Komatsu v. The City of New York
Defendant: New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities, New York City Police Department and John Doe 1
Defendant / Appellee: Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer, Pinny Ringel, Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508), Deputy Inspector Redmond Howard, New York City Police Department (NYPD), Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141, NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves, NYPD Officer Yu Lie, NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326, NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577, Harold Miller, Rachel Atcheson, City of New York, Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478) and Deputy Inspector Howard Redmond, New York City Police Department (NYPD)
Plaintiff / Appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Case Number: 19-3188
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Jonathan A. Popolow, [ # 20 ], in place of attorney Georgia M. Pestana, SUBSTITUTED.[2704258] [19-3188] [Entered: 11/12/2019 05:12 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and Pinny Ringel, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2702869] [19-3188] [Entered: 11/08/2019 06:08 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and Pinny Ringel in 19-3100, 19-3169, 19-3188, Appellee Rafael Beato, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and -- Rachel Atcheson, Andrew Berkowitz, Harold Miller and Pinny Ringel in 19-3654, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2702866] [19-3100, 19-3169, 19-3188, 19-3654] [Entered: 11/08/2019 05:58 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE, to Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Redmond Howard, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves and Pinny Ringel, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2687552] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/23/2019 05:22 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [15], on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2685132] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:08 AM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2685120] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:01 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 10/14/2019 by email.[2685009] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/21/2019 05:32 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 10/14/2019 by US mail.[2685006] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/21/2019 05:31 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 11 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2673970] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:26 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Matthew Brunner, Ramon Dominguez and Anthony Manzi in 19-3188, 19-3100, 19-3169, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2673876] [19-3188, 19-3100, 19-3169] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:45 AM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2672929] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:48 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTE: See lead case, 19-3100, containing complete set of docket entries.[2672921] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:46 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Matthew Brunner, Ramon Dominguez and Anthony Manzi in 19-3169, 19-3100, 19-3188, FILED. Service date 10/04/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2672810] [19-3169, 19-3100, 19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:43 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2672900] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:37 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/02/2019, RECEIVED.[2672898] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:36 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 19-3188, FILED. [2672888] [19-3188, 19-3100] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komatsu v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pinny Ringel
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508)
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Inspector Redmond Howard, New York City Police Department (NYPD)
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Yu Lie
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Harold Miller
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rachel Atcheson
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478)
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Inspector Howard Redmond, New York City Police Department (NYPD)
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Represented By: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?