Komatsu v. The City of New York
Defendant: Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141, New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities, Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478), Pinny Ringel, Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508), Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer, John Doe 1, Rachel Atcheson, New York City Police Department and Harold Miller
Defendant / Appellee: Deputy Inspector Howard Redmond, New York City Police Department (NYPD), NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577, NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves, NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326, City of New York and NYPD Officer Yu Lie
Plaintiff / Appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Case Number: 19-3654
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 12/13/2019 by email.[2729554] [19-3654] [Entered: 12/13/2019 05:36 PM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 12/13/2019 by email.[2729553] [19-3654] [Entered: 12/13/2019 05:35 PM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/02/2020, unless Appellant Towaki Komatsu, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2725005] [19-3654] [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:00 AM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/02/2019, unless Appellant Towaki Komatsu, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2724983] [19-3654] [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:51 AM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Jonathan A. Popolow, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Georgia M. Pestana, SUBSTITUTED.[2704261] [19-3654] [Entered: 11/12/2019 05:15 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Rachel Atcheson, Andrew Berkowitz, Harold Miller, Pinny Ringel and Appellee Rafael Beato, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Ralph Nieves and Howard Redmond, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2702874] [19-3654] [Entered: 11/08/2019 06:30 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and Pinny Ringel in 19-3100, 19-3169, 19-3188, Appellee Rafael Beato, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and -- Rachel Atcheson, Andrew Berkowitz, Harold Miller and Pinny Ringel in 19-3654, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2702866] [19-3100, 19-3169, 19-3188, 19-3654] [Entered: 11/08/2019 05:58 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2699280] [19-3654] [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:55 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTE: See lead case, 19-3100, containing complete set of docket entries.[2699277] [19-3654] [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:54 PM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2699261] [19-3654] [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:47 PM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/29/2019, RECEIVED.[2699260] [19-3654] [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:46 PM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. [2699243] [19-3654] [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komatsu v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinny Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Atcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Inspector Howard Redmond, New York City Police Department (NYPD)
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Yu Lie
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Represented By: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?