Agee v. Cuomo
Defendant: Mr. Timothy Quinn, LT.; Auburn Correctional Facility, Joseph Bellnier, Deputy Commissioner of "DOCCS" Correctional Facilities, Mr. John Doe #9, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility, County of Cayuga, Mr. Andrew Cuomo, Governor; State of New York, Harold D. Graham, Superintendent; Auburn Correctional Facility, Sherri Guzylak, Inmate Record Coordinator II; Auburn Correctional Facility, Jeremiah Brooks, Auburn C.F. Captain, Jane and John Doe #13, Department of Corrections and Community Supervision Employee, Joseph Vasile, Lieutenant; Auburn Correctional Facility, Cayuga County Jail, John and Jane Does #11, Department of Corrections and Community Supervision Techinical Security Specialist, Mr. Nathaniel Sweet, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility, E. Fagan, Auburn C.F. Deputy Superintendent of Security, Mr. Kevin Ashby, Correctionl Officeri; Auburn Correctional Facility, John Doe #14, Auburn C.F. Hearing Officer, Mr. John Doe #8, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility, Ray Vanfleet, LT.; Auburn Correctional Facility, Mr. Anthony J. Annucci, Acting Commissioner; New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, John and Jane Doe 2, Evidence Control Supervisor; Auburn Corrrectional Facility, Mr. John Does #10, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility, Mr. John Doe #6, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility, Mr. Stephen Maher, Chief Investigator of the Office of Special Investigation, John and Jane Does 4, Assigned by OSI capacity of an OSI investigator, Mr. Thomas A. McCarthy, Correctional Officer, Auburn Correctional Facility, John Doe #12, Department of Corrections and Community Supervision Employee, John and Jane Doe 1, Deputy Superintendent of Security; Auburn Correctional Facility, Mr. Michael Quimette, LT.; Acting Captain; Auburn Correctional Facility, Mr. John Doe #7, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility and John and Jane Doe 3, Criminal Prosecutor Liason
Defendant / Appellee: Troy Mitchell, FKA John Doe #5, Mrs. Wade, FKA Jane Doe #14 and Mr. Keith E. Vincent, II, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jkendric Jirelle Agee
Case Number: 19-4160
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 29 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[2772515] [19-4160] [Entered: 02/07/2020 09:54 AM]
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER, [ # 12 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Jkendric Jirelle Agee failure to pay fee, EFFECTIVE.[2772512] [19-4160] [Entered: 02/07/2020 09:53 AM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Frank W. Miller, [ # 23 ], in place of attorney Laura Etlinger, SUBSTITUTED.[2772317] [20-280] [Entered: 02/06/2020 05:23 PM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Wade in 20-280, 19-4160, FILED. Service date 02/06/2020 by US mail. [2772160] [20-280, 19-4160] [Entered: 02/06/2020 03:58 PM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Wade in 20-280, 19-4160, FILED. Service date 02/06/2020 by US mail. [2772154] [20-280, 19-4160] [Entered: 02/06/2020 03:56 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, Laura Etlinger, [ # 21 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2759794] [20-280] [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:25 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Troy Mitchell and Keith E. Vincent, II in 20-280, 19-4160, FILED. Service date 01/23/2020 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [2759633] [20-280, 19-4160] [Entered: 01/23/2020 03:39 PM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTE: See lead case, 19-4160, containing complete set of docket entries.[2758684] [20-280] [Entered: 01/22/2020 06:09 PM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 19 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2758681] [20-280] [Entered: 01/22/2020 06:04 PM]
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2758678] [20-280] [Entered: 01/22/2020 06:00 PM]
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jkendric Jirelle Agee in 20-280, FILED. [2758667] [20-280, 19-4160] [Entered: 01/22/2020 05:51 PM]
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Charles C. Spagnoli for Wade, in case 19-4160, [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2750651] [19-4160] [Entered: 01/13/2020 01:46 PM]
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Wade, FILED. Service date 01/13/2020 by US mail. [2750248] [19-4160] [Entered: 01/13/2020 10:15 AM]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, dated 01/10/2020, dismissing appeal by 01/31/2020, unless Appellant Jkendric Jirelle Agee, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2749438] [19-4160] [Entered: 01/10/2020 02:18 PM]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, dated 01/10/2020, dismissing appeal by 01/31/2020, unless Appellant Jkendric Jirelle Agee, submits fee or moves to proceed in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2749433] [19-4160] [Entered: 01/10/2020 02:14 PM]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 01/10/2020, dismissing appeal by 01/31/2020, unless Appellant Jkendric Jirelle Agee, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2749427] [19-4160] [Entered: 01/10/2020 02:09 PM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for , on behalf of Appellee Wade, FILED. Service date 12/27/2019 by US mail.[2739063] [19-4160] [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:20 AM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Wade, FILED. Service date 12/27/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2739057] [19-4160] [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:19 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Troy Mitchell and Keith E. Vincent, II, FILED. Service date 12/26/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2738163] [19-4160] [Entered: 12/26/2019 11:47 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY, Laura Etlinger, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2737982] [19-4160] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:17 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Troy Mitchell and Keith E. Vincent, II, FILED. Service date 12/26/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2737977] [19-4160] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:13 AM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2730260] [19-4160] [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:44 PM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2730254] [19-4160] [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:36 PM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/12/2019, RECEIVED.[2730249] [19-4160] [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:32 PM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jkendric Jirelle Agee, FILED. [2730244] [19-4160] [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Agee v. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Timothy Quinn, LT.; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bellnier, Deputy Commissioner of "DOCCS" Correctional Facilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. John Doe #9, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Cayuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Andrew Cuomo, Governor; State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold D. Graham, Superintendent; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Guzylak, Inmate Record Coordinator II; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Brooks, Auburn C.F. Captain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Doe #13, Department of Corrections and Community Supervision Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Vasile, Lieutenant; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cayuga County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does #11, Department of Corrections and Community Supervision Techinical Security Specialist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Nathaniel Sweet, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Fagan, Auburn C.F. Deputy Superintendent of Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kevin Ashby, Correctionl Officeri; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #14, Auburn C.F. Hearing Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. John Doe #8, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Vanfleet, LT.; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Anthony J. Annucci, Acting Commissioner; New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 2, Evidence Control Supervisor; Auburn Corrrectional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. John Does #10, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. John Doe #6, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Stephen Maher, Chief Investigator of the Office of Special Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 4, Assigned by OSI capacity of an OSI investigator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Thomas A. McCarthy, Correctional Officer, Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #12, Department of Corrections and Community Supervision Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1, Deputy Superintendent of Security; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Michael Quimette, LT.; Acting Captain; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. John Doe #7, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 3, Criminal Prosecutor Liason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Troy Mitchell, FKA John Doe #5
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Laura Etlinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mrs. Wade, FKA Jane Doe #14
Represented By: Frank W. Miller
Represented By: Charles C. Spagnoli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mr. Keith E. Vincent, II, Correctional Officer; Auburn Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Laura Etlinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jkendric Jirelle Agee
Represented By: Jkendric Jirelle Agee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?