Reid v. City of New York
Defendant / Appellee: Michael Jaccarino, Defense Attorney after CPL 170.20, Cheyenne Snavely, M.D. at Bellevue Hospital Emergency Room, Officer Phoenix, New York City Police Department Transporting Officer from Trasit District 4 Police Station, Judge Abena Darkeh, Arraignment on Docket Number 2017NY050276 in APAR 1, Jonathan Pine, General Litigations Division employed at the Law Department, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., District Attorney for the County of New York, Sergeant Frazier, New York Police Department Arresting Officers from Transit District 4 Police Station, Martin Bowe, Assistant Corporation Counsel employed at the Law Department, Officer Ghegan, New York Police Department Transporting Officer from Transit District 4 Police Station, Eleanor Ostrow, the Attorney for Cyrus R. Vance Jr in 18 cv 4066 AMD, Deputy Clerk Margaret Sowah, Clerk at Appellate Division, First Department, Jane Doe, New York Police Department Arresting Officers from Transit District 4 Police Station, Kendra Thimbrel, Stenographer in Tap A on, Clerk of Court Part Tap A, David Simon, New York Police Department Arresting Officers from Transit District 4 Police Station, A. Ortiz, Clerk at Appellate Division, First Department, Assistant District Attorney Nicholas Barnes, prosecuted the second Arrest Charges with Ann Scherzer, Judge Herbert Moses, Parc C Prosecution on Docket Number 2017NY050276, District Judge Ann M. Donnelly, (18-cv-4066 AMD), Yosha Gunasekera, Defense Attorney before CPL 170.20, Judge Laura A. Ward, Second Arrest Prosecution on #4445-2017 in Part 71, Sherill Spatz, Inspector General for the Unified Court System (UCS), John Doe, New York Police Department Arresting Officers from Transit District 4 Police Station, Trial Judge Ann Scherzer, Adam Silverstien, Second Defense Attorney after CPL 170.20, Joseph Habboushe, M.D. at Bellevue Hospital Emergency Room, Clerk of Court Susanna Molina Rojas, Clerk at Appellate Division, First Department, Assistant District Attorney John Doe, he got assigned on to prosecute the first Arrest Prosecution, City of New York, Assistant District Attorney John Doe, Second ADA for #4445-2017, Jonathan Pines, General Litigations Division employed at the Law Department and Officer Phoenix, New York City Police Department Transporting Officer from Transit District 4 Police Station
Plaintiff / Appellant: Cory Reid
Case Number: 19-3126
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ann M. Donnelly, FILED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2693555] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:53 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Ann M. Donnelly, informing the Court that the defendant-appellee does not intend to participate in the appeal unless requested to do so by the Court, RECEIVED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2693554] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:52 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Nicholas Barnes, Eleanor Ostrow and Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., John Doe, John Doe, informing the Court that the District Attorney defendants do not intend to participate in the appeal unless requested to do so by this Court, RECEIVED. Service date 10/28/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2690244] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/28/2019 09:56 AM]
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, dated 10/25/2019, dismissing appeal by 11/15/2019, unless Appellant Cory Reid, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2689055] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/25/2019 10:08 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Cory Reid, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 4 ] from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2688857] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/25/2019 08:43 AM]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, dated 10/23/2019, dismissing appeal by 11/13/2019, unless Appellant Cory Reid, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant and appellees, FILED.[2687556] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/23/2019 05:27 PM]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, dated 10/23/2019, dismissing appeal by 11/13/2019, unless Appellant Cory Reid, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant and appellees, FILED.[2687554] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/23/2019 05:22 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE, to Appellee Nicholas Barnes, Clerk of Court Part Tap A, Abena Darkeh, Ann M. Donnelly, Frazier, Yosha Gunasekera, Joseph Habboushe, Michael Jaccarino, Susanna Molina Rojas, Herbert Moses, A. Ortiz, Eleanor Ostrow, Ann Scherzer, Adam Silverstien, David Simon, Cheyenne Snavely, Margaret Sowah, Sherill Spatz, Kendra Thimbrel, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr. and Laura A. Ward, for failure to file an appearance, copy to pro se appellant and appellees, SENT.[2687548] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/23/2019 05:18 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Georgia M. Pestana, for Appellees Martin Bowe, City of New York, Jane Doe, John Doe, Ghegan, Phoenix, Jonathan Pines and David Simon, TERMINATED.[2679260] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/15/2019 11:18 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 CAPTION, corrected spelling for Jonathan Pine to Jonathan Pines, per letter filed on 10/11/2019, copy to pro se appellant, AMENDED.[2679250] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/15/2019 11:16 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER, dated 10/11/2019, on behalf of Appellee Martin Bowe, City of New York, Jane Doe, John Doe, Ghegan, Phoenix, Jonathan Pines and David Simon, requesting that it no longer be identified as counsel for Defendant-Appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 10/11/2019 by US mail.[2679239] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/15/2019 11:13 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 4 ], on behalf of Appellant Cory Reid, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2669173] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/01/2019 03:04 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2669167] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/01/2019 03:02 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2669159] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/01/2019 03:00 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Cory Reid, FILED. No service date.[2669150] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:55 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2669142] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:51 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/05/2019, RECEIVED.[2669141] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:50 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Cory Reid, FILED. [2669121] [19-3126] [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Reid v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Jaccarino, Defense Attorney after CPL 170.20
Represented By: Michael Jaccarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cheyenne Snavely, M.D. at Bellevue Hospital Emergency Room
Represented By: Cheyenne Snavely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Officer Phoenix, New York City Police Department Transporting Officer from Trasit District 4 Police Station
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Judge Abena Darkeh, Arraignment on Docket Number 2017NY050276 in APAR 1
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jonathan Pine, General Litigations Division employed at the Law Department
Represented By: Jonathan Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., District Attorney for the County of New York
Represented By: Patricia J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Frazier, New York Police Department Arresting Officers from Transit District 4 Police Station
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Martin Bowe, Assistant Corporation Counsel employed at the Law Department
Represented By: Martin Bowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Officer Ghegan, New York Police Department Transporting Officer from Transit District 4 Police Station
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eleanor Ostrow, the Attorney for Cyrus R. Vance Jr in 18 cv 4066 AMD
Represented By: Patricia J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Clerk Margaret Sowah, Clerk at Appellate Division, First Department
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe, New York Police Department Arresting Officers from Transit District 4 Police Station
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kendra Thimbrel, Stenographer in Tap A on
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Clerk of Court Part Tap A
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Simon, New York Police Department Arresting Officers from Transit District 4 Police Station
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. Ortiz, Clerk at Appellate Division, First Department
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Assistant District Attorney Nicholas Barnes, prosecuted the second Arrest Charges with Ann Scherzer
Represented By: Patricia J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Judge Herbert Moses, Parc C Prosecution on Docket Number 2017NY050276
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District Judge Ann M. Donnelly, (18-cv-4066 AMD)
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Yosha Gunasekera, Defense Attorney before CPL 170.20
Represented By: Yosha Gunasekera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Judge Laura A. Ward, Second Arrest Prosecution on #4445-2017 in Part 71
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sherill Spatz, Inspector General for the Unified Court System (UCS)
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, New York Police Department Arresting Officers from Transit District 4 Police Station
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Trial Judge Ann Scherzer
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Adam Silverstien, Second Defense Attorney after CPL 170.20
Represented By: Adam Silverstien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph Habboushe, M.D. at Bellevue Hospital Emergency Room
Represented By: Joseph Habboushe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Clerk of Court Susanna Molina Rojas, Clerk at Appellate Division, First Department
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Assistant District Attorney John Doe, he got assigned on to prosecute the first Arrest Prosecution
Represented By: Patricia J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Assistant District Attorney John Doe, Second ADA for #4445-2017
Represented By: Patricia J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jonathan Pines, General Litigations Division employed at the Law Department
Represented By: Jonathan Pines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Officer Phoenix, New York City Police Department Transporting Officer from Transit District 4 Police Station
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cory Reid
Represented By: Cory Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?