Yancey v. The County of Albany
Defendant: County of Albany, Daniel F. Lynch, County Attorney, Corizon, Inc., Albany County Sheriff, Warden, Albany County Correctional Facility and Correctional Medical Services, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Michael C. Yancey
Defendant / Appellee: Douglas Robertson, Corrections Officer, Albany County Correctional Facility, FKA John Doe
Case Number: 19-320
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, dated 03/26/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/16/2019, unless Appellant Michael C. Yancey,submits a Signed Prisoner Authorization form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2526128] [19-320] [Entered: 03/26/2019 02:41 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, [16], on behalf of Appellee Douglas Robertson, FILED.[2519674] [19-320] [Entered: 03/18/2019 10:55 AM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for , on behalf of Appellee Douglas Robertson, FILED. Service date 03/18/2019 by US mail.[2519498] [19-320] [Entered: 03/18/2019 09:22 AM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [14], on behalf of Appellee Douglas Robertson, FILED.[2519209] [19-320] [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:44 PM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Douglas Robertson, FILED. Service date 03/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2518746] [19-320] [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:59 AM]
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE, to Appellee Douglas Robertson , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2502876] [19-320] [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:59 AM]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 02/22/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/15/2019,unless Appellant Michael C. Yancey,submits form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2502870] [19-320] [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:56 AM]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 02/22/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/15/2019,unless Appellant Michael C. Yancey,submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2502844] [19-320] [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:45 AM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERS, notice of new complaint, on behalf of Appellant Michael C. Yancey, RECEIVED.[2501966] [19-320] [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:40 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER, dated 02/12/2019, on behalf of Appellant Michael C. Yancey, explaining to the Court that he cannot pay filing fee, RECEIVED.[2501833] [19-320] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:49 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2491766] [19-320] [Entered: 02/07/2019 01:15 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2490687] [19-320] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:39 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2490680] [19-320] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:36 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Michael L. Goldstein, Esq. for Appellee Douglas Robertson, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2490678] [19-320] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:35 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/24/2019, RECEIVED.[2490676] [19-320] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:34 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/24/2019, RECEIVED.[2490675] [19-320] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:34 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael C. Yancey, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2490670] [19-320] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Yancey v. The County of Albany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Albany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel F. Lynch, County Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Albany County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael C. Yancey
Represented By: Michael C. Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Douglas Robertson, Corrections Officer, Albany County Correctional Facility, FKA John Doe
Represented By: Michael L. Goldstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?