Uzamere v. The State of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Cheryl D. Uzamere, individually and as the Sole Proprietor of Uzamere Word Processing and more
Defendant / Appellee: Susan Kaufman, Esq., Matrimonial practice advisory and rules committee for the New York State Unified Court System Office of Court Administration, Honorable Sondra Miller, Honorary Chair, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee for the New York State Unified Court System, Honorable Jeffrey Sunshien, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee, Statewide Coordinating Judge for Matrimonial cases for the New York State Unifeid Court System, Honorable Betty Weinberg Ellerin, Honorary Chair, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee for the New York State Unified Court System, The Honorable Letitia James, Attorney General for the State of New York, The Honorable Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York, The New York State Unified Court System of the State of New York, Honorable Janet DiFiore, As Chief Judge of the New York State Unified Court System, Honorable Lawrence S. Knipel, Administrative Judge, Kings County Supreme Court, New York State Unified Court System, State of New York and Honorable Lawrence K. Marks, Chief Administrative Judge for the New York State Unified Court System
Case Number: 19-3402
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 10/24/2019, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2688583] [19-3402] [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:24 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appeal [ # 7 ] filed by Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere; denying as moot requests for other relief [ # 7 ] [ # 7 ] [ # 7 ] filed by Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, copy to pro se, FILED. [2688578][14] [19-3402] [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:23 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[2688566] [19-3402] [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:19 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 10/22/2019 by US mail.[2687284] [19-3402] [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:10 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION, to withdraw appeal, to dismiss the motion as fraudulent, to render the real notice of appeal as moot, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 10/22/2019 by US mail.[2687280] [19-3402] [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:09 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2684968] [19-3402] [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:54 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2684959] [19-3402] [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:50 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2684957] [19-3402] [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:49 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. [2684950] [19-3402] [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uzamere v. The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cheryl D. Uzamere, individually and as the Sole Proprietor of Uzamere Word Processing and more
Represented By: Cheryl D. Uzamere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Kaufman, Esq., Matrimonial practice advisory and rules committee for the New York State Unified Court System Office of Court Administration
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Sondra Miller, Honorary Chair, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee for the New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Jeffrey Sunshien, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee, Statewide Coordinating Judge for Matrimonial cases for the New York State Unifeid Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Betty Weinberg Ellerin, Honorary Chair, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee for the New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Honorable Letitia James, Attorney General for the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Honorable Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The New York State Unified Court System of the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Janet DiFiore, As Chief Judge of the New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Lawrence S. Knipel, Administrative Judge, Kings County Supreme Court, New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Lawrence K. Marks, Chief Administrative Judge for the New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?