19-1952, 19-1953, 19-1956, 19-1959, 19-1960, 19-1962, 19-1963, 19-1964, 19-1965, 19-1966, 19-1968, 19-1969, 19-1970, 19-1971, 19-1972, 19-1973, 19-1974, 19-1975, 19-1976, 19-1977, 19-1978, 19-1979, 19-1980, 19-1981, 19-1983, 19-1985, 19-1986, 19-1987, 19-1991, 19-1992, 19-1993, 19-1994, 19-1995, 19-1997, 19-1998, 19-1999, 19-2000, 19-2001, 19-2002, 19-2004, 19-2005, 19-2006, 19-2007, 19-2010, 19-2013, 19-2014, 19-2015, 19-2016, 19-2017, 19-2018, 19-2020, 19-2021, 19-2022, 19-2027, 19-2028, 19-2031, 19-2033, 19-2034, 19-2035, 19-2037, 19-2038, 19-2039, 19-2054, 19-2055, 19-2061, 19-2063, 19-2066, 19-2067, 19-2068, 19-2072, 19-2273 to be heard in tandem with appeals listed in the order dated June 3, 2019 at docket entry 26 of 19-1162, to be heard in tandem, FILED.[2664074] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/25/2019 11:13 AM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, informing that the Appellant will rely on the Forms C and D filed in lead appeal 19-1162, RECEIVED. Service date 09/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2658307] [19-2801]--[Edited 09/18/2019 by ST] [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:28 AM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Eslin Leona Hughes, FILED. Service date 09/17/2019 by CM/ECF.[2657794] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/17/2019 04:49 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, district court receipt # 465401244058, FILED.[2663797] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/25/2019 08:56 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY, Aaron M. Bloom, [ # 5 ], in place of attorney Georgia M. Pestana, SUBSTITUTED.[2653197] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:55 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652915] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:26 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2647596] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:30 AM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, FILED. [2647583] [19-2801] [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: New York City Board of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayling Ralph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Gulino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Wilds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bloom Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eslin Leona Hughes
Represented By: Joshua S. Sohn
Represented By: Dina Kolker Esq.
Represented By: Francis Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Education Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?