Izzo Golf v. King Par Corporation
Defendant: XYZ Corporation 1-10, B & P Baird Holdings, Inc., KP Acquisition Company, John Doe 1-10, King Par Corporation, Pamela Baird and King Par, LLC
Defendant / Appellant: William J. Baird
Plaintiff / Appellee: Izzo Golf, FKA Dancorp Investors, Inc.
Case Number: 19-2935
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 43 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant William J. Baird Brief due date as 12/26/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 12/26/2019, FILED.[2692516] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:10 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 40 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, informing Court of proposed due date 12/26/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2692124] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/29/2019 03:43 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 38 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2691867] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:15 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 35 CAPTION, King Par, LLC added as Defendant designation, AMENDED.[2691129] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/28/2019 05:20 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 34 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 01/06/2020, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2688052] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:53 AM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Izzo Golf, FILED. Service date 10/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2682670] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/18/2019 09:00 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Steven P. Nonkes for Izzo Golf, in case 19-2935 , [ # 28 ], ADDED.[2682248] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:28 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Neal L. Slifkin, [ # 27 ], in place of attorney Steven Paul Nonkes, SUBSTITUTED.[2682245] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:26 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Izzo Golf, FILED. Service date 10/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2682220] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:13 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Izzo Golf, FILED. Service date 10/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2682216] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:10 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE, to Appellee Izzo Golf, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2674209] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/07/2019 02:37 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2674203] [19-2935] [Entered: 10/07/2019 02:34 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 24 INDEX/ROA NOTICE, to Appellant William J. Baird, past due material(s) to be submitted by 10/07/2019, SENT.[2666039] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 04:26 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 23 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM D, [ # 12 ], [ # 19 ], [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED.[2665508] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:46 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 13 ], [ # 18 ], [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED.[2665495] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:40 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 21 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED. Service date 09/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2665489] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:36 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED. Service date 09/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2665486] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:33 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM D, [16], on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED.[2665477] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:29 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [15], on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED.[2665454] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:23 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 11 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED.[2665438] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:19 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 CORRECTED FORM D, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED. Service date 09/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2665191] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 10:55 AM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 CORRECTED FORM C, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED. Service date 09/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2665187] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 10:53 AM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED. Service date 09/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2665181] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 10:51 AM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [10], on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED.[2665005] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 09:10 AM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM D, [9], on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED.[2664997] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 09:08 AM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [8], on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED.[2664991] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/26/2019 09:03 AM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED. Service date 09/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2664928] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/25/2019 08:23 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED. Service date 09/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2664899] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/25/2019 06:27 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED. Service date 09/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2664895] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/25/2019 06:20 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Steven P. Nonkes, Esq. for Appellee Izzo Golf, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2656591] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:34 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, district court receipt # 0209-3583986, FILED.[2656588] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:33 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2656586] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:32 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 08/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2656584] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:31 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant William J. Baird, FILED. [2656576] [19-2935] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Izzo Golf v. King Par Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & P Baird Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KP Acquisition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Par Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Par, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: William J. Baird
Represented By: Corey David Grandmaison Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Izzo Golf, FKA Dancorp Investors, Inc.
Represented By: Steven P. Nonkes Esq.
Represented By: Neal Slifkin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?