Syken v. State of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Arthur Syken
Defendant / Appellee: New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, AKA New York State Homes and Community Renewal, State of New York and RuthAnne Visnauskas, Executive Deputy Commissioner of New York State Homes and Community Renewal
Case Number: 19-3392
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 84 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2958924] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/23/2020 11:16 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 80 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming the judgment of the district court, by DJ, GEL, MHP, FILED.[2943780] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/02/2020 09:30 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 79 NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[2943770] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/02/2020 09:25 AM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 78 CASE, before DJ, GEL, MHP, HEARD.[2933136] [19-3392] [Entered: 09/17/2020 12:23 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, State of New York and RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 09/10/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2927506] [19-3392] [Entered: 09/10/2020 10:49 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 09/02/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2921902] [19-3392] [Entered: 09/02/2020 09:36 AM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 75 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2907003] [19-3392] [Entered: 08/13/2020 11:08 AM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 72 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 09/17/2020, SET.[2877485] [19-3392] [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:45 AM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 70 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 09/14/2020, PROPOSED.[2863186] [19-3392] [Entered: 06/16/2020 12:08 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 67 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to file document [ # 65 ], on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED.[2855109] [19-3392] [Entered: 06/04/2020 04:31 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 66 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2854292] [19-3392] [Entered: 06/04/2020 09:51 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 65 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, regarding the re-filing of Appellant's Reply Brief, RECEIVED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2854266] [19-3392]--[Edited 06/04/2020 by EMC] [Entered: 06/04/2020 09:32 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 64 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to file document, [63], on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED.[2854236] [19-3392] [Entered: 06/04/2020 09:21 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2854181] [19-3392] [Entered: 06/04/2020 09:01 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 61 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Arthur Syken's Reply Brief [48] from the docket, FILED.[2854153] [19-3392] [Entered: 06/04/2020 08:41 AM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 55 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, CORRECTED BRIEF, [53], on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED.[2850601] [19-3392] [Entered: 05/29/2020 02:05 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 53 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 05/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2850524] [19-3392] [Entered: 05/29/2020 01:09 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 50 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Eric Ross Haren, Esq. for Appellee New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, State of New York and RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 05/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2850413] [19-3392] [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:03 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 49 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, [48], on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED.[2850396] [19-3392] [Entered: 05/29/2020 11:57 AM]
May 28, 2020 Filing 48 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 05/28/2020 by CM/ECF. [2848927] [19-3392] [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:04 AM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 47 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. John Andrew Scola, Jr., Esq. for Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 05/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2843059] [19-3392] [Entered: 05/19/2020 03:31 PM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 44 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, State of New York and RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 05/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2840669] [19-3392] [Entered: 05/15/2020 06:38 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, Eric Haren, [ # 42 ], in place of attorney David Lawrence III, SUBSTITUTED.[2839244] [19-3392] [Entered: 05/14/2020 10:35 AM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, State of New York and RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 05/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2839169] [19-3392] [Entered: 05/14/2020 09:48 AM]
January 24, 2020 Filing 35 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, State of New York and RuthAnne Visnauskas Brief due date as 04/24/2020, FILED.[2760887] [19-3392] [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:56 PM]
January 24, 2020 Filing 32 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, State of New York and RuthAnne Visnauskas, informing Court of proposed due date 04/24/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2760714] [19-3392] [Entered: 01/24/2020 01:09 PM]
January 24, 2020 Filing 31 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 01/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2760515] [19-3392] [Entered: 01/24/2020 11:45 AM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, State of New York and RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 01/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2759841] [19-3392] [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:36 PM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 29 APPENDIX, volume 3 of 3, (pp. 600-789), on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 01/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2758705] [19-3392] [Entered: 01/22/2020 08:36 PM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 28 APPENDIX, volume 2 of 3, (pp. 300-599), on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 01/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2758704] [19-3392] [Entered: 01/22/2020 08:35 PM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 27 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 3, (pp. 1-299), on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 01/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2758703] [19-3392] [Entered: 01/22/2020 08:34 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 23 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2738289] [19-3392] [Entered: 12/26/2019 01:41 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State of New York, New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal and RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 12/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2738244] [19-3392] [Entered: 12/26/2019 01:08 PM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 22 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 01/08/2020, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2710486] [19-3392] [Entered: 11/19/2019 04:00 PM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE, to Appellee New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, State of New York and RuthAnne Visnauskas, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2697540] [19-3392] [Entered: 11/04/2019 02:54 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Arthur Syken Brief due date as 01/27/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 01/27/2020, FILED.[2693374] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/30/2019 02:28 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2692584] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:30 AM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 01/08/2020, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2690770] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/28/2019 02:51 PM]
October 27, 2019 Filing 8 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, informing Court of proposed due date 01/27/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2690100] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/27/2019 04:36 PM]
October 27, 2019 Filing 7 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 10/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2690099] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/27/2019 04:29 PM]
October 27, 2019 Filing 6 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 10/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2690098] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/27/2019 04:28 PM]
October 27, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. Service date 10/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2690097] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/27/2019 04:27 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2683571] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/18/2019 03:51 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/24/2019, RECEIVED.[2683567] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/18/2019 03:51 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, district court receipt # CNYEDC-11955976, FILED.[2683565] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/18/2019 03:50 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Arthur Syken, FILED. [2683562] [19-3392] [Entered: 10/18/2019 03:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Syken v. State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Arthur Syken
Represented By: John Andrew Scola Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, AKA New York State Homes and Community Renewal
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Eric Ross Haren Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Eric Ross Haren Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RuthAnne Visnauskas, Executive Deputy Commissioner of New York State Homes and Community Renewal
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Eric Ross Haren Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?