Natural Resources Defense Coun v. Department of Energy
Petitioner: U.S. Public Interest Research Group, Consumer Federation of America, Environment America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club
Respondent: United States Department of Energy
Case Number: 19-3658
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent United States Department of Energy, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF. [2700359] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:13 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, SERVED. [2699063] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:34 PM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Petitioner Consumer Federation of America, Environment America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, USCA receipt # A02-76600-74, FILED.[2699053] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:31 PM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 AGENCY DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/05/2019, RECEIVED.[2699050] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:29 PM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, on behalf of Petitioner Consumer Federation of America, Environment America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED. [2699036] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Coun v. Department of Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.S. Public Interest Research Group
Represented By: Michael Landis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Consumer Federation of America
Represented By: Timothy D. Ballo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Environment America
Represented By: Michael Landis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants
Represented By: Timothy D. Ballo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Melissa Joy Lynch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Club
Represented By: Timothy D. Ballo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Energy
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?