Vazquez v. Standford
Defendant / Appellee: Samuel D. Roberts, Commissioner (SSI), Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner, Social Security Administration, or other acting in their official capacity, David Stukowy, Commissioner of Human Resources and Tina Standford, Chairperson, New York State Division of Parole
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jose Vazquez
Case Number: 19-2945
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 29 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for transcripts to be supplied relief, for damages relief, for grand jury proceedings relief, for restored to social status relief, to extend time, for release from custody pending appeal relief, [27],[27],[27],[27],[27],[27],[27], on behalf of Appellant Jose Vazquez, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2688827] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/25/2019 06:55 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [25], on behalf of Appellant Jose Vazquez, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2688826] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/25/2019 06:51 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for transcripts to be supplied relief, for damages relief, for grand jury proceedings relief, for restored to social status relief, to extend time, for release from custody pending appeal relief, on behalf of Appellant Jose Vazquez, FILED. Service date 10/17/2019 by US mail.[2688825] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/25/2019 06:48 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Jose Vazquez, FILED. Service date 10/17/2019 by US mail. [2688644] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:42 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Jose Vazquez, FILED. Service date 10/17/2019 by US mail.[2687616] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/24/2019 07:29 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to extend time, for transcript to be supplied, [22],[22], on behalf of Appellant Jose Vazquez, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2676464] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:41 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION, to extend time, for transcript to be supplied, on behalf of Appellant Jose Vazquez, FILED. No Service.[2676461] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:40 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE, to Appellee Michael J. Astrue, Samuel D. Roberts, Tina Standford and David Stukowy , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2669881] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/02/2019 10:18 AM]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, dated 10/02/2019, dismissing appeal by 10/23/2019, unless Appellant Jose Vazquez, submits form Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2669836] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/02/2019 09:53 AM]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, dated 10/02/2019, dismissing appeal by 10/23/2019, unless Appellant Jose Vazquez, submits form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2669823] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/02/2019 09:46 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Barbara D. Underwood, for Tina Standford, Chairperson, TERMINATED.[2668840] [19-2945] [Entered: 10/01/2019 11:56 AM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER, [ # 15 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellee Tina Standford, FILED.[2667993] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/30/2019 02:42 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LETTER, [13], on behalf of Appellee Tina Standford, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2667980] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/30/2019 02:36 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Tina Standford, request to be removed as counsel RECEIVED. Service date 09/30/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2667856] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:28 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Tina Standford, request to be removed as counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 09/30/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2667846] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:24 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Michael J. Astrue, Samuel D. Roberts and David Stukowy, informing the Court that the defendants were never served and will not participate in the appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 09/20/2019 by US mail.[2660474] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/20/2019 11:41 AM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Karen Folster Lesperance for Samuel D. Roberts Michael J. Astrue David Stukowy, in case 19-2945 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2660448] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/20/2019 11:28 AM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Michael J. Astrue, Samuel D. Roberts and David Stukowy, FILED. Service date 09/20/2019 by US mail. [2660377] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/20/2019 11:03 AM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2657316] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:16 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2657312] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:14 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/31/2019, RECEIVED.[2657300] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:10 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 07/31/2019, RECEIVED.[2657294] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:08 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jose Vazquez, FILED. [2657279] [19-2945] [Entered: 09/17/2019 12:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vazquez v. Standford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Samuel D. Roberts, Commissioner (SSI)
Represented By: Steven David Clymer
Represented By: Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner, Social Security Administration, or other acting in their official capacity
Represented By: Steven David Clymer
Represented By: Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Stukowy, Commissioner of Human Resources
Represented By: Steven David Clymer
Represented By: Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tina Standford, Chairperson, New York State Division of Parole
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jose Vazquez
Represented By: Jose Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?