Oriska Insurance Company v. Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation
Defendant: US Management, Inc. and Rashbi Management, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: Shorefront Operating, LLC, DBA Seagate Rehabilitation & Healthcare Center, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, DBA Park Avenue Extended Care Facility, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Sentosacare, LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, DBA The Hamptons Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing, Samuel Schlesinger, Individually and as Principal Partner and as Officer, Director and Owner of Allstate ASO, Inc. and Allstate Administrators, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, DBA Nassau Extended Care Facility, DBA Nassau Rehabilitation and Nursing, DBA Center/Kingsbridge Heights Receiver, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, DBA Throgs Neck Extended Care Facility, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Isaac Muller, Individually and as an Agent for the Defendants herein named, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC, DBA Spring Creek Rehabilitation & Nursing Care Center, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, DBA Pathways Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Garden Care Center, Inc., Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, DBA Townhouse Center for Rehabilitation & Nursing, Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., DBA Five Towns Premier Rehabilitation and Nursing, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, DBA Grace Plaza Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Bayview Manor LLC, DBA South Point Plaza Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Allstate Administrators, LLC, AKA Allstate ASO, LLC, Bent Philipson, as the Principal Partner in Control of Sentosacare, LLC a/k/a Sentosa Group, Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC and Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, DBA Brookside Multicare Nursing Center, DBA Optima Care Smithtown, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: Oriska Insurance Company
Case Number: 19-3206
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 39 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 32 ], [ # 38 ], on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED.[2703112] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/12/2019 08:57 AM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 38 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2702876] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 07:03 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 36 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2702700] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:22 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 35 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2702698] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:21 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Michael Walter Freudenberg for Isaac Muller, in case 19-3206, [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2701956] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:47 AM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Isaac Muller, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2701935] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:37 AM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 32 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [31], on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED.[2701802] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/08/2019 08:19 AM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 11/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2701742] [19-3206] [Entered: 11/07/2019 05:35 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Nicholas John Faso for Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center Pinegrove Manor II, LLC Shorefront Operating, LLC Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC Little Neck Care Center, LLC Niskayuna Operating Co LLC Samuel Schlesinger Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC Sentosacare, LLC Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc. Townhouse Operating Company, LLC Bent Philipson Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC Garden Care Center, Inc. Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC Allstate Administrators, LLC Nassau Operating Company, LLC Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc. Bayview Manor LLC North Sea Associates, LLC, in case 19-3206, [ # 27 ], ADDED.[2690576] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:08 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [13], [ # 24 ], [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED.[2690572] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:06 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Ira S. Lipsius for Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center Pinegrove Manor II, LLC Shorefront Operating, LLC Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC Little Neck Care Center, LLC Niskayuna Operating Co LLC Samuel Schlesinger Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC Sentosacare, LLC Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc. Townhouse Operating Company, LLC Bent Philipson Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC Garden Care Center, Inc. Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC Allstate Administrators, LLC Nassau Operating Company, LLC Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc. Bayview Manor LLC North Sea Associates, LLC, in case 19-3206, [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2690567] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:04 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/28/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2690505] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/28/2019 12:19 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/28/2019 by CM/ECF. [2690440] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:37 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Timothy Chorba for Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center Pinegrove Manor II, LLC Shorefront Operating, LLC Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC Little Neck Care Center, LLC Niskayuna Operating Co LLC Samuel Schlesinger Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC Sentosacare, LLC Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc. Townhouse Operating Company, LLC Bent Philipson Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC Garden Care Center, Inc. Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC Allstate Administrators, LLC Nassau Operating Company, LLC Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc. Bayview Manor LLC North Sea Associates, LLC, in case 19-3206, [ # 22 ], ADDED.[2689015] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/25/2019 09:51 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearnace for Additional Counsel, [21], on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED.[2688999] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/25/2019 09:47 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 15 ], [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED.[2688974] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/25/2019 09:37 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/24/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2688356] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/24/2019 03:07 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/24/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2688349] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/24/2019 03:03 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/24/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2688341] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/24/2019 02:59 PM]
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, dated 10/24/2019, dismissing appeal by 11/07/2019, unless Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, submits Form D, FILED.[2687975] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:18 AM]
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, dated 10/24/2019, dismissing appeal by 11/07/2019, unless Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, submits Form C, FILED.[2687969] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:14 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [14], on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED.[2687955] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:08 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [13], on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED.[2687934] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:58 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [12], on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED.[2687927] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:54 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/23/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2687489] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:35 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/23/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2687479] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:32 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/23/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2687465] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:23 PM]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 10/22/2019, dismissing appeal by 11/12/2019, unless Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2686351] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/22/2019 05:57 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE, to Appellees Allstate Administrators, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC, Bayview Manor LLC, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC, Nassau Operating Company, LLC, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, North Sea Associates, LLC, Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bent Philipson, Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, Samuel Schlesinger, Sentosacare, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC and Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2686339] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/22/2019 05:42 PM]
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Isaac Muller, FILED. Service date 10/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2678957] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/14/2019 04:15 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Daniel L. Hitzke for Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2673913] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:00 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2673909] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:58 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, district court receipt # ANYNDC-4888592, FILED.[2673907] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:57 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2673905] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:57 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2673903] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:56 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Oriska Insurance Company, FILED. [2673897] [19-3206] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Oriska Insurance Company v. Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shorefront Operating, LLC, DBA Seagate Rehabilitation & Healthcare Center
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Park Avenue Operating Company, LLC, DBA Park Avenue Extended Care Facility
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Little Neck Nursing Home, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sentosacare, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: North Sea Associates, LLC, DBA The Hamptons Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Samuel Schlesinger, Individually and as Principal Partner and as Officer, Director and Owner of Allstate ASO, Inc. and Allstate Administrators, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nassau Operating Company, LLC, DBA Nassau Extended Care Facility, DBA Nassau Rehabilitation and Nursing, DBA Center/Kingsbridge Heights Receiver, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Throgs Neck Operating Company, LLC, DBA Throgs Neck Extended Care Facility
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care Center
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Isaac Muller, Individually and as an Agent for the Defendants herein named
Represented By: Kevin James Harrington
Represented By: Michael Walter Freudenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Willoughby Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC, DBA Spring Creek Rehabilitation & Nursing Care Center
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Little Neck Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Niskayuna Operating Co LLC, DBA Pathways Nursing & Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Garden Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Townhouse Operating Company, LLC, DBA Townhouse Center for Rehabilitation & Nursing
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., DBA Five Towns Premier Rehabilitation and Nursing
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pinegrove Manor II, LLC, DBA Grace Plaza Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bayview Manor LLC, DBA South Point Plaza Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Allstate Administrators, LLC, AKA Allstate ASO, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bent Philipson, as the Principal Partner in Control of Sentosacare, LLC a/k/a Sentosa Group
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, DBA Brookside Multicare Nursing Center, DBA Optima Care Smithtown, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Edward Buckey Esq.
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas John Faso Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Oriska Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Hitzke
Represented By: Daniel L. Hitzke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashbi Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?